United States of America v. 50,000.00 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $50,000.00 in U.S. Currency and 50,000.00 In U.S. Currency
Claimant: Autograph Logistics Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv07450
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Claim #12 . Counsel shall file a Notice of Interested Paties on or before October 19, 2020. Failure to comply may lead to the striking of Autograph Logistics, Inc.'s claim. (jre)
October 14, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Claim #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: (1) No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. (2) Counsel must comply with Local Rule 7.1-1. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (jp)
October 8, 2020 Filing 12 CLAIM filed by Claimant Autograph Logistics Inc. (Sacks, Stefan)
September 23, 2020 Filing 11 SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff United States of America, by Publication on August 24, 2020 and August 25, 2020 upon Defendant 50,000.00 In U.S. Currency last date of publication 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. Publication was made in the www.forfeiture.gov. (Welk, Steven)
September 11, 2020 Filing 10 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN (USM-285) of Complaint #1 /Warrant #8 . Remarks: Seized $50,000.00 (20-DEA-658260) AS CV 20-7450 ON 9/1/2020. (jp)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
August 19, 2020 Filing 8 WARRANT for seizure of $50,000.00 in U.S. Currency issued on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . (lh)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (lh)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Warrant for Seizure on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Welk, Steven)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 Memorandum re Magistrate Judge Conflict filed by Plaintiff United States of America (Welk, Steven)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff United States of America for the purpose of determining whether the above-referenced civil matter, being filed on August 18, 2020, was not pending in the US Attorneys Office before the date on which Judges Andre Birotte, Jr. and Michael W. Fitzgerald began receiving civil matters. (Welk, Steven)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Welk, Steven)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attorney Steven R Welk added to party United States of America(pty:pla))(Welk, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 50,000.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $50,000.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 50,000.00 In U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Steven R Welk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Autograph Logistics Inc
Represented By: Stefan E Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?