Brian Whitaker v. Hershenson Investments, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Brian Whitaker
Defendant: Does 1-10, MK 90210, Inc. and Hershenson Investments, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv06872
Filed: July 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver to Judge George H. Wu for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:20-cv-06872 GW(JPRx). (rn)
September 23, 2020 Filing 12 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Hershenson Investments, LLC answer now due 10/21/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Hershenson Investments, LLC.(Attorney Nathan Meyer added to party Hershenson Investments, LLC(pty:dft))(Meyer, Nathan)
September 17, 2020 Filing 11 First STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Defendant MK 90210, Inc..(Attorney Desiree Bassir added to party MK 90210, Inc.(pty:dft))(Bassir, Desiree)
September 14, 2020 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, upon Defendant Hershenson Investments, LLC served on 9/12/2020, answer due 10/5/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Carrie Klein, in charge of the office in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
September 8, 2020 Filing 9 REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (dml)
August 28, 2020 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, upon Defendant MK 90210, Inc. served on 8/28/2020, answer due 9/18/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Alex Doe - manager at California Pita in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
August 5, 2020 Filing 7 STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Price, Dennis)
August 4, 2020 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Hershenson Investments, LLC, MK 90210, Inc. (et)
August 4, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (Attachments: #1 CV11C Statement of Consent) (et)
July 31, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Handy, Russell)
July 31, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, (Handy, Russell)
July 31, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Handy, Russell)
July 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27438511 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Brian Whitaker(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brian Whitaker v. Hershenson Investments, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MK 90210, Inc.
Represented By: Desiree Bassir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hershenson Investments, LLC
Represented By: Nathan Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Whitaker
Represented By: Russell C Handy
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Represented By: Amanda Lockhart Seabock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?