Brendem Plong et al v. BM Realestate Services Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Brendem Plong and Mareine M. Plong
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., BM Realestate Services Inc., MERS, Goldman Sachs and Co., MTGLQ Investors, LP, Chicaco Title Company, Does 1 through 10 Inclusive, Rushmore Loan Management Service LLC and Clear Recon Corp
Case Number: 2:2020cv06999
Filed: August 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Referring Judge: John W Holcomb
2 Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Filing 48 This action has been reassigned to the Honorable John W. Holcomb, United States District Judge. Judge Holcomb is located in Courtroom 2, on the 2nd Floor of the George E. Brown, Jr. Federal Building and United States Courthouse at 3470 Twelfth Street, Riverside, California 92501. Additional information regarding Judge Holcomb's procedures and schedules is available on the court's website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 25, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Goldman Sachs and Co., identifying The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc.. (Haist, Frederick)
September 25, 2020 Filing 46 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Goldman Sachs and Co. identifying The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Haist, Frederick)
September 25, 2020 Filing 45 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss defendant Goldman Sachs and Co. #44 filed by Defendant Goldman Sachs and Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-20)(Haist, Frederick)
September 25, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss defendant Goldman Sachs and Co. filed by defendant Goldman Sachs and Co.. Motion set for hearing on 11/9/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Haist, Frederick)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#20-102) approved by Chief Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF THE CALENDAR of Judge John W. Holcomb, this case is transferred from Judge Philip S. Gutierrez to the calendar of Judge John W. Holcomb for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-06999 JWH(AGRx). (rn)
September 21, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Mary H Haas on behalf of Defendant Goldman Sachs and Co. (Attorney Mary H Haas added to party Goldman Sachs and Co.(pty:dft))(Haas, Mary)
September 21, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Frederick A Haist on behalf of Defendant Goldman Sachs and Co. (Attorney Frederick A Haist added to party Goldman Sachs and Co.(pty:dft))(Haist, Frederick)
September 18, 2020 Filing 40 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mary H Haas counsel for Defendant MTGLQ Investors, LP. Adding Mary H. Haas as counsel of record for MTGLQ Investors, L.P. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant MTGLQ Investors, L.P.. (Attorney Mary H Haas added to party MTGLQ Investors, LP(pty:dft))(Haas, Mary)
September 14, 2020 Filing 23 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (In Chambers) by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: Based on the Court's directive, DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS #15 and PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE #21 are continued to 11/09/2020 at 1:30 p.m.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (wm) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 11, 2020 Filing 22 DECLARATION Of Brandem Plong and Mareine M. Plong, in Support Of Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant #21 filed by Plaintiff Brendem Plong. (bm)
September 11, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION To Set Aside Void Judgment And Quash Writ Of Possession, Points And Authorities, Declaration, [Proposed] Order filed by plaintiff Brendem Plong. Motion set for hearing on 10/19/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts and Supporting Evidence on Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion, #3 Proposed Order to Set Aside, #4 Proposed Order for Order to Set Aside Void Order and Judgment and Quash Writ of Possession) (bm)
September 4, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant MTGLQ Investors, LP, identifying MLQ, L.L.C.; The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc.; Goldman Sachs Global Holdings L.L.C.; Goldman Sachs Holding Company, LLC. (Haist, Frederick)
September 4, 2020 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant MTGLQ Investors, LP identifying The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Haist, Frederick)
September 3, 2020 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss defendant MTGLQ Investors, LP #17 filed by Defendant MTGLQ Investors, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-20)(Haist, Frederick)
September 3, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss defendant MTGLQ Investors, LP filed by defendant MTGLQ Investors, LP. Motion set for hearing on 11/9/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Frederick A Haist added to party MTGLQ Investors, LP(pty:dft)) (Haist, Frederick)
August 30, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Chicaco Title Company, identifying Fidelity National Title Group, parent; Fidelity National Financial, parent. (Broersma, Kevin)
August 30, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Chicaco Title Company and Proof of Service filed by Defendant Chicaco Title Company. Motion set for hearing on 11/2/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Kevin R Broersma added to party Chicaco Title Company(pty:dft)) (Broersma, Kevin)
August 26, 2020 Filing 39 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mareine M. Plong, Brendem Plong, upon Defendant Clear Recon Corp. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon signature not legible in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service by mail. Original Summons NOT returned. (bm)
August 26, 2020 Filing 38 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mareine M. Plong, Brendem Plong, upon Defendant U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. served on 8/8/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon signature not legible in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service by mail. Original Summons NOT returned. (bm)
August 26, 2020 Filing 37 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mareine M. Plong, Brendem Plong, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon (signature not legible) in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service by mail. Original Summons NOT returned. (bm)
August 26, 2020 Filing 36 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mareine M. Plong, Brendem Plong, upon Defendant MTGLQ Investors, L.P. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon (signature not legible) in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service by mail. Original Summons NOT returned. (bm) Modified on 9/17/2020 (bm).
August 26, 2020 Filing 35 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mareine M. Plong, Brendem Plong, upon Defendant Goldman Sachs and Co. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon not indicated in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service by mail. Original Summons NOT returned. (bm)
August 26, 2020 Filing 34 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mareine M. Plong, Brendem Plong, upon Defendant Goldman Sachs and Co. served on 8/10/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon not indicated in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service by mail. Original Summons NOT returned. (bm)
August 26, 2020 Filing 33 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mareine M. Plong, Brendem Plong, upon Defendant Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. served on 8/15/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon not indicated in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service by mail.Original Summons NOT returned. (bm)
August 26, 2020 Filing 32 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mareine M. Plong, Brendem Plong, upon Defendant Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. "MERS". Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon not indicated in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service by mail. Original Summons NOT returned. (bm)
August 26, 2020 Filing 31 PROOF OF SERVICE ON AN INDIVIDUAL WITHIN THE UNITED STATES Executed by Plaintiff Mareine M. Plong, Brendem Plong, upon Defendant BM Realestate Services Inc. served on 8/8/2010, answer due 8/29/2010. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon not indicated in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service. Original Summons NOT returned. (bm)
August 26, 2020 Filing 30 PROOF OF SERVICE ON AN INDIVIDUAL WITHIN THE UNITED STATES Executed by Plaintiff Mareine M. Plong, Brendem Plong, upon Defendant MTGLQ Investors, LP served on 8/8/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon not indicated in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service by mail. Original Summons NOT returned. (bm)
August 26, 2020 Filing 29 PROOF OF SERVICE ON A CORPORATION, PARTNERSHIP, OR ASSOCIATION Executed by Plaintiff Mareine M. Plong, Brendem Plong, upon Defendant Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. served on 8/13/2020, answer due 9/3/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon not indicated in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service by mail. Original Summons NOT returned. (bm) Modified on 9/16/2020 (bm).
August 26, 2020 Filing 28 PROOF OF SERVICE ON A CORPORATION, PARTNERSHIP, OR ASSOCIATION Executed by Plaintiff Mareine M. Plong, Brendem Plong, upon Defendant U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. served on 8/7/2020, answer due 8/28/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon not indicated in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service. Original Summons NOT returned. (bm) Modified on 9/16/2020 (bm).
August 26, 2020 Filing 27 PROOF OF SERVICE ON AN INDIVIDUAL WITHIN THE UNITED STATES Executed by Plaintiff Mareine M. Plong, Brendem Plong, upon Defendant Clear Recon Corp served on 8/7/2020, answer due 8/28/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon not indicated in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service by mail. Original Summons NOT returned. (bm)
August 26, 2020 Filing 26 PROOF OF SERVICE ON A CORPORATION, PARTNERSHIP, OR ASSOCIATION Executed by Plaintiff Mareine M. Plong, Brendem Plong, upon Defendant Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems served on 8/8/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon not indicated in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service by mail. Original Summons NOT returned. (bm)
August 26, 2020 Filing 25 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mareine M. Plong, Brendem Plong, upon Defendant Chicago Title Company (Originate Truestee). Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon not indicated in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service by mail. Original Summons NOT returned. (bm)
August 26, 2020 Filing 24 PROOF OF SERVICE ON AN INDIVIDUAL WITHIN THE UNITED STATES Executed by Plaintiff Mareine M. Plong, Brendem Plong, upon Defendant Chicago Title Company served on 8/10/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon not indicated in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service by mail. Original Summons NOT returned. (bm) Modified on 9/16/2020 (bm).
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTES (In Chambers): The Court DENIES the ex parte application for a temporary restraining order by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez denying #3 EX PARTE APPLICATION: For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiffs' ex parte application for a temporary restraining order is DENIED. (see document for further details) (bm)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
August 4, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
August 4, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (car)
August 4, 2020 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 as to Defendant Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems. (car)
August 4, 2020 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 as to Defendant Clear Recon Corp. (car)
August 4, 2020 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 as to Defendant U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. (car)
August 4, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 as to Defendant Goldman Sachs and Co. (car)
August 4, 2020 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 as to Defendant MTGLQ Investors, LP. (car)
August 4, 2020 Filing 5 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 as to Defendant Chicaco Title Company. (car)
August 4, 2020 Filing 4 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 as to Defendant BM Realestate Services Inc. (car)
August 4, 2020 Filing 3 RESTRAINING ORDER INJUNCTION AND MOTION TO CHALLENGE JURISDICTION IS PENDING, AND REQUEST FOR EMERGENCY HEARING ON THE MATTER filed by Plaintiffs Brendem Plong, Mareine M. Plong. (Attachments: #1 Lodged Proposed Order) (car)
August 4, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Brendem Plong, Mareine M. Plong (car)
August 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants. Case assigned to Judge Philip S. Gutierrez for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg.(Filing fee $ 400 FEE PAID) Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs Mareine M. Plong, Brendem Plong. (Attachments: #1 Part 2 of Complaint, #2 Part 3 of Complaint, #3 Part 4 of Complaint, #4 Part 5 of Complaint, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Lodged Lis Pendens) (car)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brendem Plong et al v. BM Realestate Services Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BM Realestate Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman Sachs and Co.
Represented By: Frederick A Haist
Represented By: Mary H Haas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTGLQ Investors, LP
Represented By: Frederick A Haist
Represented By: Mary H Haas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicaco Title Company
Represented By: Kevin R Broersma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rushmore Loan Management Service LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clear Recon Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brendem Plong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mareine M. Plong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?