Sonika Flournoy v. Watts Healthcare Corporation, et al
Plaintiff: Sonika Flournoy
Defendant: Does 1 to 100, inclusive and Watts Healthcare Corporation
Case Number: 2:2020cv06607
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Steve Kim
Referring Judge: R Gary Klausner
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Case #12 , calendared for hearing on September 21, 2020 has been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. The Court will issue a ruling after full consideration of properly submitted pleadings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT(S) by Judge R. Gary Klausner: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Reply #15 , for the following reasons: Reply was due on 9/4/2020 (See Standing Order at #10 ). Document contains singlespaced text. LR 11-3.6. (jp)
September 7, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Sonika Flournoy, (Burton, Anwar)
September 7, 2020 Filing 15 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER DATED ON 9/9/2020, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. #17 ] - REPLY In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #12 filed by Plaintiff Sonika Flournoy. (Burton, Anwar) Modified on 9/9/2020 (jp).
August 31, 2020 Filing 14 OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO REMAND THE ACTION TO STATE COURT Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #12 filed by Defendant Watts Healthcare Corporation. (Peterson, Leah)
August 25, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: (1) No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. (2) Counsel must comply with Local Rule 7.1-1. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (jp)
August 21, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Sonika Flournoy. Motion set for hearing on 9/21/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Proposed Order) (Burton, Anwar)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/9/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 11/16/2020 at 9:00 am. (sw)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
July 24, 2020 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Watts Healthcare Corporation, re Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #8 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #7 served on 07/24/2020. (Peterson, Leah)
July 24, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
July 24, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (esa)
July 24, 2020 Filing 6 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Watts Healthcare Coporation, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 , Notice of Related Case(s) #5 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 served on 7/24/2020. (Peterson, Leah)
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Watts Healthcare Coporation. (Peterson, Leah)
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Watts Healthcare Coporation, identifying Sonika Flournoy; Watts Healthcare Corporation. (Peterson, Leah)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Watts Healthcare Coporation identifying none as Corporate Parent. (Peterson, Leah)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Watts Healthcare Coporation. (Peterson, Leah)
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 20STCV08186 Receipt No: ACACDC-27347617 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Watts Healthcare Coporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Dec of Kenny Yip ISO Removal and Exhibit A, #2 Declaration Dec of Leah Peterson ISO Removal, #3 Exhibit Ex A to Dec of LEP, #4 Exhibit Ex B to Dec of LEP, #5 Exhibit Ex C to Dec of LEP, #6 Exhibit Ex D to Dec of LEP, #7 Exhibit Ex E to Dec of LEP, #8 Exhibit Ex F to Dec of LEP, #9 Exhibit Ex G to Dec of LEP, #10 Exhibit Ex H to Dec of LEP, #11 Exhibit Ex I to Dec of LEP, #12 Exhibit Ex J to Dec of LEP, #13 Exhibit Ex K to Dec of LEP, #14 Exhibit Ex L to Dec of LEP) (Attorney Leah Elizabeth Peterson added to party Watts Healthcare Coporation(pty:dft))(Peterson, Leah)
July 24, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant Watts Healthcare Corporation. (filed in state court 7/23/20, submitted as document 1, attachment 14)(esa)
July 24, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, Watts Healthcare Corporation, Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Sonika Flournoy. (filed in state court 3/2/20, submitted as document 1, attachment 3) (esa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sonika Flournoy v. Watts Healthcare Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonika Flournoy
Represented By: Joseph Lavi
Represented By: Anwar Dillon-Thomas Burton
Represented By: James Y. Yoo
Represented By: Vincent Charles Granberry
Represented By: James Y Yoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watts Healthcare Corporation
Represented By: Alecia W Winfield
Represented By: Leah Elizabeth Peterson
Represented By: Brandie N Charles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?