Brida, LLC v. Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Brida LLC
Defendant: DOES 1 through 20, inclusive and Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America a California Corporation doing business as Travelers
Case Number: 2:2020cv06359
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Gail J Standish
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Filing 17 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, 26(f)] by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/25/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 10/9/2020 at 9:30 a.m. (See order for details.) (kti)
August 20, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Second) filed by Defendant Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America.(Agness, Aaron)
August 12, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs, identifying BRIDA, LLC. (Perry, Rosario)
August 10, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Amended Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Other Complaint Filings > Amended Complaint. The filer used the event, Appeal Documents > Amended Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, for docketing this filing. Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
August 7, 2020 Filing 13 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by plaintiff Brida LLC. Filed On: 7-29-2020; Entered On: 7-29-2020; (Perry, Rosario)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RE FILING OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Upon Stipulation #10 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the deadline for Defendant Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America to file its response to Plaintiff Brida, LLC's First Amended Complaint is continued to 8/14/2020. Brida is granted leave to file a Second Amended Complaint in this action that incorporates the allegations set forth in its complaint in the second state court action filed against Travelers in the Los Angeles County Superior Court, case no. 20STCV25396, within ten days of this Order. Brida shall dismiss the second state court action without prejudice within ten days of this Order. Once the Second Amended Complaint in this action is filed, Travelers shall have 14 calendar days to respond to the Second Amended Complaint. (gk)
July 28, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less), #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Stipulations > Amend/Correct. The filer used the event, Stipulations > Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less), for docketing this filing. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
July 24, 2020 Filing 10 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America answer now due 8/14/2020, re Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Agness, Aaron)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
July 17, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
July 17, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (jtil)
July 17, 2020 NON CONFORMED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Brida LLC, attached as Exhibit 3. (jtil)
July 17, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Brida LLC in Los Angeles Superior Court on 9/11/2019, attached as Exhibit 1. (jtil)
July 17, 2020 Filing 6 Request for Judicial Notice filed by Defendant Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America re: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 (Agness, Aaron)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. Related Case(s): Zero (Agness, Aaron)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, identifying Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America (Defendant); Brida LLC. (Attorney Aaron C Agness added to party Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America(pty:dft))(Agness, Aaron)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Joel A. Graboff re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Defendant Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Agness, Aaron)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Agness, Aaron)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19STCV32464 Receipt No: ACACDC-27248054 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "1" - State Complaint, #2 Exhibit "2" - Summons & Proof, #3 Exhibit "3" - State FAC, #4 Exhibit "9" - State Civil Case Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit "9" - State Sub of Attorney (Moss), #6 Exhibit "9" - State Moss Withdraw, #7 Exhibit "9" - State Ntc Ruling Sub of Attorney, #8 Exhibit "9" - State Sub of Attorney (Perry), #9 Exhibit "9" - State CMS, #10 Exhibit "9" - State Travelers MTS, #11 Exhibit "9" - State Brida CMS) (Attorney Joel Graboff added to party Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America(pty:dft))(Agness, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brida, LLC v. Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America a California Corporation doing business as Travelers
Represented By: Joel Graboff
Represented By: Aaron C Agness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brida LLC
Represented By: Rosario Perry
Represented By: Lynda Jung-Hee Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?