Dan Trujillo v. Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.
Plaintiff: Dan Trujillo
Defendant: Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. and DOES 1-50, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2020cv07451
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Pedro V Castillo
Referring Judge: John W Holcomb
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 14 This action has been reassigned to the Honorable John W. Holcomb, United States District Judge. Judge Holcomb is located in Courtroom 2, on the 2nd Floor of the George E. Brown, Jr. Federal Building and United States Courthouse at 3470 Twelfth Street, Riverside, California 92501. Additional information regarding Judge Holcomb's procedures and schedules is available on the court's website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#20-141) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge John W. Holcomb, this case is transferred from Judge Fernando M. Olguin to the calendar of Judge John W. Holcomb for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-07451 JWH(PVCx). (rn)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. PLEASE READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. Scheduling Conference set for 12/3/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (iv)
September 9, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd., (Enger, William)
September 9, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd..(Attorney William K Enger added to party Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.(pty:dft))(Enger, William)
August 25, 2020 Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Dan Trujillo, upon Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. served on 8/21/2020, answer due 9/11/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jessie, CT Corp. System, authorized agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Conlogue, Kevin)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. (jtil)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (jtil)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Dan Trujillo. (Conlogue, Kevin)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Dan Trujillo, (Conlogue, Kevin)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Dan Trujillo. (Conlogue, Kevin)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27677653 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Dan Trujillo. (Attorney Kevin Shawn Conlogue added to party Dan Trujillo(pty:pla))(Conlogue, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dan Trujillo v. Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.
Represented By: William K Enger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Trujillo
Represented By: Kevin Shawn Conlogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?