Salvador Verdin v. Genius Brands International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Salvador Verdin
Defendant: Genius Brands International, Inc. and Andy Heyward
Case Number: 2:2020cv07457
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Dean D Pregerson
2 Judge: Patrick J Walsh
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants Genius Brands International, Inc., Andy Heyward. Related Case(s): 20-cv-07764; 20-cv-08277 (Charlson, Michael)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer Re Stipulation Regarding Response to Initial Complaint Pending Appointment of Lead Plaintiff #14 . See Order for specifics. (jp)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court&s website under Judge Fischer&s Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge&s Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
September 14, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Genius Brands International, Inc., Andy Heyward. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Charlson, Michael)
September 14, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael Lloyd Charlson on behalf of Defendants Genius Brands International, Inc., Andy Heyward (Attorney Michael Lloyd Charlson added to party Genius Brands International, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Lloyd Charlson added to party Andy Heyward(pty:dft))(Charlson, Michael)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Ronald S.W. Lew to Judge Dale S. Fischer for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-07457 DSF(PJWx). (rn)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Ronald S.W. Lew for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-07457 RSWL(PJWx). (rn)
September 2, 2020 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Salvador Verdin, upon Defendant Andy Heyward served on 8/27/2020, answer due 9/17/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Andy Heyward, Personally in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jasnoch, John)
September 2, 2020 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Salvador Verdin, upon Defendant Genius Brands International, Inc. served on 8/26/2020, answer due 9/16/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Blaici Xiong, Service of Process Intake Clerk Paracorp. Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jasnoch, John)
August 18, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Salvador Verdin, identifying None. (Jasnoch, John)
August 18, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (esa)
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants Genius Brands International, Inc., Andy Heyward. (esa)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (esa)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Salvador Verdin. (Jasnoch, John)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Salvador Verdin. (Jasnoch, John)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27679679 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Salvador Verdin Salvador Verdin. (Attorney John T Jasnoch added to party Salvador Verdin(pty:pla))(Jasnoch, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salvador Verdin v. Genius Brands International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genius Brands International, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Au Matthews
Represented By: Michael Lloyd Charlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Heyward
Represented By: Elizabeth Au Matthews
Represented By: Michael Lloyd Charlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salvador Verdin
Represented By: John T Jasnoch
Represented By: Joseph A Pettigrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?