Louise M Preddy v. Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.
Plaintiff: Louise M Preddy
Defendant: Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2020cv06906
Filed: July 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Scheduling Conference set for 11/9/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (pbl)
September 24, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (wm)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
September 21, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon to Judge Philip S. Gutierrez for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:20-cv-06906 PSG(Ex). (rn)
September 18, 2020 Filing 12 DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.. (Manasantivongs, Alisa)
September 18, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Alisa Manasantivongs counsel for Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.. Adding Alisa Manasantivongs as counsel of record for Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.. (Attorney Alisa Manasantivongs added to party Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.(pty:dft))(Manasantivongs, Alisa)
September 18, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Lisa M Conner counsel for Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.. Adding Alisa Manasantivongs as counsel of record for Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.. (Conner, Lisa)
September 18, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd., identifying Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.; Carnival Corporation & plc; The United Kingdom Mutual Steamship Assurance Association (Europe) Limited. (Conner, Lisa)
September 18, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd..(Attorney Lisa M Conner added to party Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.(pty:dft))(Conner, Lisa)
September 2, 2020 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Louise M Preddy, upon Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. served on 8/28/2020, answer due 9/18/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon GABRIELLA SANCHEZ, c/o CT CORPORATION, AGENT FOR SERVICE in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Naylor, Charles)
August 4, 2020 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. (car)
August 4, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (car)
July 31, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Louise M Preddy, (Naylor, Charles)
July 31, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Louise M Preddy. (Naylor, Charles)
July 31, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Louise M Preddy. (Naylor, Charles)
July 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27445240 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Louise M Preddy. (Attorney Charles D Naylor added to party Louise M Preddy(pty:pla))(Naylor, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Louise M Preddy v. Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louise M Preddy
Represented By: Charles D Naylor
Represented By: Aksana Moshaiv Coone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.
Represented By: Lisa M Conner
Represented By: Alisa Manasantivongs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?