Orlando Garcia v. Roza Abrahamian et al
Plaintiff: Orlando Garcia
Defendant: DOES 1-10, Roza Abrahamian and 208 Tavern, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv07286
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Filing 20 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Orlando Garcia, re APPLICATION for Default Judgment against Defendants Roza Abrahamian and 208 Tavern, Inc. #19 served on 9/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Gutierrez, Faythe)
September 21, 2020 Filing 19 APPLICATION for Default Judgment against Defendants Roza Abrahamian and 208 Tavern, Inc. filed by plaintiff Orlando Garcia. Application set for hearing on 10/29/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 PNA, #2 Exhibit List, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Proposed Judgement) (Gutierrez, Faythe)
September 21, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Faythe Elizabeth Gutierrez on behalf of Plaintiff Orlando Garcia (Attorney Faythe Elizabeth Gutierrez added to party Orlando Garcia(pty:pla))(Gutierrez, Faythe)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Plaintiff shall file and serve a motion for default judgment no later than 9/29/2020, and notice it for hearing pursuant to the Local Rules. (vdr)
September 14, 2020 Filing 16 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Roza Abrahamian. (iv)
September 14, 2020 Filing 15 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to 208 Tavern, Inc. (iv)
September 11, 2020 Filing 14 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Roza Abrahamian filed by Plaintiff Orlando Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proof of Service) (Seabock, Amanda)
September 11, 2020 Filing 13 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant 208 Tavern, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Orlando Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proof of Service) (Seabock, Amanda)
September 3, 2020 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Orlando Garcia, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #11 served on 9/3/2020. (Handy, Russell)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE: ADA ACCESSIBILTY CASES by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
August 25, 2020 Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 21, 2020 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Orlando Garcia, upon Defendant 208 Tavern, Inc. served on 8/20/2020, answer due 9/10/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: MINAS JEGALIAN (Briggs Sagala, Business Manager) in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Orlando Garcia, upon Defendant Roza Abrahamian served on 8/20/2020, answer due 9/10/2020. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
August 14, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants 208 Tavern, Inc., Roza Abrahamian. (esa)
August 14, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
August 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (esa)
August 13, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Orlando Garcia. (Handy, Russell)
August 13, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Orlando Garcia, (Handy, Russell)
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Orlando Garcia. (Handy, Russell)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27613016 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Orlando Garcia. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Orlando Garcia(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orlando Garcia v. Roza Abrahamian et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roza Abrahamian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 208 Tavern, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orlando Garcia
Represented By: Russell C Handy
Represented By: Amanda Lockhart Seabock
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Represented By: Faythe Elizabeth Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?