Edgardo Carrillo v. Shewak and Lajwanti Holdings, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Edgardo Carrillo
Defendant: Does 1-10, Apex Cabinet Depot Inc, Shewak & Lajwanti Holdings LLC and Shewak and Lajwanti Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv06873
Filed: July 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John F Walter
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Shewak and Lajwanti Holdings, LLC #18 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as: Answer and/or Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Motion to Dismiss on file. (iv)
September 22, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Shewak and Lajwanti Holdings, LLC.(Prince, Miles)
September 22, 2020 Filing 18 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Shewak and Lajwanti Holdings, LLC filed by Plaintiff Edgardo Carrillo. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amanda Seabock, #2 Proof of Service) (Seabock, Amanda)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Denying #14 APPLICATION to Stay Case re Early Mediation ADA Disability Access Litigation. (iv)
September 10, 2020 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Edgardo Carrillo, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #13 served on 9/10/2020. (Handy, Russell)
September 10, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Shewak and Lajwanti Holdings, LLC, identifying Shewak & Lajwanti Holdings, LLC. (Prince, Miles)
September 10, 2020 Filing 14 APPLICATION to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation, filed by defendant Shewak and Lajwanti Holdings, LLC. (Attorney Miles L Prince added to party Shewak and Lajwanti Holdings, LLC(pty:dft)) (Prince, Miles)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
September 8, 2020 Filing 12 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Apex Cabinet Depot Inc, a California Corporation (yl)
September 8, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson to Judge John F. Walter for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:20-cv-06873 JFW(MRWx). (rn)
September 3, 2020 Filing 10 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Apex Cabinet Depot Inc filed by Plaintiff Edgardo Carrillo. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proof of Service) (Seabock, Amanda)
August 20, 2020 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Edgardo Carrillo, upon Defendant Shewak and Lajwanti Holdings, LLC served on 8/20/2020, answer due 9/10/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gina Manwani- Assistant Manager in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
August 14, 2020 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Edgardo Carrillo, upon Defendant Apex Cabinet Depot Inc served on 8/12/2020, answer due 9/2/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: Peiyan Sun (Bryan Tran the manager ) in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
August 5, 2020 Filing 7 STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Plaintiff Edgardo Carrillo. (Price, Dennis)
August 3, 2020 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Apex Cabinet Depot Inc, Shewak and Lajwanti Holdings, LLC. (et)
August 3, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (Attachments: #1 CV11C Statement of Consent) (et)
July 31, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Edgardo Carrillo. (Handy, Russell)
July 31, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Edgardo Carrillo, (Handy, Russell)
July 31, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Edgardo Carrillo. (Handy, Russell)
July 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27439889 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Edgardo Carrillo. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Edgardo Carrillo(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edgardo Carrillo v. Shewak and Lajwanti Holdings, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apex Cabinet Depot Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shewak & Lajwanti Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shewak and Lajwanti Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Miles L Prince
Represented By: David L Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgardo Carrillo
Represented By: Russell C Handy
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Represented By: Amanda Lockhart Seabock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?