Alexa Bates, et al v. Deva Concepts, LLC et al
Plaintiff: JENNIFER WHITCOMB, CARMEN ROSA, KIM GRAHAM, ELIZABETH BRUSS, VICKIE LEWIS, JEANNE LASHMETT, ESTHER EPSTEIN, FELICIA MONTANO, LUCY ANN BURKE, ELIANA PALMA, MARYAM TEHRANIE, EMINA ABDAGIC, GIANNA IMBRONONE, NARAYANA MONTUFAR, SUSAN CHEYNE, STELLA WARDA, MARIA GUADALUPE MORA, ROBYN ARLAN, JEANETTE TRAVIS, AMANDA WILSON, YAZMIN ALI, KRISTINA LANE, JENNIFER LONGBINE, MARITZA RIVERA, MICHELLE PHARES, GABRIELLA AGUILERA, EMMANUEL REGISTGER, ASHLEY ARACENA, DONNA HUGHES, WENDY GREGORY, MOLLY CLARK, RHONDA KOEHLER, CHRISTINA CALA, SUZANNE TILLOTSON, DIANA HASROUNI, DEAN DAMON, CANDACE STIMSON, KAALAN SCHAEFFER, TERRA ANGLIN, MEGAN TRAMA, SARAH RASHID, CHRISTINA PIERRE, KRISTEN PEDLEY, TRACI BATES, LAUREN RAGUSIN, ALEXA BATES, CHLOE CORNELL, JULIA LEHNEN, JILLIE WILLIAMS, YENNIFER CAMPOS, SHIRLEY WEISS, ROSEANNA GREGA, MARIANA GOES, KIMBERLY COUTURE, NATALIE KIKKENBORG, NATASHA HOBSON, ANNYOCELI SANTIAGO, GIGI OLIVER, NICOLE MUSCARELLA, Lauren Racusin and Emmanuel Register
Defendant: DEVA CONCEPTS, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company doing business as DevaCurl, Does 1 through 10, inclusive and Deva Concepts, LLC a Delaware Limited Liability Company doing business as DevaCurl
Case Number: 2:2020cv07050
Filed: August 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Steve Kim
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FRCP RULE 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) #19 by Judge John F. Walter. Pursuant to FRCP Rule 41(a)(1) (A)(ii), the within action is to be voluntarily dismissed in its entirety by the Court, without prejudice. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (iv)
September 3, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Alexa Bates. Dismissal is Without Prejudice. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Voluntary Dismissal of Complaint Without Prejudice)(Esensten, Robert)
August 31, 2020 Filing 18 JOINT SCHEDULING CONFERENCE REPORT of SCHEDULING CONFERENCE filed by Defendant Deva Concepts, LLC. (Tabura, Richard)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT BY NOT MORE THAN 30 DAYS #16 by Judge John F. Walter. Deva Concepts, LLC's deadline to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is extended through September 8, 2020. (iv)
August 25, 2020 Filing 16 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Deva Concepts, LLC answer now due 9/8/2020, re Complaint - (Discovery),,,, filed by Defendant Deva Concepts, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint Not More Than 30 Days)(Tabura, Richard)
August 24, 2020 Filing 15 STATEMENT of Compliance with L.R. 7-3 Prior to Filing Motions filed by Defendant Deva Concepts, LLC Joint Filing (Tabura, Richard)
August 14, 2020 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Robert L. Esensten re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #8 Lead Trial Counsel filed by Plaintiff Traci Bates. (Esensten, Robert)
August 12, 2020 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Deva Concepts, LLC re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #8 of Lead Trial Counsel filed by Defendant Deva Concepts, LLC. (Pigott, Ginger)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT BY NOT MORE THAN 30 DAYS #11 by Judge John F. Walter. Deva Concepts, LLC's deadline to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is extended through August 26, 2020. (iv)
August 11, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Deva Concepts, LLC answer now due 8/26/2020, re Complaint - (Discovery),,,, filed by Defendant Deva Concepts, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tabura, Richard)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) COURT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for September 21, 2020 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before August 31, 2020. (iv)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Otis D. Wright, II, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:20-cv-01289 ODW (RAOx) (esa)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
August 7, 2020 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ENTRY ORDER DISMISSING DOES: Pursuant to Local Rule 19-1, no complaint or petition shall be filed that includes more than ten Doe or fictitiously named parties. Accordingly, the Court hereby dismisses the action as to Doe Defendants 11 through 100, inclusive. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 6, 2020 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Deva Concepts, LLC. (Pigott, Ginger)
August 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachment 2 Civil Cover Sheet should be e-filed separately and in the correct event. The correct event is located under Civil Events Other Filings Miscellaneous Filings. (car)
August 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
August 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (car)
August 5, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Deva Concepts, LLC, Does 1 through 100, inclusive, filed by Plaintiffs Vickie Lewis, Julia Lehnen, Kim Graham, Ashley Aracena, Donna Hughes, Kimberly Couture, Alexa Bates, Dean Damon, Kristina Lane, Chloe Cornell, Lauren Racusin, Stella Warda, Gianna Imbronone, Natasha Hobson, Natalie Kikkenborg, Jennifer Whitcomb, Eliana Palma, Mariana Goes, Susan Cheyne, Amanda Wilson, Kaalan Schaeffer, Diana Hasrouni, Elizabeth Bruss, Jeanne Lashmett, Felicia Montano, Lucy Ann Burke, Megan Trama, Annyoceli Santiago, Christina Pierre, Roseanna Grega, Emmanuel Register, Yennifer Campos, Wendy Gregory, Rhonda Koehler, Terra Anglin, Candace Stimson, Gigi Oliver, Narayana Montufar, Emina Abdagic, Maryam Tehranie, Traci Bates, Jillie Williams, Kristen Pedley, Christina Cala, Carmen Rosa, Molly Clark, Suzanne Tillotson, Nicole Muscarella, Robyn Arlan, Maritza Rivera, Gabriella Aguilera, Jennifer Longbine, Shirley Weiss, Sarah Rashid, Maria Guadalupe Mora, Michelle Phares, Esther Epstein, Jeanette Travis, Yazmin Ali. Filed in State Court on 7/6/2020 Submitted with Attachment 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
August 5, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant DEVA CONCEPTS, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company doing business as DevaCurl, identifying Henkel AG & Co. KGaA, a publicly traded German corporation. (Pigott, Ginger)
August 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from California, case number 20STCV25262 Receipt No: ACACDC-27509684 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant DEVA CONCEPTS, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company doing business as DevaCurl. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Ginger Florence Heyman Pigott added to party DEVA CONCEPTS, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company doing business as DevaCurl(pty:dft))(Pigott, Ginger)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexa Bates, et al v. Deva Concepts, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIFER WHITCOMB
Represented By: Robert L Esensten
Represented By: Randi Rose Geffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARMEN ROSA
Represented By: Robert L Esensten
Represented By: Randi Rose Geffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIM GRAHAM
Represented By: Robert L Esensten
Represented By: Randi Rose Geffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH BRUSS
Represented By: Robert L Esensten
Represented By: Randi Rose Geffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VICKIE LEWIS
Represented By: Robert L Esensten
Represented By: Randi Rose Geffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEANNE LASHMETT
Represented By: Robert L Esensten
Represented By: Randi Rose Geffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTHER EPSTEIN
Represented By: Robert L Esensten
Represented By: Randi Rose Geffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FELICIA MONTANO
Represented By: Robert L Esensten
Represented By: Randi Rose Geffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUCY ANN BURKE
Represented By: Robert L Esensten
Represented By: Randi Rose Geffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIANA PALMA
Represented By: Robert L Esensten
Represented By: Randi Rose Geffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARYAM TEHRANIE
Represented By: Robert L Esensten
Represented By: Randi Rose Geffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMINA ABDAGIC
Represented By: Robert L Esensten
Represented By: Randi Rose Geffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GIANNA IMBRONONE
Represented By: Robert L Esensten
Represented By: Randi Rose Geffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NARAYANA MONTUFAR
Represented By: Robert L Esensten
Represented By: Randi Rose Geffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSAN CHEYNE
Represented By: Robert L Esensten
Represented By: Randi Rose Geffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STELLA WARDA
Represented By: Robert L Esensten
Represented By: Randi Rose Geffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA GUADALUPE MORA
Represented By: Robert L Esensten
Represented By: Randi Rose Geffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBYN ARLAN
Represented By: Robert L Esensten
Represented By: Randi Rose Geffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEANETTE TRAVIS
Represented By: Robert L Esensten
Represented By: Randi Rose Geffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMANDA WILSON
Represented By: Robert L Esensten
Represented By: Randi Rose Geffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YAZMIN ALI
Represented By: Robert L Esensten
Represented By: Randi Rose Geffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KRISTINA LANE
Represented By: Robert L Esensten
Represented By: Randi Rose Geffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIFER LONGBINE
Represented By: Robert L Esensten
Represented By: Randi Rose Geffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARITZA RIVERA
Represented By: Robert L Esensten
Represented By: Randi Rose Geffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHELLE PHARES
Represented By: Robert L Esensten
Represented By: Randi Rose Geffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GABRIELLA AGUILERA
Represented By: Robert L Esensten
Represented By: Randi Rose Geffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMMANUEL REGISTGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASHLEY ARACENA
Represented By: Robert L Esensten
Represented By: Randi Rose Geffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONNA HUGHES
Represented By: Robert L Esensten
Represented By: Randi Rose Geffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WENDY GREGORY
Represented By: Robert L Esensten
Represented By: Randi Rose Geffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOLLY CLARK
Represented By: Robert L Esensten
Represented By: Randi Rose Geffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RHONDA KOEHLER
Represented By: Robert L Esensten
Represented By: Randi Rose Geffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTINA CALA
Represented By: Robert L Esensten
Represented By: Randi Rose Geffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUZANNE TILLOTSON
Represented By: Robert L Esensten
Represented By: Randi Rose Geffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIANA HASROUNI
Represented By: Robert L Esensten
Represented By: Randi Rose Geffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEAN DAMON
Represented By: Robert L Esensten
Represented By: Randi Rose Geffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CANDACE STIMSON
Represented By: Robert L Esensten
Represented By: Randi Rose Geffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAALAN SCHAEFFER
Represented By: Robert L Esensten
Represented By: Randi Rose Geffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERRA ANGLIN
Represented By: Robert L Esensten
Represented By: Randi Rose Geffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEGAN TRAMA
Represented By: Robert L Esensten
Represented By: Randi Rose Geffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SARAH RASHID
Represented By: Robert L Esensten
Represented By: Randi Rose Geffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTINA PIERRE
Represented By: Robert L Esensten
Represented By: Randi Rose Geffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KRISTEN PEDLEY
Represented By: Robert L Esensten
Represented By: Randi Rose Geffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRACI BATES
Represented By: Robert L Esensten
Represented By: Randi Rose Geffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAUREN RAGUSIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEXA BATES
Represented By: Robert L Esensten
Represented By: Randi Rose Geffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHLOE CORNELL
Represented By: Robert L Esensten
Represented By: Randi Rose Geffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JULIA LEHNEN
Represented By: Robert L Esensten
Represented By: Randi Rose Geffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JILLIE WILLIAMS
Represented By: Robert L Esensten
Represented By: Randi Rose Geffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YENNIFER CAMPOS
Represented By: Robert L Esensten
Represented By: Randi Rose Geffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHIRLEY WEISS
Represented By: Robert L Esensten
Represented By: Randi Rose Geffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSEANNA GREGA
Represented By: Robert L Esensten
Represented By: Randi Rose Geffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIANA GOES
Represented By: Robert L Esensten
Represented By: Randi Rose Geffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIMBERLY COUTURE
Represented By: Robert L Esensten
Represented By: Randi Rose Geffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATALIE KIKKENBORG
Represented By: Robert L Esensten
Represented By: Randi Rose Geffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATASHA HOBSON
Represented By: Robert L Esensten
Represented By: Randi Rose Geffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNYOCELI SANTIAGO
Represented By: Robert L Esensten
Represented By: Randi Rose Geffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GIGI OLIVER
Represented By: Robert L Esensten
Represented By: Randi Rose Geffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICOLE MUSCARELLA
Represented By: Robert L Esensten
Represented By: Randi Rose Geffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Racusin
Represented By: Robert L Esensten
Represented By: Randi Rose Geffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmanuel Register
Represented By: Robert L Esensten
Represented By: Randi Rose Geffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEVA CONCEPTS, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company doing business as DevaCurl
Represented By: Ginger Florence Heyman Pigott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deva Concepts, LLC a Delaware Limited Liability Company doing business as DevaCurl
Represented By: Ginger Florence Heyman Pigott
Represented By: Richard R Tabura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?