Weststar Relocation, Inc. v. Xavier Becerra
Plaintiff: WESTSTAR RELOCATION INC and Weststar Relocation, Inc.
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Case Number: 2:2020cv06915
Filed: July 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Weststar Relocation, Inc.. upon Xavier Becerra waiver sent by Plaintiff on 8/5/2020, answer due 10/5/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Leslie R. Lopez, Deputy Attorney General on behalf of Attorney General Xavier Becerra. (Nadel, Jeffrey)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
August 4, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Disclosure #4 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): The incorrect event was selected in the e-filing of the Certification and Notice of Interested Parties. The Clerk has modified the docket to reflect the true name of the document. In the future please use the correct event located under Civil Events Other Filings Notices and by selecting Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties. (car)
August 4, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Xavier Becerra. (car)
August 4, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
August 4, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (car)
July 31, 2020 Filing 4 [CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES] Filed as DISCLOSURE re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Plaintiff WESTSTAR RELOCATION INC (Nadel, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/4/2020 (car).
July 31, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by PLAINTIFF WESTSTAR RELOCATION INC. (Nadel, Jeffrey)
July 31, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff WESTSTAR RELOCATION INC. (Nadel, Jeffrey)
July 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27446661 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff WESTSTAR RELOCATION INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Max 4 Tariff, #2 Exhibit B - DOT Profile for Plaintiff) (Attorney Jeffrey D Nadel added to party WESTSTAR RELOCATION INC(pty:pla))(Nadel, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weststar Relocation, Inc. v. Xavier Becerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WESTSTAR RELOCATION INC
Represented By: Jeffrey D Nadel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Weststar Relocation, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey D Nadel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?