Highland Capital Brokerage, Inc. v. Simon Owen
Plaintiff: Highland Capital Brokerage, Inc.
Defendant: Simon Owen
Case Number: 2:2020cv06739
Filed: July 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Maria A Audero
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [FRCP 16, 26(f)] ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. (Scheduling Conference set for 11/9/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Percy Anderson.) (mrgo)
September 9, 2020 Filing 13 CROSSCLAIM against Plaintiff & Cross-Defendant Highland Capital Brokerage, Inc.; YES, filed by Defendant & Cross-Complainant Simon Owen.(Mayes, Jeffrey)
September 9, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against Highland Capital Brokerage, Inc. filed by Defendant Simon Owen.(Attorney Jeffrey Clayton Mayes added to party Simon Owen(pty:dft))(Mayes, Jeffrey)
August 20, 2020 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Highland Capital Brokerage, Inc., served on August 19, 2020. (Wickham, Douglas)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. Both the Court and the attorneys bear responsibility for the progress of litigation in the Federal Courts. To secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action, Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, all counsel are ordered to familiarize themselves with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of the Central District of California. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. Service of the Complaint: The Plaintiff shall promptly serve the Complaint in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and file the proofs of service pursuant to Local Rule 5-3.1. 2. Presence of Lead Counsel: Lead trial counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including all status and settlement conferences. See order for further details. (shb)
July 29, 2020 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Simon Owen. (lh)
July 29, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
July 29, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (lh)
July 28, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Highland Capital Brokerage, Inc. identifying Advisor Group, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Wickham, Douglas)
July 28, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Highland Capital Brokerage, Inc.. (Wickham, Douglas)
July 28, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Highland Capital Brokerage, Inc., (Wickham, Douglas)
July 28, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Highland Capital Brokerage, Inc.. (Wickham, Douglas)
July 28, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Highland Capital Brokerage, Inc.. (Wickham, Douglas)
July 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27391532 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Highland Capital Brokerage, Inc.. (Attorney Douglas A Wickham added to party Highland Capital Brokerage, Inc.(pty:pla))(Wickham, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Highland Capital Brokerage, Inc. v. Simon Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Highland Capital Brokerage, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas A Wickham
Represented By: Pejmon Dustin Bodaghi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simon Owen
Represented By: Jeffrey Clayton Mayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?