Barry Rosen v. Invaluable, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Barry Rosen
Defendant: Igal Moaz, INVALUABLE, LLC, Igal Moaz an individual also known as Igal M. Atelier doing business as Igal M. Atelier, Does 1-10 and Igal M. Atelier
Case Number: 2:2020cv06756
Filed: July 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alka Sagar
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Filing 18 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Igal Moaz an individual also known as Igal M. Atelier doing business as Igal M. Atelier. (mrgo)
September 24, 2020 Filing 17 AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Plaintiff Barry Rosen. Amendment to Deficiency - Default /Default Judgment (CV-52b) - optional html form, #16 Second Application for Entry of Default Against Defendant, Igal Moaz AKA Igal M. Atelier (Attachments: #1 Declaration Adam I. Gafni, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Declaration Fiona Snoxell, #5 Exhibit 1)(Gafni, Adam)
September 23, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: APPLICATION for Clerk to Enter Default against Igal Moaz Igal Moaz #15 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as: Proof of Service is lacking required information. Requesting party shall file a new Request/Application with noted deficiencies corrected in order to have default reconsidered. The return receipt(s) are missing. (mrgo)
September 22, 2020 Filing 15 APPLICATION for Clerk to Enter Default against Igal Moaz Igal Moaz filed by Barry Rosen Barry Rosen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1 of Declaration) (Gafni, Adam)
August 31, 2020 Filing 14 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Invaluable, LLC a Delaware limited liability company. (mrgo)
August 31, 2020 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Defendant Barry Rosen, upon Defendant Igal Moaz served on 8/29/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Igal Moaz in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service by mail and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Gafni, Adam)
August 29, 2020 Filing 12 First APPLICATION for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant Invaluable, LLC filed by plaintiff Barry Rosen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Application for Entry of Default) (Gafni, Adam)
August 12, 2020 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Barry Rosen, upon Defendant Invaluable, LLC served on 8/7/2020, answer due 8/28/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kacy Bassignani, Director of People Operations, Person designated to except service for Invaluable, LLC in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Gafni, Adam)
August 6, 2020 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendants Invaluable, LLC, Igal Moaz. (mrgo)
August 4, 2020 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Barry Rosen Barry Rosen. (Gafni, Adam)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
July 30, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Barry Rosen All Plaintiffs, (Gafni, Adam)
July 30, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (car)
July 30, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
July 30, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (car)
July 28, 2020 Filing 3 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Barry Rosen. (Gafni, Adam)
July 28, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Barry Rosen. (Gafni, Adam)
July 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27394363 - Fee: $400, filed by Barry Rosen Barry Rosen. (Attorney Adam I Gafni added to party Barry Rosen(pty:pla))(Gafni, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barry Rosen v. Invaluable, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Igal Moaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INVALUABLE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Igal Moaz an individual also known as Igal M. Atelier doing business as Igal M. Atelier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Igal M. Atelier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Rosen
Represented By: Adam I Gafni
Represented By: Jamie Fountain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?