Ester Varoyan v. Transamerica Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Ester Varoyan
Defendant: Transamerica Life Insurance Company and DOES 1-100, Inclusive
Case Number: 2:2020cv06371
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Steve Kim
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER that the Scheduling Conference is set for November 16, 2020 1:30 PM ; compliance with FRCP 16, and 26(f) and filing of joint report; Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action by Judge Otis D Wright, II (lc)
July 23, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Proof of Service (subsequent documents) #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Filer has included previously e-filed documents with prior active electronic headers intact to this current e-filing and as a result has rendered the current filings electronic header illegible. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
July 22, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Transamerica Life Insurance Company, served on July 22, 2020. (Orlando, Vivian)
July 21, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Zina Yu counsel for Defendant Transamerica Life Insurance Company. Adding Zina Yu as counsel of record for Transamerica Life Insurance Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Yu, Zina)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information.. The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents (lc)
July 20, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (jtil)
July 17, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Transamerica Life Insurance Company in Los Angeles Superior Court on 7/14/2020, attached as Exhibit I.(jtil)
July 17, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Ester Varoyan in Los Angeles Superior Court on 12/26/2019, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Transamerica Life Insurance Company, served on July 17, 2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Orlando, Vivian)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Transamerica Life Insurance Company, (Orlando, Vivian)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Transamerica Life Insurance Company identifying Commonwealth General Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Orlando, Vivian)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Orlando, Vivian)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 19VECV01846 Receipt No: ACACDC-27251581 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A through I to Notice of Removal, #2 Declaration of Vivian I. Orlando in Support of Defendant's Notice of Removal) (Attorney Vivian I Orlando added to party Transamerica Life Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Orlando, Vivian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ester Varoyan v. Transamerica Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ester Varoyan
Represented By: George G Mgdesyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transamerica Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Vivian I Orlando
Represented By: Zina Yu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-100, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?