Matthew Brach et al v. Gavin Newsom et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Brach, Christine Ruiz, Erica Sephton, Roger Hackett, Kenneth Fleming, Jesse Petrilla, Lacee Beaulieu, John Ziegler, Alison Walsh, Z. R., a minor, Ade Onibokun, Brian Hawkins, Tiffany Mitrowke, Ashley Ramirez and Marianna Bema
Defendant: Xavier Becerra, Sonia Y Angell, Tony Thurmond and Gaven Newsom
Petitioner: Educators for Safe School Opening
Case Number: 2:2020cv06472
Filed: July 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Filing 61 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Sua Sponte Grant of Summary Judgment Re: Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,,, Terminate Hearings,,,, #60 (Attachments: #1 Statement of Facts, #2 Declaration of Kaufman, #3 Declaration of Bema)(Dhillon, Harmeet)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS VACATING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION/PERMANENT INJUNCTION HEARING AND SETTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The Court believes that this matter may be appropriately resolved by summary judgment. The Court therefore vacates the hearing date currently set for Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction/Permanent Injunction. The Court recognizes its obligation under Rule 56(f) to give Plaintiffs "notice and a reasonable time to respond" before considering a sua sponte grant of summary judgment against it. Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(f). Therefore, the Court will allow Plaintiffs to file an opposition to a sua sponte grant of summary judgment within 14 days of the issuance of this Order. Defendants will have 10 days to respond. At that point, the Court will take its sua sponte consideration of summary judgment under submission along with Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. (See document for details) (mrgo)
August 31, 2020 Filing 59 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Gregory Richard Michael counsel for Plaintiffs Lacee Beaulieu, Marianna Bema, Matthew Brach, Kenneth Fleming, Roger Hackett, Brian Hawkins, Tiffany Mitrowke, Ade Onibokun, Jesse Petrilla, Z. R., a minor, Ashley Ramirez, Christine Ruiz, Erica Sephton, Alison Walsh, John Ziegler. Gregory R. Michael is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Plaintiffs Matthew Brach; Jesse Petrilla; Lacee Beaulieu; Erica Sephton; Kenneth Fleming; John Ziegler; Alison Walsh; Roger Hackett; Christine Ruiz; Z.R., a minor; Marianna Bema; Ashley Ramirez; Tiffany Mitrowke; Ade Onibokun; and Brian Hawkins. (Attorney Gregory Richard Michael added to party Marianna Bema(pty:pla), Attorney Gregory Richard Michael added to party Brian Hawkins(pty:pla), Attorney Gregory Richard Michael added to party Tiffany Mitrowke(pty:pla), Attorney Gregory Richard Michael added to party Ade Onibokun(pty:pla), Attorney Gregory Richard Michael added to party Ashley Ramirez(pty:pla))(Michael, Gregory)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:20-cv-06469 CBM(PDx) (rn)
August 27, 2020 Filing 57 REPLY filed by Plaintiffs Lacee Beaulieu, Marianna Bema, Matthew Brach, Kenneth Fleming, Roger Hackett, Brian Hawkins, Tiffany Mitrowke, Ade Onibokun, Jesse Petrilla, Z. R., a minor, Ashley Ramirez, Christine Ruiz, Erica Sephton, Alison Walsh, John Ziegler to Notice of Related Case(s) #53 (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Dhillon, Harmeet)
August 27, 2020 Filing 56 RESPONSE filed by Defendants Sonia Y Angell, Xavier Becerra, Gaven Newsom, Tony Thurmondto Notice of Related Case(s) #53 and Declaration of Darin L. Wessel (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Wessel, Darin)
August 25, 2020 Filing 55 SUPPLEMENT to APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Enjoin the Enforcement of Reopening In-Person Learning Framework for K-12 Schools in California, 2020-2021 School Year and for Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue #28 filed by Plaintiffs Lacee Beaulieu, Marianna Bema, Matthew Brach, Kenneth Fleming, Roger Hackett, Brian Hawkins, Tiffany Mitrowke, Ade Onibokun, Jesse Petrilla, Z. R., a minor, Ashley Ramirez, Christine Ruiz, Erica Sephton, Alison Walsh, John Ziegler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Declaration of Bhattacharya, #3 Declaration of Kaufman, #4 Declaration of Cicchetti, #5 Declaration of Petrilla, #6 Declaration of Ziegler, #7 Declaration of Hackett, #8 Declaration of Ruiz)(Dhillon, Harmeet)
August 25, 2020 Filing 54 SUPPLEMENT to APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Enjoin the Enforcement of Reopening In-Person Learning Framework for K-12 Schools in California, 2020-2021 School Year and for Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue #28 Supplemental Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Preliminary and/or Permanent Injunction (Dkt. 28) filed by Defendants Sonia Y Angell, Xavier Becerra, Gaven Newsom, Tony Thurmond. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James Watt w/ Exhibits PP-QQ, #2 Declaration of Heather Calomese w/ Exhibits RR-SS, #3 Declaration of Darin L. Wessel w/ Exhibits TT-YY, #4 Declaration of Rachael Maves)(Bunshoft, Jennifer)
August 25, 2020 Filing 53 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Proposed Amicus Curae Educators for Safe School Opening. Related Case(s): 2:20-cv-06469 (Lewis, Jeffrey)
August 25, 2020 Filing 52 DECLARATION of DR. JAYANTA BHATTACHARYA In Support APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Enjoin the Enforcement of Reopening In-Person Learning Framework for K-12 Schools in California, 2020-2021 School Year and for Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue #28 , APPLICATION for Leave to file TO FILE A SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF DR. JAYANTA BHATTACHARYA #42 filed by Plaintiffs Lacee Beaulieu, Marianna Bema, Matthew Brach, Kenneth Fleming, Roger Hackett, Brian Hawkins, Tiffany Mitrowke, Ade Onibokun, Jesse Petrilla, Z. R., a minor, Ashley Ramirez, Christine Ruiz, Erica Sephton, Alison Walsh, John Ziegler. (Dhillon, Harmeet)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS DENYING PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER #28 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Plaintiffs filed an Application for a Temporary Restraining Order ("TRO") on August 3, 2020, against numerous state officials, seeking to enjoin the enforcement of California's school reopening framework, which prohibits in-person education in counties on a statewide COVID-19 monitoring list. Dkt. 28. For the reasons articulated below, Plaintiffs' Application for a TRO is DENIED. (See document for details) (mrgo)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER PERMITTING PLAINTIFFS TO FILE THE SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF DR. JAYANTA BHATTACHARYA by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: #42 APPLICATION for Leave to File. (mrgo)
August 20, 2020 Filing 49 SCHEDULING NOTICE re: MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Enjoin the Enforcement of Reopening CA Schools #15 - Hearing on the motion previously scheduled for 08/31/2020 at 1:30 p.m. has been rescheduled to 9/10/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 17, 2020 Filing 48 MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The Court directs the parties to address whether Plaintiffs have Article III standing. Additionally, the Court views the exceptions to the Individuals with Disabilities Education Act's exhaustion requirement, described in Hoeft v. Tucson Unified Sch. Dist., 967 F.2d 1298, 1303-1304 (9th Cir. 1992), as an important issue that was given only cursory treatment by the parties in their prior briefs. The Court directs the parties to address the issue in greater depth. The parties shall file supplemental briefing not to exceed 12 pages by no later than August 25, 2020, along with any additional evidence the parties wish the Court to consider in ruling on Plaintiffs' request for injunctive relief. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (mrgo)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 SCHEDULING NOTICE/IN CHAMBERS ORDER-TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: #28 APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Enjoin the Enforcement of Reopening In-Person Learning Framework for K-12 Schools in California, 2020-2021 School Year and for Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue filed by Plaintiffs - The Application for Temporary Restraining Order #28 is denied. Order to issue. A telephonic status conference will be held on 8/17/2020 at 1:30 pm. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting #34 Non-Resident Attorney Ryan J. Walsh APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiffs Matthew Brach; Jesse Petrilla, etc., designating Mark P. Meuser as local counsel. (mrgo)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting #33 Non-Resident Attorney Amy Catherine Miller APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiffs Matthew Brach; Jesse Petrilla, etc., designating Mark P. Meuser as local counsel. (mrgo)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting #32 Non-Resident Attorney Michael Alan Yoder APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiffs Matthew Brach; Jesse Petrilla, etc., designating Mark P. Meuser as local counsel. (mrgo)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting #31 Non-Resident Attorney John K. Adams APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiffs Matthew Brach; Jesse Petrilla, etc., designating Mark P. Meuser as local counsel. (mrgo)
August 12, 2020 Filing 42 APPLICATION for Leave to file TO FILE A SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF DR. JAYANTA BHATTACHARYA filed by Plaintiffs Lacee Beaulieu, Marianna Bema, Matthew Brach, Kenneth Fleming, Roger Hackett, Brian Hawkins, Tiffany Mitrowke, Ade Onibokun, Jesse Petrilla, Z. R., a minor, Ashley Ramirez, Christine Ruiz, Erica Sephton, Alison Walsh, John Ziegler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order) (Dhillon, Harmeet)
August 12, 2020 Filing 41 Opposition to Request for Judicial Notice Support of re: APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Enjoin the Enforcement of Reopening In-Person Learning Framework for K-12 Schools in California, 2020-2021 School Year and for Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue #28 filed by Plaintiffs Lacee Beaulieu, Marianna Bema, Matthew Brach, Kenneth Fleming, Roger Hackett, Brian Hawkins, Tiffany Mitrowke, Ade Onibokun, Jesse Petrilla, Z. R., a minor, Ashley Ramirez, Christine Ruiz, Erica Sephton, Alison Walsh, John Ziegler. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Dhillon, Harmeet)
August 12, 2020 Filing 40 REPLY Reply in Support of APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Enjoin the Enforcement of Reopening In-Person Learning Framework for K-12 Schools in California, 2020-2021 School Year and for Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue #28 filed by Plaintiff Matthew Brach. (Dhillon, Harmeet)
August 10, 2020 Filing 39 Amicus Curiae Brief filed filed by Movant Educators for Safe School Opening. RE: Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #21 . (Lewis, Jeffrey)
August 10, 2020 Filing 38 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re EX PARTE APPLICATION to File Amicus Brief #37 filed by Movant Educators for Safe School Opening. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2)(Lewis, Jeffrey)
August 10, 2020 Filing 37 EX PARTE APPLICATION to File Amicus Brief filed by Amicus Curae Educators for Safe School Opening. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Attorney Jeffrey Lewis added to party Educators for Safe School Opening(pty:bkmov)) (Lewis, Jeffrey)
August 9, 2020 Filing 36 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Enjoin the Enforcement of Reopening In-Person Learning Framework for K-12 Schools in California, 2020-2021 School Year and for Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue #28 filed by Defendants Sonia Y Angell, Xavier Becerra, Gaven Newsom, Tony Thurmond. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Darin Wessel, #2 Dec. of Service)(Bunshoft, Jennifer)
August 9, 2020 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Enjoin the Enforcement of Reopening In-Person Learning Framework for K-12 Schools in California, 2020-2021 School Year and for Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue #28 filed by Defendants Sonia Y Angell, Xavier Becerra, Gaven Newsom, Tony Thurmond. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James Watt, M.D., #2 Dec. of Service)(Attorney Jennifer Ann Bunshoft added to party Gaven Newsom(pty:dft))(Bunshoft, Jennifer)
August 7, 2020 Filing 34 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ryan J. Walsh to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Matthew Brach (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27543713) filed by Plaintiff Matthew Brach. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Meuser, Mark)
August 7, 2020 Filing 33 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Amy Catherine Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Matthew Brach (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27543659) filed by Plaintiff Matthew Brach. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Meuser, Mark)
August 7, 2020 Filing 32 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael Alan Yoder to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Matthew Brach (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27543574) filed by Plaintiff Matthew Brach. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Meuser, Mark)
August 7, 2020 Filing 31 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John K. Adams to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Matthew Brach (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27543189) filed by Plaintiff Matthew Brach. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Meuser, Mark)
August 6, 2020 Filing 30 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Ashley Ramirez, Alison Walsh, Jesse Petrilla, Matthew Brach, Marianna Bema, Ade Onibokun, Brian Hawkins, John Ziegler, Lacee Beaulieu, Christine Ruiz, Roger Hackett, Erica Sephton, Tiffany Mitrowke, Z. R., a minor, Kenneth Fleming. upon All Defendants. Waiver of Service signed by Jennifer Bunshoft. (Meuser, Mark)
August 4, 2020 Filing 29 SCHEDULING NOTICE/IN CHAMBERS ORDER-TEXT ONLY ENTRY re: APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Enjoin the Enforcement of Reopening In-Person Learning Framework for K-12 Schools in California, 2020-2021 School Year and for Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue #28 A telephonic hearing is set for 8/17/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Government's opposition brief is due no later than, 8/9/2020. Plaintiff Reply brief shall be filed on 8/12/2020.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 3, 2020 Filing 28 APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Enjoin the Enforcement of Reopening In-Person Learning Framework for K-12 Schools in California, 2020-2021 School Year and for Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue filed by Plaintiffs Matthew Brach. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points & Authorities, #2 Declaration DECLARATION OF HARMEET DHILLONIN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, #3 Declaration DECLARATION OF DR. JAYANTA BHATTACHARYA IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, #4 Declaration DECLARATION OF DR. SCOTT ATLAS IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, #5 Declaration DECLARATION OF DR. JAMES LYONS-WEILER IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, #6 Declaration DECLARATION OF SEAN G. KAUFMAN IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, #7 Declaration DECLARATION OF CHARLES CICCHETTI IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, #8 Declaration DECLARATION OF MARK MCDONALD, M.D. IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, #9 Declaration DECLARATION OF ROBERT C. HAMILTON, M.D., F.A.A.P., IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, #10 Declaration DECLARATION OF JEFF BARKE, M.D. IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, #11 Declaration DECLARATION OF COLLEEN VICTORY, M.D. IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, #12 Declaration DECLARATION OF M. KELLY SUTTON, M.D. IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, #13 Declaration DECLARATION OF RICHARD ADDISON IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, #14 Declaration DECLARATION OF MARI BARKE IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, #15 Declaration DECLARATION OF JAMES M. REARDON IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, #16 Declaration DECLARATION OF ANNA WALKER IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, #17 Declaration DECLARATION OF ALISON M. KEECH IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, #18 Declaration DECLARATION OF GEENA BURGESS IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, #19 Declaration DECLARATION OF COLLEEN M. CUNNINGHAM IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, #20 Declaration DECLARATION OF FR. DAMIEN GIAP IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, #21 Declaration DECLARATION OF MICHELLE GERST IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, #22 Declaration DECLARATION OF RACHELLE GOLDEN IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, #23 Declaration DECLARATION OF MATTHEW BRACH IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, #24 Declaration DECLARATION OF JESSE PETRILLA IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, #25 Declaration DECLARATION OF LACEE BEAULIEU IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, #26 Declaration DECLARATION OF ERICA SEPHTON IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, #27 Declaration DECLARATION OF KENENTH FLEMING IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, #28 Declaration DECLARATION OF JOHN ZEIGLER IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, #29 Declaration DECLARATION OF ALISON WALSH IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, #30 Declaration DECLARATION OF ROGER HACKETT IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, #31 Declaration DECLARATION OF CHRISTINE RUIZ IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, #32 Declaration DECLARATION OF MARIANNE BEMA IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, #33 Declaration DECLARATION OF ASHLEY RAMIREZ IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, #34 Declaration DECLARATION OF TIFFANY MITROWKE IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, #35 Declaration DECLARATION OF ADEBUKOLA ONIBOKUN IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, #36 Declaration DECLARATION OF BRIAN HAWKINS IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, #37 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE) (Dhillon, Harmeet)
July 31, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of California Attorney General Office Darin L. Wessel on behalf of Defendants Sonia Y Angell, Xavier Becerra, Gaven Newsom, Tony Thurmond. (Attorney Darin L Wessel added to party Sonia Y Angell(pty:dft), Attorney Darin L Wessel added to party Gaven Newsom(pty:dft), Attorney Darin L Wessel added to party Tony Thurmond(pty:dft))(Wessel, Darin)
July 31, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to Amended EX PARTE APPLICATION to Exceed Page Limitation Motion Brief #14 with Certificate of Service filed by Defendant Xavier Becerra. (Attorney Darin L Wessel added to party Xavier Becerra(pty:dft))(Wessel, Darin)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 IN CHAMBERS ORDER-TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson - The stipulation by the parties to expedite the hearing to 8/17/20 is DENIED. Dkt. 18. The Court will retain the current hearing date. The application to exceed page limitations on the motion for a preliminary injunction is also DENIED. Dkt. 13; Dkt. 14. If the Court determines that additional briefing is needed, it will order supplemental briefing by the parties. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 31, 2020 Filing 24 DECLARATION OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Lacee Beaulieu, Marianna Bema, Matthew Brach, Kenneth Fleming, Roger Hackett, Brian Hawkins, Tiffany Mitrowke, Ade Onibokun, Jesse Petrilla, Z. R., a minor, Ashley Ramirez, Christine Ruiz, Erica Sephton, Alison Walsh, John Ziegler, re Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form,, #16 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123),,,, #8 , Summons Request #10 , Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV-89), #20 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Enjoin the Enforcement of Reopening CA Schools #15 , Summons Request #2 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #21 , Stipulation to Expedite,, #18 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #5 , Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form,, #19 , Summons Issued #12 , Summons Request #7 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #11 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties,, #3 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons, #6 , Summons Issued #17 served on July 31, 2020. (Meuser, Mark)
July 31, 2020 Filing 23 DECLARATION OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Lacee Beaulieu, Marianna Bema, Matthew Brach, Kenneth Fleming, Roger Hackett, Brian Hawkins, Tiffany Mitrowke, Ade Onibokun, Jesse Petrilla, Z. R., a minor, Ashley Ramirez, Christine Ruiz, Erica Sephton, Alison Walsh, John Ziegler, re Amended EX PARTE APPLICATION to Exceed Page Limitation Motion Brief #14 , EX PARTE APPLICATION to Exceed Page Limitation Motion Brief #13 served on July 30, 2020. (Meuser, Mark)
July 31, 2020 Filing 22 SCHEDULING NOTICE re: MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Enjoin the Enforcement of Reopening CA Schools #15 - The hearing previously scheduled for 08/31/2020 at 10:00 a.m. has been rescheduled to 8/31/2020 at 1:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Stephen V. Wilson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-06472 SVW(AFMx). (rn)
July 30, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Amended EX PARTE APPLICATION to Exceed Page Limitation Motion Brief #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb)
July 30, 2020 Filing 18 STIPULATION to Expedite Hearing from August 31 to August 17 filed by Plaintiffs Lacee Beaulieu, Marianna Bema, Matthew Brach, Kenneth Fleming, Roger Hackett, Brian Hawkins, Tiffany Mitrowke, Ade Onibokun, Jesse Petrilla, Z. R., a minor, Ashley Ramirez, Christine Ruiz, Erica Sephton, Alison Walsh, John Ziegler. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Mark P Meuser added to party Marianna Bema(pty:pla), Attorney Mark P Meuser added to party Brian Hawkins(pty:pla), Attorney Mark P Meuser added to party Tiffany Mitrowke(pty:pla), Attorney Mark P Meuser added to party Ade Onibokun(pty:pla), Attorney Mark P Meuser added to party Ashley Ramirez(pty:pla))(Meuser, Mark)
July 30, 2020 Filing 17 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition,, #9 as to Defendants Sonia Y Angell, Xavier Becerra, Gaven Newsom, Tony Thurmond. (shb)
July 30, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Exceed Page Limitation Motion Brief #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb)
July 30, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Enjoin the Enforcement of Reopening CA Schools filed by Plaintiffs Matthew Brach. Motion set for hearing on 8/31/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Dean D. Pregerson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF MARK MEUSER IN SUPPORT OFMOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, #2 Declaration DECLARATION OF DR. JAYANTA BHATTACHARYA IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, #3 Declaration DECLARATION OF DR. SCOTT ATLAS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, #4 Declaration DECLARATION OF DR. JAMES LYONS-WEILER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, #5 Declaration DECLARATION OF SEAN G. KAUFMAN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, #6 Declaration DECLARATION OF CHARLES CICCHETTI IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, #7 Declaration DECLARATION OF MARK MCDONALD, M.D. IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, #8 Declaration DECLARATION OF ROBERT C. HAMILTON, M.D., F.A.A.P., IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, #9 Declaration DECLARATION OF JEFF BARKE, M.D. IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, #10 Declaration DECLARATION OF COLLEEN VICTORY, M.D. IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, #11 Declaration DECLARATION OF M. KELLY SUTTON, M.D. IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, #12 Declaration DECLARATION OF RICHARD ADDISON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, #13 Declaration DECLARATION OF MARI BARKE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, #14 Declaration DECLARATION OF JAMES M. REARDON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, #15 Declaration DECLARATION OF ANNA WALKER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, #16 Declaration DECLARATION OF ALISON M. KEECH IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, #17 Declaration DECLARATION OF GEENA BURGESS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, #18 Declaration DECLARATION OF COLLEEN M. CUNNINGHAM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, #19 Declaration DECLARATION OF FR. DAMIEN GIAP IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, #20 Declaration DECLARATION OF MICHELLE GERST IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, #21 Declaration DECLARATION OF RACHELLE GOLDEN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, #22 Declaration DECLARATION OF MATTHEW BRACH IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, #23 Declaration DECLARATION OF JESSE PETRILLA IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, #24 Declaration DECLARATION OF LACEE BEAULIEU IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, #25 Declaration DECLARATION OF ERICA SEPHTON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, #26 Declaration DECLARATION OF KENENTH FLEMING IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, #27 Declaration DECLARATION OF JOHN ZEIGLER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, #28 Declaration DECLARATION OF ALISON WALSH IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, #29 Declaration DECLARATION OF ROGER HACKETT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, #30 Declaration DECLARATION OF CHRISTINE RUIZ IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, #31 Declaration DECLARATION OF MARIANNE BEMA IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, #32 Declaration DECLARATION OF ASHLEY RAMIREZ IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, #33 Declaration DECLARATION OF TIFFANY MITROWKE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, #34 Declaration DECLARATION OF ADEBUKOLA ONIBOKUN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, #35 Declaration DECLARATION OF BRIAN HAWKINS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, #36 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION) (Dhillon, Harmeet)
July 30, 2020 Filing 14 Amended EX PARTE APPLICATION to Exceed Page Limitation Motion Brief filed by Plaintiffs Matthew Brach. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1) (Dhillon, Harmeet)
July 29, 2020 Filing 13 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Exceed Page Limitation Motion Brief filed by Plaintiff Matthew Brach. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1) (Dhillon, Harmeet)
July 29, 2020 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition, #9 as to Defendants Sonia Y Angell, Xavier Becerra, Tony Thurmond. (shb)
July 29, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Dhillon, Harmeet)
July 29, 2020 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition,, #9 filed by Plaintiff Matthew Brach. (Dhillon, Harmeet)
July 29, 2020 Filing 9 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiffs Matthew Brach, Ade Onibokun, Brian Hawkins, Tiffany Mitrowke, Marianna Bema, Ashley Ramirez (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Attorney Harmeet K Dhillon added to party Marianna Bema(pty:pla), Attorney Harmeet K Dhillon added to party Ashley Ramirez(pty:pla), Attorney Harmeet K Dhillon added to party Tiffany Mitrowke(pty:pla), Attorney Harmeet K Dhillon added to party Ade Onibokun(pty:pla), Attorney Harmeet K Dhillon added to party Brian Hawkins(pty:pla))(Dhillon, Harmeet)
July 29, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Robert Edward Dunn counsel for Plaintiffs Lacee Beaulieu, Matthew Brach, Kenneth Fleming, Roger Hackett, Jesse Petrilla, Z. R., a minor, Christine Ruiz, Erica Sephton, Alison Walsh, John Ziegler. Adding Robert E. Dunn as counsel of record for Plaintiffs for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Plaintiffs. (Attorney Robert Edward Dunn added to party Lacee Beaulieu(pty:pla), Attorney Robert Edward Dunn added to party Matthew Brach(pty:pla), Attorney Robert Edward Dunn added to party Kenneth Fleming(pty:pla), Attorney Robert Edward Dunn added to party Roger Hackett(pty:pla), Attorney Robert Edward Dunn added to party Jesse Petrilla(pty:pla), Attorney Robert Edward Dunn added to party Z. R., a minor(pty:pla), Attorney Robert Edward Dunn added to party Christine Ruiz(pty:pla), Attorney Robert Edward Dunn added to party Erica Sephton(pty:pla), Attorney Robert Edward Dunn added to party Alison Walsh(pty:pla), Attorney Robert Edward Dunn added to party John Ziegler(pty:pla))(Dunn, Robert)
July 28, 2020 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons, #6 , Summons Request #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Matthew Brach. (Dhillon, Harmeet)
July 23, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jtil)
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (jtil)
July 21, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs, (Attorney Harmeet K Dhillon added to party Lacee Beaulieu(pty:pla), Attorney Harmeet K Dhillon added to party Kenneth Fleming(pty:pla), Attorney Harmeet K Dhillon added to party Roger Hackett(pty:pla), Attorney Harmeet K Dhillon added to party Jesse Petrilla(pty:pla), Attorney Harmeet K Dhillon added to party Z. R., a minor(pty:pla), Attorney Harmeet K Dhillon added to party Christine Ruiz(pty:pla), Attorney Harmeet K Dhillon added to party Erica Sephton(pty:pla), Attorney Harmeet K Dhillon added to party Alison Walsh(pty:pla), Attorney Harmeet K Dhillon added to party John Ziegler(pty:pla))(Dhillon, Harmeet)
July 21, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Matthew Brach. (Dhillon, Harmeet)
July 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27292043 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Matthew Brach. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet) (Attorney Harmeet K Dhillon added to party Matthew Brach(pty:pla))(Dhillon, Harmeet)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matthew Brach et al v. Gavin Newsom et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Brach
Represented By: Harmeet K Dhillon
Represented By: Robert Edward Dunn
Represented By: John K Adams
Represented By: Michael Alan Yoder
Represented By: Gregory Richard Michael
Represented By: Ryan J Walsh
Represented By: Amy C. Miller
Represented By: Mark P Meuser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Ruiz
Represented By: Harmeet K Dhillon
Represented By: Robert Edward Dunn
Represented By: John K Adams
Represented By: Michael Alan Yoder
Represented By: Gregory Richard Michael
Represented By: Ryan J Walsh
Represented By: Amy C. Miller
Represented By: Mark P Meuser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Sephton
Represented By: Harmeet K Dhillon
Represented By: Robert Edward Dunn
Represented By: John K Adams
Represented By: Michael Alan Yoder
Represented By: Gregory Richard Michael
Represented By: Ryan J Walsh
Represented By: Amy C. Miller
Represented By: Mark P Meuser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Hackett
Represented By: Harmeet K Dhillon
Represented By: Robert Edward Dunn
Represented By: John K Adams
Represented By: Michael Alan Yoder
Represented By: Gregory Richard Michael
Represented By: Ryan J Walsh
Represented By: Amy C. Miller
Represented By: Mark P Meuser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Fleming
Represented By: Harmeet K Dhillon
Represented By: Robert Edward Dunn
Represented By: John K Adams
Represented By: Michael Alan Yoder
Represented By: Gregory Richard Michael
Represented By: Ryan J Walsh
Represented By: Amy C. Miller
Represented By: Mark P Meuser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Petrilla
Represented By: Harmeet K Dhillon
Represented By: Robert Edward Dunn
Represented By: John K Adams
Represented By: Michael Alan Yoder
Represented By: Gregory Richard Michael
Represented By: Ryan J Walsh
Represented By: Amy C. Miller
Represented By: Mark P Meuser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lacee Beaulieu
Represented By: Harmeet K Dhillon
Represented By: Robert Edward Dunn
Represented By: John K Adams
Represented By: Michael Alan Yoder
Represented By: Gregory Richard Michael
Represented By: Ryan J Walsh
Represented By: Amy C. Miller
Represented By: Mark P Meuser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Ziegler
Represented By: Harmeet K Dhillon
Represented By: Robert Edward Dunn
Represented By: John K Adams
Represented By: Michael Alan Yoder
Represented By: Gregory Richard Michael
Represented By: Ryan J Walsh
Represented By: Amy C. Miller
Represented By: Mark P Meuser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alison Walsh
Represented By: Harmeet K Dhillon
Represented By: Robert Edward Dunn
Represented By: John K Adams
Represented By: Michael Alan Yoder
Represented By: Gregory Richard Michael
Represented By: Ryan J Walsh
Represented By: Amy C. Miller
Represented By: Mark P Meuser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Z. R., a minor
Represented By: Harmeet K Dhillon
Represented By: Robert Edward Dunn
Represented By: John K Adams
Represented By: Michael Alan Yoder
Represented By: Gregory Richard Michael
Represented By: Ryan J Walsh
Represented By: Amy C. Miller
Represented By: Mark P Meuser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ade Onibokun
Represented By: Harmeet K Dhillon
Represented By: John K Adams
Represented By: Michael Alan Yoder
Represented By: Gregory Richard Michael
Represented By: Ryan J Walsh
Represented By: Amy C. Miller
Represented By: Mark P Meuser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Hawkins
Represented By: Harmeet K Dhillon
Represented By: John K Adams
Represented By: Michael Alan Yoder
Represented By: Gregory Richard Michael
Represented By: Ryan J Walsh
Represented By: Amy C. Miller
Represented By: Mark P Meuser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Mitrowke
Represented By: Harmeet K Dhillon
Represented By: John K Adams
Represented By: Michael Alan Yoder
Represented By: Gregory Richard Michael
Represented By: Ryan J Walsh
Represented By: Amy C. Miller
Represented By: Mark P Meuser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Ramirez
Represented By: Harmeet K Dhillon
Represented By: John K Adams
Represented By: Michael Alan Yoder
Represented By: Gregory Richard Michael
Represented By: Ryan J Walsh
Represented By: Amy C. Miller
Represented By: Mark P Meuser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marianna Bema
Represented By: Harmeet K Dhillon
Represented By: John K Adams
Represented By: Michael Alan Yoder
Represented By: Gregory Richard Michael
Represented By: Ryan J Walsh
Represented By: Amy C. Miller
Represented By: Mark P Meuser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Bunshoft
Represented By: Darin L Wessel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonia Y Angell
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Bunshoft
Represented By: Darin L Wessel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Thurmond
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Bunshoft
Represented By: Darin L Wessel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaven Newsom
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Bunshoft
Represented By: Darin L Wessel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Educators for Safe School Opening
Represented By: Jeffrey Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?