Raelene S. Arreguin v. Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar et al
Plaintiff: Raelene S. Arreguin
Defendant: Anthony White, Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar, Atlantic Records APG, Kleonard Raphael, KSR Music Group and Darrale Jones
Case Number: 2:2020cv06396
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to show cause why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. In response to this Order to Show Cause, the Court will accept the following no later than OCTOBER 15, 2020. BY PLAINTIFF: PROOF OF SERVICE AND/OR BY DEFENDANTS: RESPONSES TO THE COMPLAINT OR BY PLAINTIFF: APPLICATIONS FOR CLERK TO ENTER DEFAULT. Failure to respond to the Order to Show Cause by OCTOBER 15, 2020 will result in the dismissal of this action. (iv)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SELF-REPRESENTATION ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (iv)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. In response to Magistrate Judge Rosenberg's Order #6 , the Court received a signed, notarized page 5 to the Complaint from Plaintiff. The Court ORDERS the Clerk to file the Signed Complaint, which shall be the operative Complaint going forward. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smom) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 27, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES IS DENIED AS MOOT by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. On August 25, 2020, the court received Plaintiff's filing fee in the amount of $400.00, Receipt Number: LA210413. (Dkt. No. 7.) Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED Plaintiff's request to proceed without prepayment of filing fees, Dkt. No. #2 , is DENIED AS MOOT. (see document for further details) (hr)
August 25, 2020 Filing 7 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Received $400.00 from Raelene S. Arreguin. Re: Complaint - (Discovery), #1 . Receipt number LA210413. (fr)
August 24, 2020 Filing 10 SIGNED COMPLAINT Re: Complaint - (Discovery), #1 filed by Plaintiff Raelene S. Arreguin. (iv)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: UNSIGNED COMPLAINT AND REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS WITH DECLARATION IN SUPPORT #2 by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. The Clerk is directed to mail Plaintiff the signature pages of the Complaint (Dkt. No. #1 , pg. 4) and the IFP Request (Dkt No. #2 , pg. 2). IT IS ORDERED that, on or before August 25, 2020, Plaintiff shall file the replacement signature pages of her Complaint and IFP Request. (See Order for Further Details) (Attachments: #1 Complaint (Dkt. No. 1, pg. 4), #2 IFP Request (Dkt No. 2, pg. 2)) (kl)
July 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (car)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Raelene S. Arreguin. (car)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Raelene S. Arreguin. (car)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants. Case assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg, filed by Plaintiff Raelene S. Arreguin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (car)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raelene S. Arreguin v. Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Records APG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kleonard Raphael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KSR Music Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrale Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raelene S. Arreguin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?