Laura Koppes v. Pixels.com, LLC
Plaintiff: Laura Koppes
Defendant: Pixels.com, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv06659
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John E McDermott
Referring Judge: Dean D Pregerson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Counsel are encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. The address ishttp://www.cacd.uscourts.gov. It is not necessary to clear a motion date with the Court Clerk prior to filing the motion. The Court hears motions only on Mondays at 10:00 a.m. See order for further details. (shb)
August 18, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #8 by Clerk of Court. The document is stricken. Summons previously issued see dkt no 8. (shb)
August 13, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Summons Request #9 . The following error(s) was/were found: The summons has already been issued. See document 8. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb)
August 12, 2020 Filing 9 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN 8-18-2020]. Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiff Laura Koppes. (Dukelow, Owen) Modified on 8/18/2020 (shb).
July 27, 2020 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Pixels.com, LLC. (lh)
July 27, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
July 27, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (lh)
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Laura Koppes, (Dukelow, Owen)
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiff Laura Koppes. (Dukelow, Owen)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Laura Koppes. (Dukelow, Owen)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Laura Koppes. (Dukelow, Owen)
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27355497 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Laura Koppes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Complaint Copyright Registrations, #2 Exhibit 2 to Complaint First Notice to Pixels of Copyright and Trademark Infringement, #3 Exhibit 3 to Complaint Example of Infringement by Defendant, #4 Exhibit 4 to Complaint Acknowledgement of Receipt by DMCA account of Defendant of Notice of Infringement, #5 Exhibit 5 to Complaint Second Notice of Infringement, #6 Exhibit 6 to Complaint Additional Examples of Infringement) (Attorney Owen W Dukelow added to party Laura Koppes(pty:pla))(Dukelow, Owen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laura Koppes v. Pixels.com, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Koppes
Represented By: Owen W Dukelow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pixels.com, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?