Adolfo Rosales Lozano v. United States of America
Petitioner: Adolfo Rosales Lozano
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2020cv07113
Filed: August 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Filing 7 OPPOSITION filed by Respondent United States of America. (Dubois, Scott)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER Re Petitioner's Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence By a Person in Federal Custody Pursuant to 28 USC 2255 #1 by Judge R. Gary Klausner: ORDERS the government to respond to said motion no later than 8/31/2020. FURTHER ORDERS petitioners reply to be filed and served no later than 9/24/2020. The matter will be deemed submitted, and the clerk will notify the parties when the Court has reached a decision. (jp)
August 11, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of Assistant United States Attorney Scott D. Dubois on behalf of Respondent United States of America. Assistant United States Attorney Assistant 2241-2255 US Attorney LA-CR terminated. (Attorney Scott D Dubois added to party United States of America(pty:res))(Dubois, Scott)
August 11, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner for motion filed under 28 U.S.C. 2255. (ghap)
August 11, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Notice of Assignment to US District Judge (CV-17) (2241 and 2255) - optional html form #2 . Document # 2 Due to clerical error. The docket clerk docketed the Notice of Assignment CV-17 with wrong filed dated. The filed dated need to be 8/11/2020 and not 8/3/2020. (ghap)
August 3, 2020 Filing 2 [NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR ISSUED ON 8/11/2020, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. 3] NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner for motion filed under 28 U.S.C. 2255. (ghap) Modified on 8/11/2020 (ghap). Modified on 8/11/2020 (ghap).
August 3, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence pursuant to 28 USC 2255 assigned to Judge R. Gary Klausner. For docketing entries refer to CR Case # 2:18-cr-687-RGK, filed by petitioner Adolfo Rosales Lozano. (ghap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adolfo Rosales Lozano v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Scott D Dubois
Represented By: Assistant 2241-2255 US Attorney LA-CR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Adolfo Rosales Lozano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?