Toyling Maa et al v. Carnival Corporation and PLC et al
Plaintiff: Estate of Wilson Maa and Toyling Maa
Defendant: Carnival PLC, Carnival Corporation & plc, Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd., Carnival Corporation and PLC and Carnival Corporation
Case Number: 2:2020cv06341
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Steve Kim
2 Judge: Michael R Wilner
3 Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2021 Filing 78 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #60 filed by Defendants Carnival Corporation, Carnival PLC.(Hughes, Jonathan)
March 17, 2021 Filing 77 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #60 filed by defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd..(Maltzman, Jeffrey)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Note Court's comments at end of order. re Stipulation for Protective Order #75 (vm)
March 4, 2021 Filing 75 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendants Carnival Corporation, Carnival PLC, Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hughes, Jonathan)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) - RULING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS OR STRIKE THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT #63 by Judge George H. Wu. The Court adopts its February 18, 2021 tentative ruling (Docket No. 73) as its final ruling on Defendants' motion to dismiss. While the Court in its tentative ruling and also at the hearing on the motion indicated that it was considering whether to require the Plaintiffs to further plead because their "continued use of group-pleading in at least some instances does lead to some measure of uncertainty/inexactitude" (Id. at 8 of 8), in the end, the Court will not order such because: (1) the primary issue was the motion to dismiss and (2) the Plaintiffs have sufficiently (albeit barely) satisfied their Rule 8 notice-obligations. (mrgo)
February 18, 2021 Filing 73 MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS OR STRIKE THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT #63 held before Judge George H. Wu. For reasons stated on the record, Defendants' Motion is TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION. Court to issue its ruling. Court Reporter: Terri Hourigan. (iv)
February 16, 2021 Filing 72 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiffs Estate of Wilson Maa, Toyling Maato Notice (Other) #71 Plaintiffs' Response and Objection to Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority (Weil, Kelly)
February 12, 2021 Filing 71 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority filed by Defendants Carnival Corporation, Carnival PLC, Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Order, Lindsay v. Carnival Corporation, No. C20-982 (W.D. Wash.))(Hughes, Jonathan)
February 9, 2021 Filing 70 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Paul Terry Anderlini counsel for Plaintiffs Estate of Wilson Maa, Toyling Maa. Caroline Anne Rietz is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Toyling Maa. (Anderlini, Paul)
February 9, 2021 Filing 69 Notice of Electronic Filing re Reply (Motion related), #68 , Response in Opposition to Motion #67 , Order, #66 e-mailed to Caroline Anne Rietz at crietz@amlawoffice.com bounced due to Invalid email address. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ir) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 4, 2021 Filing 68 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike allegations #63 filed by Defendants Carnival Corporation, Carnival PLC, Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.. (Hughes, Jonathan)
January 28, 2021 Filing 67 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike allegations #63 filed by Plaintiffs Estate of Wilson Maa, Toyling Maa. (Weil, Kelly)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER REGARDING STIPULATION TO ESTABLISH EXPERT REPORT EXCHANGE DATES by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation for Review #65 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Stipulation is granted. The parties shall simultaneously exchange opening expert reports on July 19, 2021, and shall simultaneously exchange rebuttal expert reports on August 19, 2021. (mrgo)
January 20, 2021 Filing 65 STIPULATION for Review of and to Establish Expert Report Exchange Dates filed by Defendants Carnival Corporation, Carnival PLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Hughes, Jonathan)
December 30, 2020 Filing 64 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Katie J L Scott counsel for Defendants Carnival Corporation, Carnival PLC. Adding Katie J.L. Scott as counsel of record for Carnival Corporation; Carnival plc for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Carnival Corporation; Carnival plc. (Attorney Katie J L Scott added to party Carnival Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Katie J L Scott added to party Carnival PLC(pty:dft))(Scott, Katie)
December 14, 2020 Filing 63 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike allegations filed by Defendants Carnival Corporation, Carnival PLC, Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.. Motion set for hearing on 2/18/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order) (Attorney Jonathan W Hughes added to party Carnival Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan W Hughes added to party Carnival PLC(pty:dft)) (Hughes, Jonathan)
December 11, 2020 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Robert B Hutchinson on behalf of Plaintiffs Estate of Wilson Maa, Toyling Maa (Attorney Robert B Hutchinson added to party Estate of Wilson Maa(pty:pla), Attorney Robert B Hutchinson added to party Toyling Maa(pty:pla))(Hutchinson, Robert)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER REGARDING FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Clarify, #59 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Stipulation is granted. The November 30, 2020 deadline to respond to the First Amended Complaint is moot. Defendants Carnival Corporation, Carnival plc, and Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. need not respond to the First Amended Complaint. (mrgo)
November 30, 2020 Filing 60 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant All Defendants amending Amended Complaint/Petition #44 , filed by Plaintiff Toyling Maa, Estate of Wilson Maa(Dallal, James)
November 30, 2020 Filing 59 Joint STIPULATION to Clarify Regarding First Amended Complaint, Re: Amended Complaint/Petition #44 , filed by Defendants Carnival Corporation and PLC, Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration In Support of Stipulation Regarding First Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order)(Hughes, Jonathan)
November 23, 2020 Filing 58 MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT #45 #46 ; and SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu. The Tentative circulated and attached hereto, is adopted as the Court's Final Ruling. Plaintiff's Motion is GRANTED. Court and counsel discuss scheduling. The Court sets the following: Discovery cut-off 8/6/2021. Motion hearing cutoff 10/21/2021. Jury Trial set for 12/7/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Pretrial Conference set for 11/22/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Post-Mediation Status Conference set for 7/22/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Court Reporter: Terri A. Hourigan. (mrgo)
November 16, 2020 Filing 57 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 weeks, filed by Plaintiffs Estate of Wilson Maa, Toyling Maa.. (Dallal, James)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responses to First Amended Complaint to November 30,2020 as to defendants Carnival Corporation and PLC, Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. #55 by Judge George H. Wu (lc)
November 11, 2020 Filing 55 Joint REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Responses to First Amended Complaint filed by defendants Carnival Corporation and PLC, Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Maltzman, Jeffrey)
November 6, 2020 Filing 54 REPLY In Support Corrected NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to file Second Amended Complaint #46 filed by Plaintiffs Estate of Wilson Maa, Toyling Maa. (Dallal, James)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - TRANSFER OF CASE TO JUDGE WU by Judge George H. Wu. This action has been reassigned to the HONORABLE GEORGE H. WU, United States District Judge and to the Honorable Michael R. Wilner, U.S. Magistrate Judge (MRW). Please substitute the initials GW in place of the initials DSF. The case number will now read: CV 20-6341-GW-MRWx. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint #45 , and Corrected Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint #46 , will remain on calendar for November 23, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. However the time to appear is advanced from 1:30 p.m. to 8:30 a.m. The Order Re Jury Trial #34 issued on September 8, 2020 is VACATED. The Court sets a Scheduling Conference on November 23, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. (See document for details) (mrgo)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo)
October 28, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE of Court Appointment as Personal Representative of Estate of Wilson Maa filed by Plaintiff Estate of Wilson Maa, Toyling Maa. (Dallal, James)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:20-cv-06218 GW(MRWx). Case transferred from Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim to Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-06341 GW(MRWx). Signed by Judge George H. Wu (rn)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The deadline for Defendants to file Responsive pleadings to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint is 11/16/2020 #48 . (jp)
October 26, 2020 Filing 48 Joint REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Responses to First Amended Complaint filed by defendants Carnival Corporation and PLC, Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey B. Maltzman, #2 Proposed Order) (Maltzman, Jeffrey)
October 26, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to file Second Amended Complaint #45 , Corrected NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to file Second Amended Complaint #46 filed by Defendants Carnival Corporation and PLC, Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.. (Maltzman, Jeffrey)
October 21, 2020 Filing 46 Corrected NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to file Second Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Estate of Wilson Maa, Toyling Maa. Motion set for hearing on 11/23/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Motion for Leave, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Motion for Leave) (Dallal, James)
October 20, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to file Second Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Estate of Wilson Maa, Toyling Maa. Motion set for hearing on 11/23/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Dallal, James)
October 20, 2020 Filing 44 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Carnival Corporation and PLC, Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Plaintiff Toyling Maa, Estate of Wilson Maa(Dallal, James)
October 13, 2020 Filing 43 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Alison E Cordova counsel for Plaintiffs Estate of Wilson Maa, Toyling Maa. Alison E. Cordova is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Toyling Maa. (Cordova, Alison)
October 13, 2020 Filing 42 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Alison E Cordova counsel for Plaintiffs Estate of Wilson Maa, Toyling Maa. Adding James G. Dallal as counsel of record for Plaintiff(s) for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Toyling Maa. (Cordova, Alison)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer granting #31 Non-Resident Attorney Christopher M Odell APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Carnival Corporation and PLC, designating Angel Tang Nakamura as local counsel. (jp)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer DENYING Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand (Dkt. #24 ) and GRANTING Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (Dkts. #17 , #19 ). An amended complaint must be filed no later than 10/20/2020. Failure to file by that date will waive the right to do so. Except as stated otherwise in this Order, the Court does not grant leave to add new defendants or new claims. Leave to add new defendants or new claims must be sought by a properly-noticed motion. See Order for specifics. (jp)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING MOTION OFF CALENDAR AND UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Court, on its own motion, takes the Motion #24 set for Monday, September 21, 2020 off calendar and under submission. The Court will set a new hearing date if it decides oral argument would be helpful. A written order will follow. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 15, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of Compliance with Court's September 8, 2020 in Chambers Order filed by defendants Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.. (Maltzman, Jeffrey)
September 8, 2020 Filing 37 REPLY First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to #24 P's Reply to Def Joint Oppo to Motion for Remand filed by Plaintiffs Estate of Wilson Maa, Toyling Maa. (Cordova, Alison)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: No later than September 15, 2020, defense counsel is to file a list of all cases arising from alleged COVID-19 transmission onboard the Coral Princess pending in this district, including case name, case number with initials of the assigned judges, and the date of filing in this district. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 7/11/2022. (rfi)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Order re Jury Trial by Judge Dale S. Fischer. These dates and requirements are firm. The Court is very unlikely to grant continuances unless the parties establish good cause through a concrete showing. Failure to complete discovery in a timely manner does not constitute good cause, nor does the fact that a settlement conference is pending. Each side is limited to five motions in limine, unless the Court orders otherwise. See Trial Order for specifics. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/12/2022 at 3:00 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. Jury Trial set for 10/11/2022 at 8:30 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (rfi)
September 8, 2020 Filing 33 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) SCHEDULING ORDER. The Court takes the Scheduling Conference off calendar and establishes the case management dates as proposed by parties in the Joint Rule 26(f) Report as further described in the Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates except as noted in the Order re Trial. (See Order re Trial for specific dates and times.) These dates and requirements are firm. The Court is very unlikely to grant continuances unless the parties establish good cause through a concrete showing. Failure to complete discovery in a timely manner does not constitute good cause,B49 nor does the fact that a settlement conference is pending. Each side is limited to five motions in limine unless the Court orders otherwise. All fictitiously named defendants are dismissed. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 4, 2020 Filing 32 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 weeks, filed by Plaintiffs Estate of Wilson Maa, Toyling Maa.. (Cordova, Alison)
September 4, 2020 Filing 31 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Christopher M. Odell to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Carnival Corporation and PLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27942577) filed by Defendant Carnival Corporation and PLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Nakamura, Angel)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: The application to file under seal filed at docket number #27 is denied as unnecessary. Federal Rule of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 5.2-1 require social security numbers and home addresses to be redacted. In addition, the application to seal was not filed correctly and the proposed unredacted version of the exhibit was filed for public view. In light of this, the Clerk is ordered to seal docket number 27. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 31, 2020 Filing 29 OPPOSITION to First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to #24 filed by Defendants Carnival Corporation and PLC, Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Collin Steinke)(Hughes, Jonathan)
August 28, 2020 Filing 28 DECLARATION of Toyling Maa In Support Of P's Oppo to Mtn to Dismiss NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #19 filed by Plaintiffs Estate of Wilson Maa, Toyling Maa. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Exh. A to Toyling Maa's Decl ISO P's Oppo to Mtn to Dismiss)(Cordova, Alison)
August 28, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to file document Exhibit A to Toyling Maa's Decl ISO P's Oppo to Mtn to Dismiss under seal filed by Plaintiffs Estate of Wilson Maa, Toyling Maa. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Nanci Nishimura ISO P's Mtn to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order for Mtn to File Under Seal, #3 Unredacted Document Exh. A to Toyling Maa's Decl ISO P's Oppo to Mtn to Dismiss, #4 Redacted Document Exh. A to Toyling Maa's Decl ISO P's Oppo to Mtn to Dismiss)(Cordova, Alison)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING MOTION OFF CALENDAR AND UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Court, on its own motion, takes the Motion #19 set for Monday, August 31, 2020 off calendar and under submission. The Court will set a new hearing date if it decides oral argument would be helpful. A written order will follow. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 26, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Maltzman, Jeffrey)
August 17, 2020 Filing 24 First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to filed by Plaintiff Estate of Wilson Maa, Toyling Maa. Motion set for hearing on 9/21/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Cordova, Alison)
August 17, 2020 Filing 23 REPLY in support of a motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #19 filed by Defendant Carnival Corporation and PLC. (Hughes, Jonathan)
August 17, 2020 Filing 22 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #19 filed by Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Maltzman, Jeffrey)
August 10, 2020 Filing 21 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #19 Plaintiffs Joint Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs Estate of Wilson Maa, Toyling Maa. (Cordova, Alison)
July 29, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #17 . The following error(s) was/were found: (1) Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Dismiss Party - under Category - Applications/Ex Parte Applications/Motions/Petitions/Requests. (2) Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Other error(s) with document(s): (3) Filer used the event, Notice (other), which does not prompt the user to set a hearing before the judge. In the future, please use the SEARCH feature on the CM/ECF Menu Bar if you are unsure of the events to use. Please refer to the Courts website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov for available motion dates. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (jp)
July 23, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.. Motion set for hearing on 8/31/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Proof of Service) (Maltzman, Jeffrey)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 9/14/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (rfi)
July 23, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE CARNIVAL CORPORATIONS AND CARNIVAL PLCS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Defendants Carnival Corporation and PLC. (Attachments: #1 MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES ISO CARNIVAL CORPORATIONS AND CARNIVAL PLCS MOTION TO DISMISS, #2 [PROPOSED] ORDER)(Hughes, Jonathan)
July 23, 2020 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Andrew C Johnson counsel for Defendant Carnival Corporation and PLC. Adding Andrew C. Johnson as counsel of record for Carnival Corporation; Carnival plc for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Carnival Corporation; Carnival plc. (Attorney Andrew C Johnson added to party Carnival Corporation and PLC(pty:dft))(Johnson, Andrew)
July 21, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd., identifying Carnival Corporation. (Nield, Edgar)
July 21, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Edgar R Nield on behalf of Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. (Attorney Edgar R Nield added to party Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.(pty:dft))(Nield, Edgar)
July 21, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jeffrey B Maltzman on behalf of Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. (Attorney Jeffrey B Maltzman added to party Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.(pty:dft))(Maltzman, Jeffrey)
July 21, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Rafaela Patricia Castells on behalf of Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. (Attorney Rafaela Patricia Castells added to party Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.(pty:dft))(Castells, Rafaela)
July 21, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Gabrielle DeSantis-Nield on behalf of Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. (Attorney Gabrielle DeSantis-Nield added to party Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.(pty:dft))(DeSantis-Nield, Gabrielle)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer DENYING Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days) #9 . (jp)
July 20, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 14 days after the Court issues its order on Plaintiffs' motion to remand filed by Defendant Carnival Corporation and PLC, Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Attorney Jonathan W Hughes added to party Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.(pty:dft))(Hughes, Jonathan)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
July 17, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
July 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (jtil)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Angel Tang Nakamura on behalf of Defendants Carnival Corporation and PLC, Carnival PLC (Nakamura, Angel)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jonathan W Hughes on behalf of Defendants Carnival Corporation & plc, Carnival PLC (Attorney Jonathan W Hughes added to party Carnival Corporation & plc(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan W Hughes added to party Carnival PLC(pty:dft))(Hughes, Jonathan)
July 16, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiffs Toyling Maa, Estate of Wilson Maa in Los Angeles Superior Court on 6/11/2020 attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Carnival Corporation & plc, Carnival PLC, identifying Micky Arison, Chairman of the Board of Carnival Corporation, and certain members of the Arison family and trusts for their benefit. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Nakamura, Angel)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Carnival Corporation & plc, Carnival PLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Nakamura, Angel)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior, case number 20STCV22145 Receipt No: ACACDC-27238122 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Carnival Corporation & plc, Carnival PLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A To Notice Of Removal, #2 Exhibit B To Notice Of Removal, #3 Proof of Service To Notice Of Removal) (Attorney Angel Tang Nakamura added to party Carnival Corporation & plc(pty:dft), Attorney Angel Tang Nakamura added to party Carnival PLC(pty:dft))(Nakamura, Angel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Toyling Maa et al v. Carnival Corporation and PLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carnival PLC
Represented By: Angel Tang Nakamura
Represented By: Jonathan W. Hughes
Represented By: Katie J L Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carnival Corporation & plc
Represented By: Angel Tang Nakamura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.
Represented By: Edgar R Nield
Represented By: Jeffrey B Maltzman
Represented By: Rafaela Patricia Castells
Represented By: Jonathan W Hughes
Represented By: Gabrielle DeSantis-Nield
Represented By: Gabrielle DeSantis Nield
Represented By: Jonathan W. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carnival Corporation and PLC
Represented By: Angel Tang Nakamura
Represented By: Andrew C Johnson
Represented By: Jonathan W Hughes
Represented By: Christopher M. Odell
Represented By: Jonathan W. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carnival Corporation
Represented By: Jonathan W. Hughes
Represented By: Katie J L Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Wilson Maa
Represented By: Alison E Cordova
Represented By: Joseph Winters Cotchett
Represented By: Nanci E Nishimura
Represented By: Paul Terry Anderlini
Represented By: Kelly Christina Weil
Represented By: Caroline Anne Rietz
Represented By: Robert B Hutchinson
Represented By: James Gerard Beebe Dallal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toyling Maa
Represented By: Alison E Cordova
Represented By: Joseph Winters Cotchett
Represented By: Nanci E Nishimura
Represented By: Paul Terry Anderlini
Represented By: Kelly Christina Weil
Represented By: Caroline Anne Rietz
Represented By: Robert B Hutchinson
Represented By: James Gerard Beebe Dallal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?