Unicolors, Inc. v. UMGEE U.S.A., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Unicolors, Inc.
Defendant: Does 1 through 10,, UMGEE U.S.A., Inc. and Does 1 through 10
Case Number: 2:2020cv06376
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) COURT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for October 5, 2020 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before September 21, 2020. (iv)
August 31, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant UMGEE U.S.A., Inc., identifying Umgee U.S.A., Inc. and Unicolors, Inc.. (Myung, S.)
August 31, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant UMGEE U.S.A., Inc..(Attorney S. Calvin Myung added to party UMGEE U.S.A., Inc.(pty:dft))(Myung, S.)
August 11, 2020 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc., upon Defendant UMGEE U.S.A., Inc. served on 8/10/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Boyng K Gi - Registered Agent for Service of Process c/o Alejandro C., Person In Charge Authorized to Accept in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Burroughs, Scott)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. [See Order for further details.] (et)
July 20, 2020 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant UMGEE U.S.A., Inc. (car)
July 20, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (car)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Unicolors, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc., (Burroughs, Scott)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27252583 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc.. (Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Unicolors, Inc.(pty:pla))(Burroughs, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Unicolors, Inc. v. UMGEE U.S.A., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unicolors, Inc.
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Justin M Gomes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UMGEE U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: S. Calvin Myung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?