Edward Buck v. Michael Carvajal, et al
Plaintiff: Edward Buck
Defendant: Wilson, Carlos Peterson, H. Tellez, Michael Carvajal and B. Hand
Case Number: 2:2020cv07475
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 5 Mail Returned addressed to Edward Buck re Order #4 (hr)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RE: CIVIL RIGHTS CASE by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. Plaintiff shall file proofs of service showing compliance with this paragraph within 90 days after the filing of the complaint, i.e., no later than November 16, 2020. (See Order for Further Details) (kl)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (car)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights), #1 as to Defendants Michael Carvajal, B. Hand, Carlos Peterson, H. Tellez, Wilson. (car)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against Defendants Michael Carvajal, B. Hand, Carlos Peterson, H. Tellez, Wilson pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983. Case assigned to Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (Filing fee $400 PAID), filed by Plaintiff Edward Buck. (car)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edward Buck v. Michael Carvajal, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Tellez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Carvajal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Hand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?