Ulivardo Avalos v. Andrew M. Saul
Plaintiff: Ulivardo Avalos
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Case Number: 2:2020cv06602
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ulivardo Avalos, upon Defendant Andrew M Saul served on 7/30/2020, answer due 9/28/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Leidner, Suzanne)
August 12, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV20-6602 SHK on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
August 11, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Ulivardo Avalos. (Leidner, Suzanne)
August 11, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Andrew M Saul. (Attorney Stacy Wiesbrock added to party Andrew M Saul(pty:dft))(Wiesbrock, Stacy)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN upon filing of the complaint by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (dc)
July 24, 2020 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to dft Andrew M Saul. (dc)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani: granting #5 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (dc)
July 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (jtil)
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Ulivardo Avalos. (Leidner, Suzanne)
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Ulivardo Avalos. (Leidner, Suzanne)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Ulivardo Avalos, (Leidner, Suzanne)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Ulivardo Avalos. (Leidner, Suzanne)
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by plaintiff Ulivardo Avalos. (Attorney Suzanne C Leidner added to party Ulivardo Avalos(pty:pla))(Leidner, Suzanne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ulivardo Avalos v. Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ulivardo Avalos
Represented By: Suzanne C Leidner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Stacy Wiesbrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?