Shelyne Maxine House v. Andrew Saul
Plaintiff: Shelyne Maxine House
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2020cv07334
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV20-7334 MRW on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
September 11, 2020 Filing 12 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Andrew Saul. (Attorney Jennifer A Kenney added to party Andrew Saul(pty:dft))(Kenney, Jennifer)
September 9, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Shelyne Maxine House. (Rosales, Steven)
September 9, 2020 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Shelyne Maxine House, upon Defendant Andrew Saul served on 9/3/2020, answer due 1/4/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Attorney General. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to General Counsel. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Rosales, Steven)
August 24, 2020 Filing 9 60 DAY Summons Issued as to defendant Andrew Saul. re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 (vm)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL (JOINT SUBMISSION FORMAT Updated March 2020) by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (See Minute Order for details) (vm)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. granting #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (vm)
August 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (ghap)
August 13, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Shelyne Maxine House, (Rosales, Steven)
August 13, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Shelyne Maxine House. (Rosales, Steven)
August 13, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Shelyne Maxine House. (Rosales, Steven)
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Shelyne Maxine House. (Rosales, Steven)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Shelyne Maxine House. (Attorney Steven G Rosales added to party Shelyne Maxine House(pty:pla))(Rosales, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shelyne Maxine House v. Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Jennifer A Kenney
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelyne Maxine House
Represented By: Steven G Rosales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?