SCPMG Retirement Committee v. O.M. et al
Plaintiff: SCPMG Retirement Committee
Defendant: Andrea Veron, Jamal Mustafa and O. M.
Case Number: 2:2020cv07479
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: Dale S Fischer
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 18 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to O. M. answer now due 11/6/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff SCPMG Retirement Committee.(May, Eric)
September 21, 2020 Filing 17 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Andrea Veron answer now due 10/21/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff SCPMG Retirement Committee.(May, Eric)
September 16, 2020 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff SCPMG Retirement Committee, upon Defendant O. M. served on 9/16/2020, answer due 10/7/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon O.M., a minor Defendant in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (May, Eric)
September 8, 2020 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff SCPMG Retirement Committee, upon Defendant Jamal Mustafa served on 8/26/2020, answer due 9/16/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jamal Mustafa Defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (May, Eric)
September 8, 2020 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff SCPMG Retirement Committee, upon Defendant Andrea Veron served on 8/30/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Andrea Vernon Defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (May, Eric)
September 8, 2020 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff SCPMG Retirement Committee, upon Defendant O. M. served on 8/30/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon O.M., a minor Defendant in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (May, Eric)
August 24, 2020 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Andrea Veron. (jp)
August 24, 2020 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant O. M. (jp)
August 24, 2020 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Jamal Mustafa. (jp)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
August 24, 2020 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff SCPMG Retirement Committee. (May, Eric)
August 24, 2020 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff SCPMG Retirement Committee. (May, Eric)
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff SCPMG Retirement Committee. (May, Eric)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Consuelo B. Marshall to Judge Dale S. Fischer for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-07479 DSF(JCx). (rn)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (lh)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff SCPMG Retirement Committee, identifying SCPMG Retirement Committee, O.M. Andrea Veron, Jamal Mustafa, SCPMG Physicians 401 (K) Plan, SCPMG Keogh Plan, Southern California Permanente Medical Group. (May, Eric)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff SCPMG Retirement Committee. (May, Eric)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27686733 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff SCPMG Retirement Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Attorney Eric W May added to party SCPMG Retirement Committee(pty:pla))(May, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCPMG Retirement Committee v. O.M. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Veron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamal Mustafa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O. M.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCPMG Retirement Committee
Represented By: Eric W May
Represented By: Jonathan Lawrence Brophy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?