SFA Group LLC v. Gary M. Kaplan et al
Plaintiff: SFA Group LLC
Defendant: Amanda D Hairston, Farella Braun + Martel, Nathan P Anderson, Tyler C. Gerking, Gary M. Kaplan and Farella Braun Martel
Case Number: 2:2020cv07144
Filed: August 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: John E McDermott
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. A Scheduling Conference has been placed on calendar for February 22, 2021, at 9:00 a.m. The Conference will be held pursuant to F.R.Civ. P. 16(b). Trial counsel must be present and there are no telephonic appearances. Counsel are ordered to file a joint statement providing a brief factual summary of the case, including the claims being asserted. The parties are reminded of their obligations to disclose information and confer on a discovery plan not later than 21 days prior to the scheduling conference, and to file a joint statement with the Court not later than 14 days after they confer, as required by F.R. Civ.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Failure to comply may lead to the imposition of sanctions. Plaintiffs counsel is directed to give notice of the scheduling conference to each party that makes an initial appearance in the action after this date. (jre)
October 2, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants All Defendants, identifying Gary M. Kaplan, Esq.; Tyler C. Gerking, Esq.; Amanda D. Hairston, Esq.; Nathan P. Anderson, Esq.; and Farella Braun + Martel. (Kaplan, Gary)
October 2, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Nathan P Anderson, Farella Braun Martel, Tyler C. Gerking, Amanda D Hairston, Gary M. Kaplan.(Attorney Gary M Kaplan added to party Nathan P Anderson(pty:dft), Attorney Gary M Kaplan added to party Farella Braun Martel (pty:dft), Attorney Gary M Kaplan added to party Tyler C. Gerking(pty:dft), Attorney Gary M Kaplan added to party Amanda D Hairston(pty:dft), Attorney Gary M Kaplan added to party Gary M. Kaplan(pty:dft))(Kaplan, Gary)
August 28, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff SFA Group LLC.(Smith, Gregory)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THIS CASE. (lom)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge R. Gary Klausner for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-07144 RGK(JEMx). (rn)
August 11, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Nathan P Anderson, Farella Braun Martel, Tyler C. Gerking, Amanda D Hairston, Gary M. Kaplan. (ghap)
August 11, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
August 11, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (ghap)
August 7, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff SFA Group LLC, (Smith, Gregory)
August 7, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff SFA Group LLC. (Smith, Gregory)
August 7, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff SFA Group LLC. (Smith, Gregory)
August 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27547889 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs SFA Group LLC. (Attorney Gregory M Smith added to party SFA Group LLC(pty:pla))(Smith, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SFA Group LLC v. Gary M. Kaplan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda D Hairston
Represented By: Gary M Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farella Braun + Martel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan P Anderson
Represented By: Gary M Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler C. Gerking
Represented By: Gary M Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary M. Kaplan
Represented By: Gary M Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farella Braun Martel
Represented By: Gary M Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SFA Group LLC
Represented By: Gregory M Smith
Represented By: Patrick M Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?