Protective Insurance Company et al v. Iriana Insurance Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Protective Insurance Company, Express Messenger Systems, Inc. dba Ontrac and Express Messenger Systems, Inc. doing business as Ontrac
Defendant: Iriana Insurance Services, Inc., United Financial Casualty Company, H&H Courier, Inc., East Bay Courier, Inc., National General Insurance Company, John Sharifi, Johnson Lam, Dolores Alvarez, Integon Preferred Insurance Company, H and H Courier, Inc. and Dolores Zadikian
Case Number: 2:2020cv07216
Filed: August 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: John A Kronstadt
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Filing 24 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Express Messenger Systems, Inc., Protective Insurance Company, upon Defendant United Financial Casualty Company served on 8/20/2020, answer due 9/10/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corp., agent for service of process in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Williamson, John)
September 9, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Express Messenger Systems, Inc., Protective Insurance Company, upon Defendant National General Insurance Company acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 9/4/2020, answer due 9/25/2020. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Patrick Howe, Attorney for National General Insurance Co.. (Williamson, John)
September 9, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Express Messenger Systems, Inc., Protective Insurance Company, upon Defendant Integon Preferred Insurance Company acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 9/4/2020, answer due 9/25/2020. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Patrick Howe, Atorney for Integon Preferred Ins. Co.. (Williamson, John)
September 9, 2020 Filing 21 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Express Messenger Systems, Inc., Protective Insurance Company, upon Defendant East Bay Courier, Inc. served on 8/22/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Sharifi, agent of process in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Williamson, John)
September 9, 2020 Filing 20 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Express Messenger Systems, Inc., Protective Insurance Company, upon Defendant H and H Courier, Inc. served on 8/22/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Sharifi, agent of process in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Williamson, John)
September 9, 2020 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Express Messenger Systems, Inc., Protective Insurance Company, upon Defendant John Sharifi served on 8/22/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Sharifi in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Williamson, John)
September 9, 2020 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Express Messenger Systems, Inc., Protective Insurance Company, upon Defendant Dolores Alvarez served on 8/18/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Dolores Zadikian in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Williamson, John)
September 9, 2020 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Express Messenger Systems, Inc., Protective Insurance Company, upon Defendant Iriana Insurance Services, Inc. served on 8/18/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Dolores Zadikian, agent of service in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Williamson, John)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (DKT. #12 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Based on the statements in the Williamson Declaration (Dkt. #14 ) and the corresponding allegations in the First Amended Complaint (Dkt. #15 ), the Order To Show Cause Re Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Dkt. #12 ), is discharged. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pm) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 27, 2020 Filing 15 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Plaintiffs amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiffs Express Messenger Systems, Inc., Protective Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Williamson, John)
August 27, 2020 Filing 14 DECLARATION of John S. Williamson re Text Only Scheduling Notice,,, 13 filed by Plaintiffs Express Messenger Systems, Inc., Protective Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F)(Williamson, John)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (DKT. #12 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt. On August 19, 2020, the Court ordered Plaintiffs to Show Cause as to whether there is subject matter jurisdiction in this action. Dkt. #12 . Plaintiffs have made an informal inquiry to the Clerk as to whether they may file an amended complaint in lieu of a response to the Order to Show Cause as to subject matter jurisdiction. Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint without leave of Court pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1)(A). However, this will not constitute a response to the Order to Show Cause, which Plaintiffs shall file simultaneously with the amended complaint. As stated in the Order to Show Cause, the jurisdictional issue is a narrow one, which may be addressed in a short statement as to the citizenship of each of the parties. Any amended complaint and response to the Order to Show Cause shall be filed on or before September 1, 2020. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pm) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION by Judge John A. Kronstadt. In light of the foregoing, to facilitate the determination of whether there is subject matter jurisdiction over this action, on or before 9/2/2020, Plaintiffs are Ordered to Show Cause as to whether there is subject matter jurisdiction in this action. By that date, Plaintiffs shall submit a memorandum, not to exceed five pages, together with supporting evidence, with respect to that issue. Based on a review of that response, the Court will determine whether any further briefing or a hearing will be necessary to determine whether there is jurisdiction. (SEE CIVIL MINUTES FOR SPECIFICS). (et)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (droj)
August 14, 2020 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Dolores Alvarez, East Bay Courier, Inc., H and H Courier, Inc., Integon Preferred Insurance Company, Iriana Insurance Services, Inc., Johnson Lam, National General Insurance Company, John Sharifi, United Financial Casualty Company. (shb)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Consuelo B. Marshall to Judge John A. Kronstadt for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-07216 JAK(Ex). (rn)
August 13, 2020 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Express Messenger Systems, Inc., Protective Insurance Company. (Williamson, John)
August 13, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #2 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (car)
August 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (car)
August 11, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings filed by Plaintiffs Express Messenger Systems, Inc. dba Ontrac, Protective Insurance Company. (Williamson, John)
August 11, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Williamson, John)
August 11, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Express Messenger Systems, Inc. dba Ontrac, Protective Insurance Company. (Williamson, John)
August 11, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Express Messenger Systems, Inc. dba Ontrac, Protective Insurance Company. (Williamson, John)
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27583495 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Express Messenger Systems, Inc. dba Ontrac, Protective Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2) (Attorney John S Williamson, III added to party Express Messenger Systems, Inc. dba Ontrac(pty:pla), Attorney John S Williamson, III added to party Protective Insurance Company(pty:pla))(Williamson, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Protective Insurance Company et al v. Iriana Insurance Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iriana Insurance Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Financial Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H&H Courier, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Bay Courier, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National General Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Sharifi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Lam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolores Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Integon Preferred Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H and H Courier, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolores Zadikian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Protective Insurance Company
Represented By: John S Williamson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Express Messenger Systems, Inc. dba Ontrac
Represented By: John S Williamson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Express Messenger Systems, Inc. doing business as Ontrac
Represented By: John S Williamson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?