John Thomas Pulskamp v. Jeffrey Macomber
Petitioner: John Thomas Pulskamp
Respondent: Jeffrey Macomber
Case Number: 2:2020cv06484
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Filing 7 Mail Returned addressed to John Thomas Pulskamp, Return To Sender, Attempted - Not Known, Unable to Forward, re Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-84) (Habeas Corpus) - optional html form, #2 (bm)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Requiring Re-Service of Order Dismissing Petitionwith Leave to Amend by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth: On July 22, 2020, the Court dismissed Petitioners habeas Petition with leave to amend because he had not used the required Central District of California habeas form. See C.D. Cal. R. 83-16.1. On July 27, however, he filed a notice of change of address, and on August 26 the dismissal order was returned as undeliverable. Accordingly, the Clerk is directed to re-serve Petitioner with the July 22 order at his new address of record, including with it a copy of the Central District's habeas form. Any amended petition is now due 30 days from the date of this order. (Attachments: #1 7/22 MO) (es)
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 Mail Returned (RTS attempted not known unable to forward) addressed to John Thomas Pulskamp BC8322 MCRP 2307 West 6th Street Los Angeles, CA 90057 re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Set/Reset Deadlines, #3 (es)
July 27, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of address Changing petitioners address to 15028 Brand Blvd Mission Hills CA 91345. Filed by Petitioner John Thomas Pulskamp. (es)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Dismissing Petition with Leave to Amend by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth: On July 17, 2020, Petitioner filed a petition for writ of habeas corpus. He did not, however, use the required Central District of California habeas form. See C.D. Cal. R. 83-16.1. The Court thus lacks some information it needs to properly screen the Petition. The Petition is therefore dismissed with leave to amend. Petitioner is warned that if he fails to file an amended petition in full compliance with this order by 30 days from the date of it, this action may be dismissed for failure to prosecute. (see document for details.) (Attachments: #1 H C Petition) (es)
July 21, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge George H. Wu and referred to Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV-111 and CV-27) (ghap)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254) Case assigned to Judge George H. Wu and referred to Magistrate Judge Jean P Rosenbluth.(Filing fee $ 5: FEE DUE.), filed by petitioner John Thomas Pulskamp. (ghap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John Thomas Pulskamp v. Jeffrey Macomber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John Thomas Pulskamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeffrey Macomber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?