Lisa Douglass v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Lisa Douglass and Lisa M Douglass
Defendant: Sue Peters, Dina Douglass, Sue Douglass, Kenneth Lombino, John Douglas, Mark Burnette, David Geffen, Wolfe Air, Ethos Laboratories and UC Regents, Exxon, Los Angeles Times, G.P.P., Inc. doing business as Guardian Innovative Solutions, Andrew Frankel, U.S. Air Force, New York Board of Finance and Retirement, Rick Burkle, Agent Colin McGuiness, Bonei Olam, Trina Saunders, L Brands, Creative Artists Agency, Daniel Ahn, The University Board of Trustees Maharishi University Management, Patrick Cain, Hilton Hotel International, Gavin Newsom, Alfre Woodard, Gretchen Whitmer, Emily Green, Neva Kaya, Campus Living Villages, Inc., RPM International, Inc., On Demand, Inc., Music Cares, Nestor Cambell, Bank of America, British Museum of Art, CLV Holdings, Judge Terry Green, Yosef Goldberger, Mark Zuckerberg, The Getty Trust, Babak Azzisadeh, Andrew Cuomo, David Miscavage, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Rabbi Schlomo, Golden Bridge Yoga, Sony Music Entertainment, LA Peer Pediatrics, The Walt Disney Corporation, Martin G. King, Nathan Olsen, Carol Ann Emquies, Andre Calantzopoulos, Arthur Levinson, Facebook, Shelly Perluss, New York Psychiatric Institute, Frank Kamer, Warner Brothers, Michel Moore, Narbeh Bagdasarian, Gil Burk Witz, Gurmukh Kaur Khalsa, National Football League, Andrena Douglass, Playboy, PEW Research, Indian Health, Mohammed Bin Salman, Paz Vega, Mr. Ferrari, Greg Lauren, Nancy Pelosi, Merrill Lynch, Gwen Stefani, Nike, Dr. Lane Thaut, Boeing, Writer's Guild, San Antonio Military, Gurushabd Singh Khalsa, Eric Garcetti, Amerixcan Academy of Dramatic Arts, Elon Musk, Marvel, John Stehndal, Rockefeller Foundation, Frank Gibson, Chia Soo, California Commission On Peace Officerr Standards and Traning-POST-torture of children, Sharon McCutcheon, Netflix, Fox Sports, Les Wexner, Cordence Worldwide, Kareem Abdul Jabaar, Rothschild and Co., De Beers Consolidated Mines, Los Angeles Unified School District, Annheuser Busch, Microsoft, Rob Lowe, University of California Board of Regents, New York State, Gidon Rosman, Shaw Jonathan, Rothschild Patent Imaging, Johnny Depp, Mike Coulter, Jacek Olczak, Mark Urata, Michele Latiolais, California Department of Insurance, Will Farrell, Jimmy Iovine, Xavier Becerra, Nicole Kelly, Citibank, N.A., Lockheed Martin, Gordon Getty, Kainser Family Foundation, Maria Hovsepian, Medtronic, Universal Music, Mark Goldstein, Los Angeles County Board of Supervisors, Mark Rubin, Pope Francis, Larry Page, New York Times, RPM Wood Finishes Group, Inc., Alice Gambrell, Aldy Damian, The Vatican, Edgar Bronfman, Louis Dehaas, Wells Weymouth, National Amusements, Navient, La Follette Johnson, Rabbi Schnur, Amy Pascal, Central Casting Entertainment Partners, 1-1000 Does, Steven Mandel, Jewish Telegraph Agnecy, Shelby Miner, Susan Wojicki, Kanye West, US Department of Justice, Ronnie Holman, United States of America, MGM Resorts, Cal-Quake, Philip Morris International Inc., Elsevier, Inc., World Bank Group, Michigan Animal Humane Society, USAA Financial Services, Brad Spellberg, Vinh Ha, Kyle Todd, Priyanka Bhanot, CUREUS, Nick Cave, Del Weston AOF Film, International, Los Angeles Community College Board of Trustees, Dupont Corporation, Church of Scientology, Sue Kawashimi, Harvard Corporation, Guardian Protection Products, Inc., Damone Roberts, Rupert Murdoch, City of London Corporation, NBC Universal Media, Lucian Ion, Esma Younis, Los Angeles Museum of Art, Paris Review, International Busniess Machines, Mark Knowles, Cedars Sinai Health Care Foundation, Alcoholics Anonymous World Conference, Leigh Rothschild, University of Southern California (USC) and Google, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv06448
Filed: July 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: John E McDermott
2 Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 62 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS)RULING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO RULE 12(b)(6) #13 ; and DEFENDANT UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT #18 by Judge George H. Wu: Based on the foregoing discussion, the Court GRANTS the motion. The complaint is dismissed with prejudice as to all defendants (See minutes for further details) ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (yl)
September 4, 2020 Filing 61 JOINDER in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #40 filed by Defendants Google, Inc., Larry Page, Susan Wojicki. (Kramer, David)
September 4, 2020 Filing 60 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Larry Page, Susan Wojicki, Google, Inc., (Attorney David H Kramer added to party Larry Page (pty:dft), Attorney David H Kramer added to party Susan Wojicki(pty:dft), Attorney David H Kramer added to party Google, Inc.(pty:dft))(Kramer, David)
September 2, 2020 Filing 59 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Bank of America. Motion set for hearing on 10/1/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kamal, Salwa)
September 2, 2020 Filing 58 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Answer to Complaint (Discovery) #55 by Clerk of Court. Docket No. 55 is stricken for the reason(s) stated in the Notice #57 filed on September 2, 2020. (mrgo)
September 2, 2020 Filing 57 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Discovery) #55 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Motions and Related Filings > Applications/Ex Parte Applications/Motions/Petitions/Requests > Motions > Dismiss. Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Other error(s) with document(s): Document attached to this entry is a motion and not an answer.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo)
September 1, 2020 Filing 56 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Bank of America identifying Bank of America Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Kamal, Salwa)
September 1, 2020 Filing 55 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER DOC. NO. 58] ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 filed by Defendant Bank of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Salwa Syeda Kamal added to party Bank of America(pty:dft))(Kamal, Salwa) Modified on 9/2/2020 (mrgo).
August 27, 2020 Filing 54 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Memorandum in Support of Motion, #46 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Motions and Related Filings > Applications/Ex Parte Applications/Motions/Petitions/Requests > Dismiss Case or Dismiss (cause or other). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo)
August 27, 2020 Filing 53 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Terry Green, (Overton, Sarah)
August 27, 2020 Filing 52 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #51 filed by Defendant Terry Green. (Overton, Sarah)
August 27, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by defendant Terry Green. Motion set for hearing on 10/1/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Sarah L Overton added to party Terry Green(pty:dft)) (Overton, Sarah)
August 27, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE Amended Notice of Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Patrick Cain. (Cain, Patrick)
August 27, 2020 Filing 49 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: The Court, ADVANCES DEFENDANT PATRICK J. CAINS MOTION TO DISMISS #45 previously scheduled for 09/28/2020 to 9/24/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Judge Wu hears matters on Mondays and Thursdays only. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 26, 2020 Filing 48 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Defendants Louis Dehaas, Maria Hovsepian, La Follette Johnson. (Robinson, Adam)
August 26, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Louis Dehaas, Maria Hovsepian, La Follette Johnson, (Robinson, Adam)
August 26, 2020 Filing 46 MEMORANDUM in Support MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Defendants Louis Dehaas, Maria Hovsepian, La Follette Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Attorney Adam L Robinson added to party Louis Dehaas(pty:dft), Attorney Adam L Robinson added to party Maria Hovsepian(pty:dft), Attorney Adam L Robinson added to party La Follette Johnson(pty:dft))(Robinson, Adam)
August 25, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case ; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities filed by Defendant Patrick Cain. Motion set for hearing on 9/28/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Motion To Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A to Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Motion To Dismiss, #3 Exhibit B to Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Motion To Dismiss, #4 Exhibit C to Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Motion To Dismiss, #5 Exhibit D to Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Motion To Dismiss, #6 Exhibit E to Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Motion To Dismiss, #7 Proposed Order Granting Patrick J. Cains Motion To Dismiss) (Attorney Patrick J Cain added to party Patrick Cain(pty:dft)) (Cain, Patrick)
August 25, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Annheuser Busch, identifying Anheuser-Busch InBev SA/NV. (Jones, Allison)
August 25, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 8(A)(2) AND 12(B)(6) filed by Defendant Annheuser Busch. Motion set for hearing on 9/24/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service) (Attorney Allison Lenore Jones added to party Annheuser Busch(pty:dft)) (Jones, Allison)
August 24, 2020 Filing 42 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Defendant Lisa M Douglass, upon Plaintiff Universal Music served on 8/24/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Universal Music Group in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. Lisa Douglass (Douglass, Lisa)
August 24, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants NBC Universal Media, Netflix, identifying Comcast Corporation. (Mandavia, Anjani)
August 24, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants NBC Universal Media, Netflix. Motion set for hearing on 9/24/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Anjani Mandavia added to party NBC Universal Media(pty:dft), Attorney Anjani Mandavia added to party Netflix(pty:dft)) (Mandavia, Anjani)
August 23, 2020 Filing 39 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lisa M Douglass, upon Defendant National Football League served on 8/12/2020, answer due 9/2/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE PHYSICIANS SOCIETY in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. LISA DOUGLASS (Douglass, Lisa)
August 23, 2020 Filing 38 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lisa M Douglass, upon Defendant Annheuser Busch served on 8/12/2020, answer due 9/2/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon ANHEUSER BUSCH in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. LISA DOUGLASS (Douglass, Lisa)
August 23, 2020 Filing 37 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lisa M Douglass, upon Defendant Shelly Perluss served on 8/14/2020, answer due 9/4/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Shelly Perluss in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. Lisa Douglass (Douglass, Lisa)
August 23, 2020 Filing 36 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lisa M Douglass, upon Defendant Nicole Kelly served on 8/14/2020, answer due 9/4/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Nicole Kelly in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. Lisa Douglass (Douglass, Lisa)
August 23, 2020 Filing 35 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of REQUEST for Order for FOR DISTRICT COURT MARSHALS TO SERVE #14 LISA DOUGLASS filed by Plaintiff Lisa M Douglass. (Douglass, Lisa)
August 23, 2020 Filing 34 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lisa M Douglass, upon Defendant University of Southern California (USC) served on 7/27/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon University of Southern California in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. Lisa Douglass (Douglass, Lisa)
August 23, 2020 Filing 33 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lisa M Douglass, upon Defendant Microsoft served on 8/17/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Microsoft in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. LISA DOUGLASS (Douglass, Lisa)
August 23, 2020 Filing 32 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lisa M Douglass, upon Defendant The Getty Trust served on 8/3/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Getty Images in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. LISA DOUGLASS (Douglass, Lisa)
August 23, 2020 Filing 31 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lisa M Douglass, upon Defendant Universal Music served on 7/27/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Universal Music Group in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. Lisa Douglass (Douglass, Lisa)
August 21, 2020 Filing 30 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lisa M Douglass, upon Defendant Eric Garcetti served on 7/27/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon City Mayor Eric Garcetti in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. Lisa Douglass (Douglass, Lisa)
August 21, 2020 Filing 29 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lisa M Douglass, upon Defendant Netflix served on 8/12/2020, answer due 9/2/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon NETFLIX in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. LISA DOUGLASS (Douglass, Lisa)
August 21, 2020 Filing 28 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Defendant Lisa M Douglass, upon Defendant Church of Scientology served on 7/31/2020, answer due 8/21/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Church of Scientology in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. Lisa Douglass (Douglass, Lisa)
August 21, 2020 Filing 27 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lisa M Douglass, upon Defendant David Miscavage served on 7/31/2020, answer due 8/21/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon David Miscavage in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. Lisa Douglass (Douglass, Lisa)
August 21, 2020 Filing 26 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lisa M Douglass, upon Defendant Michel Moore served on 8/4/2020, answer due 8/25/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Chief of Police Michel Moore in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. Lisa Douglass (Douglass, Lisa)
August 21, 2020 Filing 25 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lisa M Douglass, upon Defendant Patrick Cain served on 8/5/2020, answer due 8/26/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Patrick Cain, Attorney in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. Lisa Douglass (Douglass, Lisa)
August 20, 2020 Filing 24 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lisa M Douglass, upon Defendant Bank of America served on 8/12/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Bank of America (former bank) in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. Lisa Douglass (Douglass, Lisa)
August 19, 2020 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Nike, identifying Plainitff Lisa Douglass; Defendant Nike, Inc.. (Khan, Nasar)
August 19, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Notice of Motion and Motion by Defendant Nike, Inc. To Dismiss filed by Defendant Nike. Motion set for hearing on 9/24/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion To Dismiss By Defendant Nike, Inc.) (Attorney Nasar M Khan added to party Nike(pty:dft)) (Khan, Nasar)
August 19, 2020 Filing 21 Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case or in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement, filed by Defendant Eric Garcetti. Motion set for hearing on 9/21/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Goss, Jeffrey)
August 19, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case or in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement, filed by Defendant Michel Moore. Motion set for hearing on 9/21/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Jeffrey L Goss added to party Michel Moore(pty:dft)) (Goss, Jeffrey)
August 17, 2020 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant University of Southern California (USC), (Burkwitz, Avi)
August 17, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant University of Southern California (USC). Motion set for hearing on 9/14/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order re: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint) (Attorney Avi Burkwitz added to party University of Southern California (USC)(pty:bkmov), Attorney Avi Burkwitz added to party University of Southern California (USC)(pty:dft)) (Burkwitz, Avi)
August 17, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to FRCP 8 and 12(b)(6), and/or Seek a More Definite Statement Pursuant to FRCP 12(e) filed by Defendant Eric Garcetti. Motion set for hearing on 9/14/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Jeffrey L Goss added to party Eric Garcetti(pty:dft)) (Goss, Jeffrey)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge George H. Wu re: #14 REQUEST for Order. The Court has received Plaintiff's Request for District Court Marshal to Serve #14 filed on August 4, 2020, and the Government's Opposition #15 filed on August 13, 2020. Plaintiff's Request is DENIED. (mrgo)
August 13, 2020 Filing 15 Opposition in Opposition re: REQUEST for Order for FOR DISTRICT COURT MARSHALS TO SERVE #14 filed by Defendant Los Angeles Community College Board of Trustees. (Jeffery, Janine)
August 12, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Los Angeles Community College Board of Trustees. Motion set for hearing on 9/14/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order) (Attorney Janine K Jeffery added to party Los Angeles Community College Board of Trustees(pty:dft)) (Jeffery, Janine)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting #11 APPLICATION for Pro Se Electronic Filing. The applicant must register to use the Courts CM/ECF System within five (5) days of being served with this order. Registration information is available at the Pro Se Litigant E-Filing web page located on the Courts website. Upon registering, the applicant will receive a CM/ECF login and password that will allow him/her to file non-sealed documents electronically in this case only. Any documents being submitted under seal must be manually filed with the Clerk. (mrgo)
August 4, 2020 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR DISTRICT COURT MARSHALS TO SERVE filed by plaintiff Lisa Douglass. (mrgo)
August 4, 2020 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by plaintiff Lisa Douglass. (mrgo) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/6/2020: #1 Proposed Order) (mrgo).
July 30, 2020 Filing 10 RECEIPT FOR FOREIGN SERVICE from U. S. Post Office for documents Re: mailed to Hi Holiness Pope Francis, Apostolic Palace, Vatican City, 000120 on 7/30/2020. (mrgo)
July 30, 2020 Filing 9 RECEIPT FOR FOREIGN SERVICE from U. S. Post Office for documents Re: mailed to Debeers Group, UK, 20 Carlton House Terrace, London, SW1Y 5AN, UK on 7/30/2020. (mrgo)
July 30, 2020 Filing 8 RECEIPT FOR FOREIGN SERVICE from U. S. Post Office for documents Re: mailed to General Counsel, 150 London Wall, Guildhall, PO Box 270, London EC2P 2EJ on 7/30/2020. (mrgo)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details). (et)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. Case transferred from Judge Dale S. Fischer to the calendar of Judge George H. Wu for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:20-cv-06448 GW(JEMx). (rn)
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (esa)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by plaintiff Lisa Douglass. (esa)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 21/60 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants Daniel Ahn, Wolfe Air, Alcoholics Anonymous World Conference, Amerixcan Academy of Dramatic Arts, Annheuser Busch, Babak Azzisadeh, Narbeh Bagdasarian, Bank of America, Xavier Becerra, Priyanka Bhanot, Mohammed Bin Salman, Boeing, British Museum of Art, Edgar Bronfman, Rick Burkle, Mark Burnette, CLV Holdings, CUREUS, Patrick Cain, Cal-Quake, Andre Calantzopoulos, California Commission On Peace Officerr Standards and Traning-POST-torture of children, California Department of Insurance, Nestor Cambell, Campus Living Villages, Inc., Nick Cave, Cedars Sinai Health Care Foundation, Central Casting Entertainment Partners, Church of Scientology, Citibank, N.A., City of London Corporation, Cordence Worldwide, Mike Coulter, Creative Artists Agency, Andrew Cuomo, Aldy Damian, De Beers Consolidated Mines, Louis Dehaas, Del Weston AOF Film, International, Johnny Depp, John Douglas, Dina Douglass, Lisa Douglass, Sue Douglass, Dupont Corporation, Elsevier, Inc., Carol Ann Emquies, Ethos Laboratories and UC Regents, Exxon, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Facebook, Will Farrell, Fox Sports, Francis, Andrew Frankel, G.P.P., Inc., Alice Gambrell, Eric Garcetti, David Geffen, Gordon Getty, Frank Gibson, Yosef Goldberger, Golden Bridge Yoga, Mark Goldstein, Emily Green, Terry Green, Guardian Protection Products, Inc., Vinh Ha, Harvard Corporation, Hilton Hotel International, Ronnie Holman, Maria Hovsepian, Indian Health, International Busniess Machines, Lucian Ion, Jimmy Iovine, Kareem Abdul Jabaar, Jewish Telegraph Agnecy, La Follette Johnson, Kainser Family Foundation, Frank Kamer, Neva Kaya, Nicole Kelly, Gurmukh Kaur Khalsa, Gurushabd Singh Khalsa, Martin G. King, Mark Knowles, L Brands, LA Peer Pediatrics, Michele Latiolais, Greg Lauren, Arthur Levinson, Lockheed Martin, Kenneth Lombino, Los Angeles Community College Board of Trustees, Los Angeles County Board of Supervisors, Los Angeles Museum of Art, Los Angeles Times, Los Angeles Unified School District, Rob Lowe, MGM Resorts, MGM Resorts, Steven Mandel, Marvel, Sharon McCutcheon, Colin McGuiness, Medtronic, Merrill Lynch, Michigan Animal Humane Society, Microsoft, Shelby Miner, David Miscavage, Michel Moore, Rupert Murdoch, Music Cares, Elon Musk, NBC Universal Media, National Amusements, National Football League, Navient, Netflix, New York Board of Finance and Retirement, New York Psychiatric Institute, New York State, New York Times, Gavin Newsom, Nike, Bonei Olam, Jacek Olczak, Nathan Olsen, On Demand, Inc., PEW Research, Larry Page, Paris Review, Amy Pascal, Nancy Pelosi, Shelly Perluss, Sue Peters, Philip Morris International Inc., Playboy, RPM International, Inc., RPM Wood Finishes Group, Inc., Damone Roberts, Rockefeller Foundation, Gidon Rosman, Leigh Rothschild, Rothschild Patent Imaging, Rothschild and Co., Mark Rubin, San Antonio Military, Trina Saunders, Schlomo, Schnur, Shaw Jonathan, Sony Music Entertainment, Chia Soo, Brad Spellberg, Gwen Stefani, Lane Thaut, The Getty Trust, The University Board of Trustees Maharishi University Management, The Vatican, The Walt Disney Corporation, Kyle Todd, U.S. Air Force, US Department of Justice, USAA Financial Services, United States of America, Universal Music, University of California Board of Regents, Mark Urata, Paz Vega, Warner Brothers, Kanye West, Les Wexner, Wells Weymouth, Gretchen Whitmer, Gil Burk Witz, Susan Wojicki, Alfre Woodard, World Bank Group, Writer's Guild, Esma Younis, Mark Zuckerberg. (esa)
July 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendants 1-1000 Does, Daniel Ahn, Wolfe Air, Alcoholics Anonymous World Conference, Amerixcan Academy of Dramatic Arts, Annheuser Busch, Babak Azzisadeh, Narbeh Bagdasarian, Bank of America, Xavier Becerra, Priyanka Bhanot, Mohammed Bin Salman, Boeing, British Museum of Art, Edgar Bronfman, Rick Burkle, Mark Burnette, CLV Holdings, CUREUS, Patrick Cain, Cal-Quake, Andre Calantzopoulos, California Commission On Peace Officerr Standards and Traning-POST-torture of children, California Department of Insurance, Nestor Cambell, Campus Living Villages, Inc., Nick Cave, Cedars Sinai Health Care Foundation, Central Casting Entertainment Partners, Church of Scientology, Citibank, N.A., City of London Corporation, Cordence Worldwide, Mike Coulter, Creative Artists Agency, Andrew Cuomo, Aldy Damian, De Beers Consolidated Mines, Louis Dehaas, Del Weston AOF Film, International, Johnny Depp, John Douglas, Dina Douglass, Sue Douglass, Dupont Corporation, Elsevier, Inc., Carol Ann Emquies, Ethos Laboratories and UC Regents, Exxon, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Facebook, Will Farrell, Fox Sports, Francis, Andrew Frankel, G.P.P., Inc., Alice Gambrell, Eric Garcetti, David Geffen, Gordon Getty, Frank Gibson, Yosef Goldberger, Golden Bridge Yoga, Mark Goldstein, Emily Green, Terry Green, Guardian Protection Products, Inc., Vinh Ha, Harvard Corporation, Hilton Hotel International, Ronnie Holman, Maria Hovsepian, Indian Health, International Busniess Machines, Lucian Ion, Jimmy Iovine, Kareem Abdul Jabaar, Jewish Telegraph Agnecy, La Follette Johnson, Kainser Family Foundation, Frank Kamer, Neva Kaya, Nicole Kelly, Gurmukh Kaur Khalsa, Gurushabd Singh Khalsa, Martin G. King, Mark Knowles, L Brands, LA Peer Pediatrics, Michele Latiolais, Greg Lauren, Arthur Levinson, Lockheed Martin, Kenneth Lombino, Los Angeles Community College Board of Trustees, Los Angeles County Board of Supervisors, Los Angeles Museum of Art, Los Angeles Times, Los Angeles Unified School District, Rob Lowe, MGM Resorts, MGM Resorts, Steven Mandel, Marvel, Sharon McCutcheon, Colin McGuiness, Medtronic, Merrill Lynch, Michigan Animal Humane Society, Microsoft, Shelby Miner, David Miscavage, Michel Moore, Rupert Murdoch, Music Cares, Elon Musk, NBC Universal Media, National Amusements, National Football League, Navient, Netflix, New York Board of Finance and Retirement, New York Psychiatric Institute, New York State, New York Times, Gavin Newsom, Nike, Bonei Olam, Jacek Olczak, Nathan Olsen, On Demand, Inc., PEW Research, Larry Page, Paris Review, Amy Pascal, Nancy Pelosi, Shelly Perluss, Sue Peters, Philip Morris International Inc., Playboy, RPM International, Inc., RPM Wood Finishes Group, Inc., Damone Roberts, Rockefeller Foundation, Gidon Rosman, Leigh Rothschild, Rothschild Patent Imaging, Rothschild and Co., Mark Rubin, San Antonio Military, Trina Saunders, Schlomo, Schnur, Shaw Jonathan, Sony Music Entertainment, Chia Soo, Brad Spellberg, Gwen Stefani, Lane Thaut, The Getty Trust, The University Board of Trustees Maharishi University Management, The Vatican, The Walt Disney Corporation, Kyle Todd, U.S. Air Force, US Department of Justice, USAA Financial Services, United States of America, Universal Music, University of California Board of Regents, Mark Urata, Paz Vega, Warner Brothers, Kanye West, Les Wexner, Wells Weymouth, Gretchen Whitmer, Gil Burk Witz, Susan Wojicki, Alfre Woodard, World Bank Group, Writer's Guild, Esma Younis, Mark Zuckerberg.Case assigned to Judge Dale S. Fischer for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott, (Filing fee $ 400 paid), Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Lisa Douglass. (Attachments: #1 part 2, #2 CV71) (esa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lisa Douglass v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sue Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dina Douglass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sue Douglass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Lombino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Burnette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Geffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wolfe Air
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethos Laboratories and UC Regents
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exxon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Angeles Times
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G.P.P., Inc. doing business as Guardian Innovative Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Frankel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Air Force
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Board of Finance and Retirement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Burkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agent Colin McGuiness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonei Olam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trina Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Brands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Creative Artists Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Ahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The University Board of Trustees Maharishi University Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Cain
Represented By: Patrick J Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilton Hotel International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gavin Newsom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfre Woodard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gretchen Whitmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neva Kaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Campus Living Villages, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RPM International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: On Demand, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Music Cares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nestor Cambell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Represented By: Salwa Syeda Kamal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: British Museum of Art
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLV Holdings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Terry Green
Represented By: Sarah L Overton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yosef Goldberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Zuckerberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Getty Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Babak Azzisadeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Cuomo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Miscavage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exxon Mobil Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rabbi Schlomo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Bridge Yoga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Music Entertainment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LA Peer Pediatrics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Walt Disney Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin G. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Ann Emquies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andre Calantzopoulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Levinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelly Perluss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Psychiatric Institute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Kamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Brothers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michel Moore
Represented By: Jeffrey L Goss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Narbeh Bagdasarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gil Burk Witz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gurmukh Kaur Khalsa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Football League
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrena Douglass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Playboy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PEW Research
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indian Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohammed Bin Salman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paz Vega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Ferrari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Lauren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Pelosi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gwen Stefani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nike
Represented By: Nasar M Khan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Lane Thaut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boeing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Writer's Guild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Antonio Military
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gurushabd Singh Khalsa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Garcetti
Represented By: Jeffrey L Goss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerixcan Academy of Dramatic Arts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elon Musk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Stehndal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockefeller Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chia Soo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Commission On Peace Officerr Standards and Traning-POST-torture of children
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon McCutcheon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Netflix
Represented By: Anjani Mandavia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fox Sports
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Les Wexner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cordence Worldwide
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kareem Abdul Jabaar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rothschild and Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: De Beers Consolidated Mines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Angeles Unified School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annheuser Busch
Represented By: Allison Lenore Jones
Represented By: Kevin W Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microsoft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of California Board of Regents
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gidon Rosman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaw Jonathan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rothschild Patent Imaging
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny Depp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Coulter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacek Olczak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Urata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michele Latiolais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Will Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Iovine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockheed Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gordon Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kainser Family Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Hovsepian
Represented By: Louis H De Haas
Represented By: Adam L Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtronic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Music
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Angeles County Board of Supervisors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pope Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Page
Represented By: David H Kramer
Represented By: Dylan Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Times
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RPM Wood Finishes Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alice Gambrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aldy Damian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Vatican
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgar Bronfman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Dehaas
Represented By: Louis H De Haas
Represented By: Adam L Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Weymouth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Amusements
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navient
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Follette Johnson
Represented By: Louis H De Haas
Represented By: Adam L Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rabbi Schnur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Pascal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Casting Entertainment Partners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1-1000 Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Mandel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jewish Telegraph Agnecy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelby Miner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Wojicki
Represented By: David H Kramer
Represented By: Dylan Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kanye West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Holman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MGM Resorts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cal-Quake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Morris International Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elsevier, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Bank Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan Animal Humane Society
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Financial Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Spellberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vinh Ha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Priyanka Bhanot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CUREUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Cave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Del Weston AOF Film, International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Angeles Community College Board of Trustees
Represented By: Janine K Jeffery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dupont Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Church of Scientology
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sue Kawashimi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvard Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guardian Protection Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damone Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rupert Murdoch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of London Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NBC Universal Media
Represented By: Anjani Mandavia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucian Ion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esma Younis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Angeles Museum of Art
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paris Review
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Busniess Machines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Knowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cedars Sinai Health Care Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alcoholics Anonymous World Conference
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leigh Rothschild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Southern California (USC)
Represented By: Darren V Pang
Represented By: Avi Burkwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Represented By: David H Kramer
Represented By: Dylan Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Douglass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa M Douglass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?