Prather Jackson et al v. Netflix, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Hollywood Weekly Magazine, LLC and Prather Jackson
Defendant: CBS Television Studios, Imagine Television, LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as Imagine Television Studios, Does 1-10, inclusive, Netflix, Inc., CBS Television Studios, Inc., a Delaware corporation and CBS Television Studios, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv06354
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: Gail J Standish
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Robert H Rotstein on behalf of Defendant Netflix, Inc. (Attorney Robert H Rotstein added to party Netflix, Inc.(pty:dft))(Rotstein, Robert)
August 6, 2020 Filing 15 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Netflix, Inc. answer now due 9/16/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Netflix, Inc..(Attorney Emily F Evitt added to party Netflix, Inc.(pty:dft))(Evitt, Emily)
July 31, 2020 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Prather Jackson, Hollywood Weekly Magazine, LLC, upon Defendant Netflix, Inc. served on 7/28/2020, answer due 8/18/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Peter Cayetano of registered agent CT Corporation in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Frank, Michael)
July 22, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by plaintiff Prather Jackson, Hollywood Weekly Magazine, LLC pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) without prejudice as to CBS Television Studios, Imagine Television, LLC. (Frank, Michael)
July 22, 2020 Filing 12 21 DAYS Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants CBS Television Studios, Imagine Television, LLC, Netflix, Inc. (jp)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
July 21, 2020 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Hollywood Weekly Magazine, LLC, Prather Jackson. (Frank, Michael)
July 21, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #3 . The following error(s) was found: The name and address of the attorney for plaintiff(s)must be entered in the appropriate field. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap)
July 21, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
July 21, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (ghap)
July 17, 2020 Filing 6 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Hollywood Weekly Magazine, LLC, Prather Jackson. (Frank, Michael)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Hollywood Weekly Magazine, LLC, Prather Jackson. (Frank, Michael)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Hollywood Weekly Magazine, LLC, Prather Jackson, identifying Prather Jackson. (Attorney Michael F Frank added to party Hollywood Weekly Magazine, LLC(pty:pla))(Frank, Michael)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Hollywood Weekly Magazine, LLC, Prather Jackson. (Frank, Michael)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Hollywood Weekly Magazine, LLC, Prather Jackson. (Frank, Michael)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27246989 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Prather Jackson. (Attorney Michael F Frank added to party Prather Jackson(pty:pla))(Frank, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prather Jackson et al v. Netflix, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Television Studios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imagine Television, LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as Imagine Television Studios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Netflix, Inc.
Represented By: Emily F Evitt
Represented By: Robert H Rotstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Television Studios, Inc., a Delaware corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Television Studios, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hollywood Weekly Magazine, LLC
Represented By: Michael F Frank
Represented By: Matthew H Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prather Jackson
Represented By: Michael F Frank
Represented By: Matthew H Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?