Noemi Tapia Reyes v. Andrew Saul
Plaintiff: Noemi Tapia Reyes
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2020cv06405
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV20-6405 KS on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER NOTIFYING PARTIES OF STAY AND ORDERING DEFENDANT TO NOTIFY PARTIES AND COURT OF THE DATE THE COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY RESUMES OPERATIONS by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. On April 17, 2020, Order 20-074 of the Chief Judge of the United States District Court for the Central District of California STAYED this case and directed that the stay shall remain in effect until one of the following occurs: (see document for further details). (hr)
August 11, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Andrew Saul. (Attorney Michael K Marriott added to party Andrew Saul(pty:dft))(Marriott, Michael)
August 3, 2020 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Noemi Tapia Reyes, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Attorney General. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to General Counsel. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. Amended (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Rosales, Steven)
August 3, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Noemi Tapia Reyes. (Rosales, Steven)
August 3, 2020 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Noemi Tapia Reyes, upon Defendant Andrew Saul served on 7/30/2020, answer due 11/27/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Attorney General. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to General Counsel. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Rosales, Steven)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL (JOINT SUBMISSION FORMAT) by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (see document for details). (et)
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Andrew Saul. (car)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (car)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Noemi Tapia Reyes, (Rosales, Steven)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Noemi Tapia Reyes. (Rosales, Steven)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Noemi Tapia Reyes. (Rosales, Steven)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27256110 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Noemi Tapia Reyes. (Attorney Steven G Rosales added to party Noemi Tapia Reyes(pty:pla))(Rosales, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Noemi Tapia Reyes v. Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Michael K Marriott
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noemi Tapia Reyes
Represented By: Steven G Rosales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?