Shanghai Xuanni Technology Co., Ltd. v. City Pocket Los Angeles, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: SHANGHAI XUANNI TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD.
Defendant: Morad Matian, Farhad Sadian, B&F Fedelini, Inc., NER Precious Metals Inc., CITY POCKET LOS ANGELES, INC., Pedram Shamekh, Fred Sadian and Morad Matyan
Case Number: 2:2020cv07467
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Filing 27 STIPULATION to Correct Typographical Error In Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #22 , Amended Complaint/Petition #8 , Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #21 filed by Plaintiff Shanghai Xuanni Technology Co., Ltd..(Woo, Felix)
September 29, 2020 Filing 26 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to FARHAD SADIAN, a/k/a FRED SADIAN, on the First Amended Complaint (lc)
September 29, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #22 , Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #21 by Defendants Shamekh and NER Precious Metals. The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
September 28, 2020 Filing 24 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Farhad Sadian filed by Plaintiff Shanghai Xuanni Technology Co., Ltd.. (Woo, Felix)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER that the Scheduling Conference is set for January 11, 2021 1:30 PM ; compliance with FRCP 16, and 26(f) and filing of joint report; Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action by Judge Otis D Wright, II (lc)
September 28, 2020 Filing 22 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #8 filed by Defendant NER Precious Metals Inc..(Attorney Amid T Bahadori added to party NER Precious Metals Inc.(pty:dft))(Bahadori, Amid)
September 28, 2020 Filing 21 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #8 filed by Defendant Pedram Shamekh.(Attorney Amid T Bahadori added to party Pedram Shamekh(pty:dft))(Bahadori, Amid)
September 25, 2020 Filing 20 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to B&F Fedelini Inc., On the First Amended Complaint (lc)
September 24, 2020 Filing 19 STATUS REPORT re response to OSC at Docket 15 filed by Plaintiff Shanghai Xuanni Technology Co., Ltd.. (Woo, Felix)
September 24, 2020 Filing 18 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendants B&F Fedelini, Inc., Farhad Sadian filed by Plaintiff Shanghai Xuanni Technology Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Felix T Woo) (Woo, Felix)
September 24, 2020 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Shanghai Xuanni Technology Co., Ltd., upon Defendant Morad Matian served on 9/5/2020, answer due 9/28/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jane Doe, on behalf of Morad Matian, at Morad Matian's home address in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Woo, Felix)
September 24, 2020 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Shanghai Xuanni Technology Co., Ltd., upon Defendant City Pocket Los Angeles, Inc. served on 9/5/2020, answer due 9/28/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jane Doe, on behalf of Morad Matian, who is the agent for service of process for City Pocket, at Morad Matian's home address in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Woo, Felix)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Plaintiff(s) is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE in writing no later than September 25,2020 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The Court will consider the filing of the following, as an appropriate response to this OSC, on or before the above date: Plaintiff's request for entry of default as to the defendants - B&F Fedelini, Inc. and Farhad Sadian. In the event both documents are filed before the above date, the answer will take precedence. Answer by the defendant(s). Failure to respond to the Court's Order may result in the dismissal of the action. (lc)
September 14, 2020 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Shanghai Xuanni Technology Co., Ltd., upon Defendant Farhad Sadian served on 9/1/2020, answer due 9/22/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Farhad Sadian in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Woo, Felix)
September 14, 2020 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Shanghai Xuanni Technology Co., Ltd., upon Defendant B&F Fedelini, Inc. served on 9/1/2020, answer due 9/22/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Farhad Sadian - Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Woo, Felix)
August 27, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #10 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Filer failed to remove erroneous title of the Court as " SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF ". In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
August 27, 2020 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Shanghai Xuanni Technology Co., Ltd., upon Defendant NER Precious Metals Inc. served on 8/22/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Pedram Shamekh, agent for service of process for NER Precious Metals in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Woo, Felix)
August 27, 2020 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Shanghai Xuanni Technology Co., Ltd., upon Defendant Pedram Shamekh served on 8/22/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Pedram Shamekh in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Woo, Felix)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information.. The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc)
August 19, 2020 Filing 8 First AMENDED COMPLAINT All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Shanghai Xuanni Technology Co., Ltd.(Woo, Felix)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants B&F Fedelini, Inc., City Pocket Los Angeles, Inc., Morad Matian, NER Precious Metals Inc., Farhad Sadian, Pedram Shamekh. (esa)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (esa)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff SHANGHAI XUANNI TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD.. (Woo, Felix)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff SHANGHAI XUANNI TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD., identifying None other than in caption. (Woo, Felix)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff SHANGHAI XUANNI TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD.. (Woo, Felix)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27682102 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff SHANGHAI XUANNI TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD.. (Attorney Felix T Woo added to party SHANGHAI XUANNI TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD.(pty:pla))(Woo, Felix)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shanghai Xuanni Technology Co., Ltd. v. City Pocket Los Angeles, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morad Matian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farhad Sadian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B&F Fedelini, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NER Precious Metals Inc.
Represented By: Amid T Bahadori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY POCKET LOS ANGELES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pedram Shamekh
Represented By: Amid T Bahadori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Sadian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morad Matyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHANGHAI XUANNI TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD.
Represented By: Felix T Woo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?