Maria Guadalupe Hernandez v. Andrew Saul
Plaintiff: Maria Guadalupe Hernandez
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2020cv06346
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Maria Guadalupe Hernandez. (Krank, Laura)
September 11, 2020 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Maria Guadalupe Hernandez, upon Defendant Andrew Saul served on 9/10/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with statute not specified. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Krank, Laura)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. See Order for details. (dml)
August 11, 2020 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Andrew Saul. (dml)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver: granting #5 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (dml)
July 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and referred to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (car)
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Maria Guadalupe Hernandez. (Krank, Laura)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Maria Guadalupe Hernandez, (Krank, Laura)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Maria Guadalupe Hernandez. (Krank, Laura)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Maria Guadalupe Hernandez. (Krank, Laura)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Maria Guadalupe Hernandez. (Attorney Laura E Krank added to party Maria Guadalupe Hernandez(pty:pla))(Krank, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maria Guadalupe Hernandez v. Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Guadalupe Hernandez
Represented By: Laura E Krank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?