Kristi Courtois v. NewRez LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kristi Courtois
Defendant: NewRez LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon fka The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Certificateholders of CWALT, Inc., Alternative Loan Trust 2007-6, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-6, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon, The Bank of New York, NewRez LLC doing business as Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing and All Persons Unknown
Case Number: 2:2020cv07164
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Pedro V Castillo
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Filing 11 Receipt of Order of Remand filed. (mrgo)
August 17, 2020 Filing 10 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court. (mrgo)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson. For the foregoing reasons, Defendants have failed to satisfy their burden of showing that diversity jurisdiction exists over this action. Accordingly, this action is hereby remanded to Los Angeles Superior Court, Case No. 20STCV22971, for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. See 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (See document for details) (mrgo)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (See document for details) (mrgo)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE Pursuant General Order 19-03 (identical case) by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, Case Management and Assignment Committee Chair. Case transferred to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson for all further proceedings. All discovery matters are transferred to Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. Case number now reads as 2:20-cv-07164 PA(PVCx). (rn)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (droj)
August 12, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments 3 Civil Cover Sheet is attached to the Notice of Removal. Each of these documents should have been filed and entered separately under its correct event/relief. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap)
August 12, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
August 12, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (ghap)
August 10, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Kristi Courtois, upon Defendant NewRez LLC served on 7/10/2020, answer due 7/31/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC-Lawyers Incorporating Sevice c/o Suzie Vang-Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 7/16/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B) (ghap)
August 10, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Kristi Courtois, upon Defendant Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. served on 7/13/2020, answer due 8/3/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System c/o Peter Cayetano-Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 7/16/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B) (ghap)
August 10, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Kristi Courtois, upon Defendant The Bank of New York Mellon served on 7/13/2020, answer due 8/3/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System c/o Peter Cayetano-Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 7/16/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B) (ghap)
August 10, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants All Persons Unknown, Claiming ANy Legal or Equitable Right, Title, Estate, Lien, Or Interest in The Property, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., NewRez LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Kristi Courtois. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 6/17/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A (ghap)
August 10, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by DEFENDANTS Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., NewRez LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon fka The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Certificateholders of CWALT, Inc., Alternative Loan Trust 2007-6, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-6, identifying Shellpoint Partners LLC; New Residential Investment Corp.; The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation; MERSCORP Holdings, Inc.; ICE Mortgage Services, LLC; Intercontinental Exchange, Inc.. (Jindal, Neeru)
August 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of Los Angeles, case number 20STCV22971 Receipt No: ACACDC-27561970 - Fee: $400, filed by DEFENDANTS Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon fka The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Certificateholders of CWALT, Inc., Alternative Loan Trust 2007-6, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-6, NewRez LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Other State Pleadings, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Neeru Jindal added to party Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Neeru Jindal added to party NewRez LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Neeru Jindal added to party The Bank of New York Mellon fka The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Certificateholders of CWALT, Inc., Alternative Loan Trust 2007-6, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-6(pty:dft))(Jindal, Neeru)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kristi Courtois v. NewRez LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NewRez LLC
Represented By: Neeru Jindal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon fka The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Certificateholders of CWALT, Inc., Alternative Loan Trust 2007-6, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-6
Represented By: Neeru Jindal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Neeru Jindal
Represented By: Pavel Ekmekchyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Pavel Ekmekchyan
Represented By: Neeru Jindal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York
Represented By: Pavel Ekmekchyan
Represented By: Neeru Jindal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NewRez LLC doing business as Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Represented By: Pavel Ekmekchyan
Represented By: Neeru Jindal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Persons Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristi Courtois
Represented By: Ronald H Freshman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?