Carmen John Perri v. Kenneth F. Morgan III, et al
Plaintiff: Carmen John Perri
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive, Callan Morgan Irvin and Kenneth F. Morgan, III
Case Number: 2:2020cv06878
Filed: July 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: John A Kronstadt
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Carmen John Perri, upon Defendant Callan Morgan Irvin(individually and as trustee of the Grandchildren's Trust U/W of Earl F. Callan) served on 9/3/2020, answer due 9/24/2020; Kenneth F. Morgan, III(individually and as trustee of the Betty Morgan Trust U/W of Earl F. Callan) served on 9/3/2020, answer due 9/24/2020. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Manning, Joseph)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (pbl)
July 31, 2020 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants Callan Morgan Irvin(individually and as trustee of the Betty Morgan Trust U/W of Earl F. Callan), Kenneth F. Morgan, III(individually and as trustee of the Betty Morgan Trust U/W of Earl F. Callan). (esa)
July 31, 2020 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants Callan Morgan Irvin(individually and as trustee of the Grandchildren's Trust U/W of Earl F. Callan), Kenneth F. Morgan, III(individually and as trustee of the Grandchildren's Trust U/W of Earl F. Callan). (esa)
July 31, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
July 31, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (esa)
July 31, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff CARMEN JOHN PERRI, an individual,. (Manning, Joseph)
July 31, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff CARMEN JOHN PERRI, an individual,. (Manning, Joseph)
July 31, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff CARMEN JOHN PERRI, an individual,. (Manning, Joseph)
July 31, 2020 Filing 2 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff CARMEN JOHN PERRI, an individual,, (Manning, Joseph)
July 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27440918 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff CARMEN JOHN PERRI, an individual,. (Attorney Joseph Richard Manning, Jr added to party CARMEN JOHN PERRI, an individual, (pty:pla))(Manning, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carmen John Perri v. Kenneth F. Morgan III, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Callan Morgan Irvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth F. Morgan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen John Perri
Represented By: Joseph Richard Manning, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?