Maria Elena Velez Guerra v. Crescent Hotels and Resort, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Maria Elena Velez-Guerra
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, Inclusive, Crescent Hotels & Resort, LLC dba Four Points By Sheraton LAX and Crescent Hotels and Resort, LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as Four Points By Sheraton LAX
Case Number: 2:2020cv06861
Filed: July 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Patrick J Walsh
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ASSOCIATED DATES by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Upon Stipulation #21 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Jury Trial is continued to 1/18/2022 08:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. Final Pretrial Conference is continued to 12/14/2021 02:00 PM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. See document for further details. (gk)
April 13, 2021 Filing 21 Joint STIPULATION to Reschedule Trial and Associated Dates filed by Plaintiff Maria Elena Velez-Guerra. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation to Continue Trial and Associated Dates)(Nalbandyan, Akop)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - ORDER RE PLAINTIFF MARIA ELENA VELEZ-GUERRA'S MOTION TO REMAND #10 by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Based on the foregoing, Defendant has demonstrated that the Court has diversity jurisdiction over this action because the amount in controversy exceeds the jurisdictional minimum of $75,000. Plaintiff's MTR is therefore DENIED. (lom)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 7/19/2021. Joint status report re settlement due by 7/26/2021. (gk)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/17/2021 02:00 PM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. Jury Trial set for 9/14/2021 08:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. See document for further details. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates) (gk)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court finds that Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Removed Action to State Court and Request for Expenses and Fee's Pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1447 #10 presently scheduled for hearing on October 9, 2020, is appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); C.D. L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, the motion is taken UNDER SUBMISSION and the hearing is vacated. Further, the scheduling conference on October 9, 2020 is also VACATED. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 25, 2020 Filing 16 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #10 filed by Plaintiff Maria Elena Velez-Guerra. (Nalbandyan, Akop)
September 18, 2020 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #10 Opposition filed by Defendant Crescent Hotels and Resort, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-G)(Jimenez, Jack)
September 18, 2020 Filing 14 Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #10 filed by Defendant Crescent Hotels and Resort, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Jimenez, #2 Exhibit H)(Jimenez, Jack)
September 11, 2020 Filing 13 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 Days, filed by Defendant Crescent Hotels and Resort, LLC.. (Jimenez, Jack)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee. The Court hereby continues the scheduling conference #8 from September 25, 2020 to October 9, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 9, 2020 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #10 filed by Plaintiff Maria Elena Velez-Guerra. (Nalbandyan, Akop)
September 9, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Maria Elena Velez-Guerra. Motion set for hearing on 10/9/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of La Rita Turner in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Removed Action to State Court, #2 Proposed Order RE: Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Removed Action to State Court) (Nalbandyan, Akop)
August 12, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Maria Elena Velez-Guerra, identifying Maria Elena Velez-Guerra and Crescent Hotels & Resorts, LLC dba Four Points by Sheraton LAX. (Nalbandyan, Akop)
August 11, 2020 Filing 8 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, 26(f)] by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/11/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 9/25/2020 at 9:30 a.m. (See order for details.) (kti)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
August 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick to Judge Dolly M. Gee for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick J Walsh. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:20-cv-06861 DMG (PJWx). (esa)
August 10, 2020 Filing 5 DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Defendant Crescent Hotels and Resort, LLC. (Jimenez, Jack)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INTIAL ORDER RE CASE MANAGEMENT by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (sp)
August 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet and Notice of Interested Parties should have been filed under separate events, not as attachments to the complaint. Please utilize CM/ECF resources such as the search tool to locate the appropriate events for filing. No further action is required unless directed by the Court. (jtil)
August 3, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (Attachments: #1 CV11C) (jtil)
July 30, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Crescent Hotels and Resort, LLC in Los Angeles Superior Court on 7/29/2020, attached as Exhibit 3. (jtil) Modified on 8/3/2020 (jtil).
July 30, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Maria Elena Velez Guerra in Los Angeles Superior Court on 6/4/2020, attached as Exhibit 2. (jtil)
July 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 20STCV21149 Receipt No: ACACDC-27431655 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Crescent Hotels & Resort, LLC dba Four Points By Sheraton LAX. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Answer, #4 Certificate of Interested Entities, #5 Declaration of Miller, #6 Declaration of Pearson, #7 Declaration of Jimenez, #8 Exhibits 1 - 8 to Dec of Jimenez) (Attorney Jack E Jimenez, Jr added to party Crescent Hotels & Resort, LLC dba Four Points By Sheraton LAX(pty:dft))(Jimenez, Jack)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maria Elena Velez Guerra v. Crescent Hotels and Resort, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crescent Hotels & Resort, LLC dba Four Points By Sheraton LAX
Represented By: Jack E Jimenez, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crescent Hotels and Resort, LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as Four Points By Sheraton LAX
Represented By: Jack E Jimenez, Jr
Represented By: William C Sung
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Ranen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Elena Velez-Guerra
Represented By: La Rita R Turner
Represented By: Akop Jacob Nalbandyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?