Anton Karraa et al v. City of Los Angeles et al
Plaintiff: Rabadi Service Station, Inc., Anton Karraa, Virtual Media Group, Inc., J. Keith Stephens and CALPRO
Defendant: City of Los Angeles, Outfront Media LLC, Outfront Media, Inc. and Doe
Case Number: 2:2020cv07036
Filed: August 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Filing 25 OPPOSITION PRELIMINARY INJUCTION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Removing or Damaging Billboard #23 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Removing or Damaging Billboard #24 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Removing or Damaging Billboard #22 filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Declaration of Frank Lara iso City's Oppos)(Fong, Kenneth)
September 25, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Removing or Damaging Billboard filed by Plaintiffs CALPRO. Motion set for hearing on 10/26/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Haynes, Raymond)
September 25, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Removing or Damaging Billboard filed by Plaintiffs CALPRO. Motion set for hearing on 10/26/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Haynes, Raymond)
September 25, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Removing or Damaging Billboard filed by Plaintiffs CALPRO. Motion set for hearing on 10/26/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Haynes, Raymond)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING NOTICE/IN CHAMBERS ORDER-TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: NEW CASE STATUS CONFERENCE; #9 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant; and #12 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant - The initial status conference and motion hearing previously scheduled for 09/21/2020 at 1:30 p.m. are vacated and off-calendar. The motions are submitted. Order to issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 16, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
September 4, 2020 Filing 19 REPLY Reply NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #9 filed by Defendant Outfront Media LLC. (Davis, Allison)
September 3, 2020 Filing 18 REPLY In Support of for Judgment on the Pleadings #12 filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Fong, Kenneth)
August 31, 2020 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to for Judgment on the Pleadings #12 filed by Plaintiff CALPRO. (Haynes, Raymond)
August 31, 2020 Filing 16 Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #9 filed by Plaintiff CALPRO. (Haynes, Raymond)
August 30, 2020 Filing 15 Doe Amendment AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant All Plaintiffs amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Plaintiffs CALPRO(Haynes, Raymond)
August 26, 2020 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel filed by Plaintiffs CALPRO, Anton Karraa, Rabadi Service Station, Inc., J. Keith Stephens, Virtual Media Group, Inc. (Haynes, Raymond)
August 24, 2020 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #9 filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Fong, Kenneth)
August 24, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #9 filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fong, Kenneth) Modified on 8/25/2020 (pc).
August 19, 2020 Filing 11 SCHEDULING NOTICE - The Initial Status Conference scheduled for 10/19/2020 at 3:00 p.m. has been rescheduled to 9/21/2020 at 1:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 17, 2020 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Outfront Media LLC, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #7 served on August 17, 2020. (Davis, Allison)
August 13, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Outfront Media LLC, Outfront Media, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 9/21/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit A to RJN, #3 Proposed Order) (Attorney Allison A Davis added to party Outfront Media, Inc. (pty:dft)) (Davis, Allison)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 10/19/2020 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
August 6, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
August 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (car)
August 6, 2020 Filing 4 JOINDER filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles joining in Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 . (Fong, Kenneth)
August 5, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. Filed in State Court on 6/11/2020 Submitted with Attachment 10 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
August 5, 2020 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs, upon Defendant Outfront Media LLC acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Anthony M Leones, Counsel for Defendant. Submitted with Attachment 8 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
August 5, 2020 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT against Defendant Outfront Media LLC by Plaintiffs. Upon the filing of the complaint, the plaintiff, being ignorant of the true name of the defendant and having designated the defendant in the complaint by the fictitious name of Doe 1 and having discovered the true name of the defendant to be Outfront Media LLC amends the Complaint - (Discovery) Submitted with Attachment 6 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
August 5, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants City of Los Angeles, Doe 1 through Doe 25, Outfront Media, Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs Virtual Media Group, Inc., Rabadi Service Station, Inc., CALPRO, Anton Karraa, J. Keith Stephens. Filed in State Court on 4/27/2020 Submitted with Attachment 1 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
August 5, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Outfront Media LLC, identifying Outfront Media, Inc.. (Haas, Mary)
August 5, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Outfront Media LLC. (Haas, Mary)
August 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior, case number 20STCV15924 Receipt No: ACACDC-27506129 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Outfront Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex 2 - Summons, #3 Exhibit Ex 3 - Civil Case Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit Ex 4 - Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum, #5 Exhibit Ex 5 - Notice of Assignment, #6 Exhibit Ex 6 - Amendment to Complaint, #7 Exhibit Ex 7 - Notice of Acknowledgment, #8 Exhibit Ex 8 - Executed Notice of Acknowledgment, #9 Exhibit Ex 9 - Notice of Case Management Conference, #10 Exhibit Ex 10 - Answer - City of Los Angeles) (Attorney Mary H Haas added to party Outfront Media LLC(pty:dft))(Haas, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anton Karraa et al v. City of Los Angeles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Los Angeles
Represented By: Kenneth T Fong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Outfront Media LLC
Represented By: Mary H Haas
Represented By: Arthur F Coon
Represented By: Anthony M Leones
Represented By: Allison A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Outfront Media, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe
Represented By: Mary H Haas
Represented By: Arthur F Coon
Represented By: Anthony M Leones
Represented By: Allison A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rabadi Service Station, Inc.
Represented By: Raymond N Haynes, Jr
Represented By: David R Simmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anton Karraa
Represented By: Raymond N Haynes, Jr
Represented By: David R Simmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virtual Media Group, Inc.
Represented By: Raymond N Haynes, Jr
Represented By: David R Simmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. Keith Stephens
Represented By: Raymond N Haynes, Jr
Represented By: David R Simmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CALPRO
Represented By: Raymond N Haynes, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?