Minden Pictures, Inc. v. Cartan Tours, Inc.
Plaintiff: Minden Pictures, Inc.
Defendant: Cartan Tours, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv06912
Filed: July 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Filing 14 Supplemental Certification and Notice of Interested Parties of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Cartan Tours, Inc., (Niemi, Michael)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. PLEASE READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. Scheduling Conference set for 12/3/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (iv)
September 10, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Certification and Notice of Interested Parties should have been filed as a separate document using correct event, Civil Events - Other Filings - Notices -Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (iv)
September 9, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Cartan Tours, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Interested Parties, #2 Proof of Service)(Attorney Michael D Niemi added to party Cartan Tours, Inc.(pty:dft))(Niemi, Michael)
August 11, 2020 Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 4, 2020 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Cartan Tours, Inc. (et)
August 4, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
August 4, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (et)
July 31, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Minden Pictures, Inc., (Grossbardt, Jonah)
July 31, 2020 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Minden Pictures, Inc.. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
July 31, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Minden Pictures, Inc. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
July 31, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Minden Pictures, Inc.. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
July 31, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Minden Pictures, Inc.. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
July 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27446074 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Minden Pictures, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Attorney Jonah Adam Grossbardt added to party Minden Pictures, Inc.(pty:pla))(Grossbardt, Jonah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Minden Pictures, Inc. v. Cartan Tours, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minden Pictures, Inc.
Represented By: Jonah Adam Grossbardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cartan Tours, Inc.
Represented By: Katherine Mira Hofmann
Represented By: Michael D Niemi
Represented By: H Michael Soroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?