Andrew Goodman v. Brooklinen, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Andrew Goodman
Defendant: BROOKLINEN, INC., DOES 1-10 Inclusive and Does 1-10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2020cv07478
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Andrew Goodman. upon Brooklinen, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 9/3/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Brooks R. Brown. (Friedman, Todd)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Brooklinen, Inc. (esa)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (esa)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Andrew Goodman. (Friedman, Todd)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Andrew Goodman. (Friedman, Todd)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Andrew Goodman, identifying Brooklinen, Inc.. (Friedman, Todd)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27685826 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Andrew Goodman. (Attorney Todd M Friedman added to party Andrew Goodman(pty:pla))(Friedman, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrew Goodman v. Brooklinen, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BROOKLINEN, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Goodman
Represented By: Todd M Friedman
Represented By: Adrian Robert Bacon
Represented By: Thomas Edward Wheeler
Represented By: Meghan Elisabeth George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?