United States of America v. Inwook Yoo
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Inwook Yoo
Garnishee: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2020cv07444
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:3205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff United States of America, re Application/Motion/Request (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Notice of Continuing Garnishment #6 , Order #4 , Writ of Garnishment #5 SERVICE TO DEFENDANT BY U.S. MAIL served on 9/11/2020. (Lester, Robert)
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff United States of America, re Order #4 , Writ of Garnishment #5 SERVICE ON GARNISHEE BY CERTIFIED MAIL served on 8/20/2020. (Lester, Robert)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 CLERK'S 28 U.S.C. 3202(b) NOTICE OF CONTINUING POSTJUDGMENT GARNISHMENT issued to Debtor. [Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.] (et)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT issued.[Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.] (et)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer to Issue Writ of Continuing Garnishment [28 USC section 3205(c) (1)] and ORDER to Issue Clerk's Notice of Continuing Postjudgment Garnishment [28 USC section 3202(b)] #1 . See Order for specifics. (et)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Text Only Entry: This case has been assigned to United States District Judge Dale S. Fischer. The case number on all documents filed with the Court should read 2:20-cv-07444-DSF. Please refer to the assigned judge's Procedures and Schedules, available on the Court's website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov/judges-requirements, for additional information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ghap) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Lester, Robert)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT TO GARNISHEE WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. [28 U.S.C. 3205(b)] AND CLERKS NOTICE OF ENFORCEMENT TO DEBTOR [28 U.S.C. 3202(b)] No Fee Required - US Government, filed by plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT TO GARNISHEE, #2 CLERKS NOTICE OF ENFORCEMENT TO DEBTOR, #3 Proposed Order) (Attorney Robert Ira Lester added to party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(pty:pla))(Lester, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Inwook Yoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inwook Yoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Robert Ira Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?