Donna Jackson v. Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Donna Jackson
Defendant: DOES 1-10, Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. dba Princess Cruises and Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2020cv06355
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alka Sagar
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Donna Jackson. upon Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/20/2020, answer due 9/18/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Zachary Politis. (Ahmad, Mohamad)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information.. The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc)
July 21, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #7 . The following error(s) was/were found: SEE UNDER SECTION VII NATURE OF SUIT, instructions read to check off ONE box only, filer erroneously checked off TWO boxes, and should have only selected the one which corresponds as to how filer opened the case. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
July 20, 2020 Filing 7 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Donna Jackson. (Ahmad, Mohamad)
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Summons Request #2 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachment 1 Civil Cover Sheet should be e-filed separately and in the correct event. The correct event is located under Civil Events Other Filings Miscellaneous Filings. (car)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. (car)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (car)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Donna Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Ahmad, Mohamad)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27251314 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Donna Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cruise Contract) (Attorney Mohamad Saleh Ahmad added to party Donna Jackson(pty:pla))(Ahmad, Mohamad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Donna Jackson v. Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. dba Princess Cruises
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Jackson
Represented By: Mohamad Saleh Ahmad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?