Clint Eastwood et al v. Sera Labs, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Garrapata, LLC and Clint Eastwood
Defendant: Greendios a California corporation doing business as Euphoric, For Our Vets, LLC an Arizona limited liability company doing business as Patriot Supreme, Sera Labs, Inc. and Does 1-30, inclusive
Petitioner: Doe
Case Number: 2:2020cv06503
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: R Gary Klausner
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Filing 24 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Clint Eastwood, Garrapata, LLC, served on August 20, 2020. (Susman, Jordan)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 (IN CHAMBERS) Order Re: Preliminary Injunction by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's request for a preliminary injunction for the same reasons set forth in its previous Order. (ECF No. 15.) The terms of the preliminary injunction are identical to those of the previously issued TRO and are restated here as follows: Greendios (dba Euphoric), and For Our Vets, LLC (dba Patriot Supreme), and their officers, agents, employees, representatives and all persons acting in concert or participating with them, are restrained and enjoined from (1) engaging in or performing directly or indirectly the use of Clint Eastwood's name, likeness, and persona to promote and sell CBD products, and (2) disseminating false and defamatory statements that Mr. Eastwood is in the business of manufacturing, distributing, or selling CBD products. Plaintiffs shall serve a copy of this Order on all Defendants within one day of its issuance. (SEE CIVIL MINUTES FOR FURTHER SPECIFICS). (et)
August 13, 2020 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Sera Labs, Inc., identifying none. (Gershuni, Gregory)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/23/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 11/30/2020 at 9:00 am. (sw)
August 13, 2020 Filing 20 Text Only Entry: The Court has reviewed the answer filed by defendant(s) Sera Labs, Inc. (docket entry 19). Counsel shall file the required Notice of Interested Parties (LR 7-1.1) not later than 2:00 pm on August 13, 2020. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 12, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #2 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Sera Labs, Inc..(Gershuni, Gregory)
August 4, 2020 Filing 18 OPPOSITION filed by Defendant Sera Labs, Inc.. (Gershuni, Gregory)
July 29, 2020 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Clint Eastwood, Garrapata, LLC, re Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order,,, #15 served on 07/29/20. (Susman, Jordan)
July 29, 2020 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Clint Eastwood, Garrapata, LLC, re Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order,,, #15 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #2 served on 07/29/20. (Susman, Jordan)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 (IN CHAMBERS) Order Re: Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for a Temporary Restraining Order, Order to Show Cause for a Preliminary Injunction, and Order for Expedited Discovery [DE #9 ] by Judge R. Gary Klausner: Plaintiffs' Application is GRANTED as follows: Plaintiffs request for expedited discovery is GRANTED for the purpose of identifying and joining all appropriate defendants to this case. Plaintiffs may serve subpoenas and interrogatories on Defendants and third parties, and may request production of documents and tangible items. Plaintiffs' request for a temporary restraining order is GRANTED. The Court further ORDERS Defendants to show cause in writing by 8/4/2020, why a preliminary injunction should not issue on the same terms described above. Plaintiffs shall serve a copy of this Order on all Defendants within one day of its issuance. (SEE CIVIL MINUTES FOR FURTHER SPECIFICS). (jp)
July 28, 2020 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Clint Eastwood, Garrapata, LLC, re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Misuse of Name #9 served on 07/22/20. (Susman, Jordan)
July 27, 2020 Filing 13 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #2 as to Defendants For Our Vets, LLC, Greendios, Sera Labs, Inc. (jp)
July 24, 2020 Filing 12 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Misuse of Name #9 Opposition and Declaration of Nancy Duitch filed by Defendant Sera Labs, Inc.. (Attorney Gregory Boris Gershuni added to party Sera Labs, Inc.(pty:dft))(Gershuni, Gregory)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
July 23, 2020 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #2 filed by Plaintiffs Clint Eastwood, Garrapata, LLC. (Susman, Jordan)
July 23, 2020 Filing 9 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Misuse of Name filed by Plaintiffs Clint Eastwood, Garrapata, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Exhibit Bernstein Ex1, #5 Declaration, #6 Exhibit Susman Ex1, #7 Exhibit Susman Ex2, #8 Exhibit Susman Ex3, #9 Exhibit Susman Ex4, #10 Exhibit Susman Ex5, #11 Exhibit Susman Ex6, #12 Exhibit Susman Ex7, #13 Exhibit Susman Ex8, #14 Exhibit Susman Ex9, #15 Exhibit Susman Ex10, #16 Exhibit Susman Ex11, #17 Exhibit Susman Ex12, #18 Exhibit Susman Ex13, #19 Exhibit Susman Ex15, #20 Exhibit Susman Ex16, #21 Exhibit Susman Ex17, #22 Exhibit Susman Ex18, #23 Proposed Order, #24 Susman Ex14) (Susman, Jordan)
July 23, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #3 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (et)
July 23, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
July 23, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (et)
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Clint Eastwood, Garrapata, LLC. (Susman, Jordan)
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Susman, Jordan)
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #2 filed by plaintiffs Clint Eastwood, Garrapata, LLC. (Susman, Jordan)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($400 paid on 07/22/2020, receipt number 27304896), filed by plaintiffs Clint Eastwood, Garrapata, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit) (Attorney Jordan David Susman added to party Clint Eastwood(pty:pla), Attorney Jordan David Susman added to party Garrapata, LLC(pty:pla))(Susman, Jordan)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Clint Eastwood, Garrapata, LLC. (Susman, Jordan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clint Eastwood et al v. Sera Labs, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greendios a California corporation doing business as Euphoric
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: For Our Vets, LLC an Arizona limited liability company doing business as Patriot Supreme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sera Labs, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Boris Gershuni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-30, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garrapata, LLC
Represented By: Jordan David Susman
Represented By: Margo J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clint Eastwood
Represented By: Jordan David Susman
Represented By: Margo J Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?