Patricia Jimenez De Rocha et al v. Boston Scientific Corporation
Plaintiff: Oscar De Rocha and Patricia Jimenez De Rocha
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation
Case Number: 2:2020cv07485
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Referring Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Filing 72 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Eric M Anielak RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. (ak)
September 16, 2020 Filing 71 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Michael Tanenbaum RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. (ak)
September 16, 2020 Filing 70 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Jon A Strongman RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. (ak)
September 16, 2020 Filing 69 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney James H Keale RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. (ak)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See Order for dates and deadlines.* (iv)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT PROCEEDINGS by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See Order for Details.* (iv)
September 1, 2020 Filing 66 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Michael A Tanenbaum on behalf of Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case and will be removed pursuant to G109 Notice. (Thrasher, Lupe)
August 28, 2020 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Sheila M. Bossier on behalf of Plaintiffs Oscar De Rocha, Patricia Jimenez De Rocha (Bossier, Sheila)
August 25, 2020 Filing 64 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 24, 2020 Filing 63 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Theodore O'Reilly counsel for Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation. Adding Theodore O'Reilly as counsel of record for Boston Scientific Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attorney Theodore O'Reilly added to party Boston Scientific Corporation(pty:dft))(O'Reilly, Theodore)
August 24, 2020 Filing 62 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tarifa Belle Laddon counsel for Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation. Adding Tarifa B. Laddon as counsel of record for Boston Scientific Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attorney Tarifa Belle Laddon added to party Boston Scientific Corporation(pty:dft))(Laddon, Tarifa)
August 21, 2020 Filing 61 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Michael A Tanenbaum. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (car)
August 21, 2020 Filing 60 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jon A Strongman. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (car)
August 21, 2020 Filing 59 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney James H Keale. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (car)
August 21, 2020 Filing 58 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Eric M Anielak. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (car)
August 21, 2020 Filing 57 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Sheila M. Bossier. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (car)
August 21, 2020 Filing 56 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
August 21, 2020 Filing 55 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (car)
August 21, 2020 Filing 54 NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CASE TRANSFERRED IN: Formerly Case Number: 2:18-cv-00657, from United States District Court Southern District of West Virginia (Charleston). The above-referenced case has been transferred to this district and assigned the above civil case number 2:20-cv-07485-FMO-AFMx. (car)
August 20, 2020 Filing 53 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from West Virginia Southern
August 18, 2020 Filing 52 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02326 - Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF 161 - Stipulated Protective Order, #2 Exhibit ECF 184 - Stipulation for the Production of Docs and Electronically Stored Info, #3 Exhibit ECF 196 - New Direct Filing Order, Master Complaint, SF Complaint, #4 Exhibit ECF 197 - Master Long Form Complaint, #5 Exhibit ECF 200 - BSC_s Master Answer to Master Long Form Complaint, #6 Exhibit ECF 7153 - Docket Control Order - BSC Wave 5 Cases, #7 Exhibit ECF 8060 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion Anger, #8 Exhibit ECF 7003 - Pltf_s MTE and Memo Anger, #9 Exhibit ECF 8147 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Anger, #10 Exhibit ECF 7069 - BSC_s Memo in Opp to Pltf_s MTE Anger, #11 Exhibit ECF 7173 - Pltf_s Reply in Support of MTE Anger, #12 Exhibit ECF 8077 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion re Badylak, #13 Exhibit ECF 4826 - Pltf_s Motion and Memo Support of MTE Badylak, #14 Exhibit ECF 8142 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response re Badylak, #15 Exhibit ECF 4976 - BSC_s Opp to Pltf_s MTE Badylak, #16 Exhibit ECF 5033 - Pltf_s Reply to Deft_s Response to Pltf_s MTE Badylak, #17 Exhibit ECF 6041 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Badylak, #18 Exhibit ECF 8063 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion re Caraballo, #19 Exhibit ECF 4831 - Motion and Memo in Support of Pltf_s MTE re Caraballo, #20 Exhibit ECF 8145 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response re Caraballo, #21 Exhibit ECF 4973 - BSC_s Memo in Opp to Pltf_s MTE Caraballo, #22 Exhibit ECF 5029 - Pltf_s Reply to BSC_s Opp to Pltf_s MTE Caraballo, #23 Exhibit ECF 6042 - Memo Opinion and Order re Caraballo, #24 Exhibit ECF 8088 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion re Little, #25 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Exh 1, #26 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Exh 2, #27 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Exh 3, #28 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Exh 4, #29 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Exh 5, #30 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Pltf_s Motion and Memo Support of MTE Little, #31 Exhibit ECF 8141 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response re Little, #32 Exhibit ECF 4979 - BSC_s Response in Opp to Pltf_s MTE Little, #33 Exhibit ECF 5034 - Pltf_s Reply to Deft_s Response to Pltf_s MTE Little, #34 Exhibit ECF 6044 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Little, #35 Exhibit ECF 8076 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion re Spiegelberg, #36 Exhibit ECF 7004 - Pltf_s MTE and Memo re Spiegelberg, #37 Exhibit ECF 4827 - Pltf_s MTE Spiegelberg and Memo in Support, #38 Exhibit ECF 8149 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response re Spiegelberg, #39 Exhibit ECF 7088 - BSC_s Response in Opposition to Pltf_s MTE Spiegelberg, #40 Exhibit ECF 4969 - BSC_s Response in Opp to Pltf_s MTE Spiegelberg, #41 Exhibit ECF 7160 - Pltf_s Reply in Support of MTE Spiegelberg, #42 Exhibit ECF 5031 - Pltf_s Reply in Support of MTE Spiegelberg, #43 Exhibit ECF 6049 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Spiegelberg, #44 Exhibit ECF 8066 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion re Mays, #45 Exhibit ECF 4805 - BSC_s Memo in Support of MTE Mays, #46 Exhibit ECF 8119 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Mays, #47 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 1, #48 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 2, #49 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 3, #50 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 4, #51 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 5, #52 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 6, #53 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 7, #54 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 8, #55 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 9, #56 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 10, #57 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Pltf_s Memo in Opp to Dft_s MTE Mays, #58 Exhibit ECF 8165 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Reply to Pltf_s Memo in Opp to MTE Mays, #59 Exhibit ECF 5037 - BSC_s Reply to Pltf_s Memo in Opp to Dft_s MTE Mays, #60 Exhibit ECF 6036 - Memo Opinion and Order Mays, #61 Exhibit ECF 8087 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Margolis, #62 Exhibit ECF 4804 - BSC_s MTE Margolis and Memo in Support, #63 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh A, #64 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh B, #65 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh C, #66 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh D, #67 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh E, #68 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh F, #69 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh G, #70 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh H, #71 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh I, #72 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh J, #73 Exhibit ECF 8110 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Margolis, #74 Exhibit ECF 4960 - Pltf_s Response in Opp to BSC_s MTE Margolis, #75 Exhibit ECF 6035 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Margolis, #76 Exhibit ECF 8071 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion Pence, #77 Exhibit ECF 4815 - BSC_s MTE Pence and Memo in Support, #78 Exhibit ECF 8111 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Pence, #79 Exhibit ECF 4968 - Pltf_s Response in Opp to BSC_s MTE Pence, #80 Exhibit ECF 8166 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Reply Memo in Support of MTE Pence, #81 Exhibit ECF 5038 - BSC_s Reply Memo in Support of MTE Pence, #82 Exhibit ECF 6038 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Pence, #83 Exhibit ECF 8084 - BSC_s MTE Rosenzweig, #84 Exhibit ECF 8084 - Exh A, #85 Exhibit ECF 8084 - Exh B1, #86 Exhibit ECF 8084 - Exh B2, #87 Exhibit ECF 8084 - Exh B3, #88 Exhibit ECF 8084 - Exh B4, #89 Exhibit ECF 8084 - Exh C, #90 Exhibit ECF 8084 - Exh D, #91 Exhibit ECF 8117 - Pltf_s Response and Memo in Opp to BSC_s MTE Rosenzweig, #92 Exhibit ECF 8164 - BSC_s Reply in Support of MTE Rosenzweig, #93 Exhibit ECF 6039 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Rosenzweig, #94 Exhibit ECF 216 - Pltf_s Memo in Support of MTE Spiegelberg, #95 Exhibit ECF 275 - BSC_s Opposition to Pltf_s MTE Spiegelberg, #96 Exhibit ECF 275 - Exh A, #97 Exhibit ECF 275 - Exh B, #98 Exhibit ECF 473 - Amended Memo Opinion and Order (Daubert Motions))(Anielak, Eric) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/20/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A directing that on 8/19/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 8/18/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/5/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (maw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/20/2020.]
August 20, 2019 Filing 50 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Boston Scientific Corporation of Dr. Ruben Osorio on August 29, 2019 at 2pm (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/20/2020.]
August 12, 2019 Filing 49 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Boston Scientific Corporation of Dr. Ruben Osorio on August 14, 2019 at 2pm (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/20/2020.]
July 23, 2019 Filing 48 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Patricia DeRocha on August 2, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/20/2020.]
June 13, 2019 Filing 47 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Patricia DeRocha on July 9, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/20/2020.]
June 13, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Dr. Ruben Osorio on July 29, 2019 at 9 am (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/20/2020.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 45 RESPONSE by Oscar De Rocha, Patricia Jimenez De Rocha in opposition to #42 MOTION by Boston Scientific Corporation for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit)(Bossier, Sheila) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/20/2020.]
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #36 Motion for Protective Order, #37 Motion to Quash Defendant's Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition and for Protective Order, and #38 Amended Motion to Quash Defendant's Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition and for Protective Order; the subpoena directed to Dr. Margolis is QUASHED and the protective order is granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 5/20/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/20/2020.]
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #40 MOTION by Boston Scientific Corporation to Allow for the Deposition of Dr. Rubin Osorio after the Close of Discovery and #41 MOTION by Boston Scientific Corporation to Compel Plaintiff's Attendance at Deposition for an Additional 1.5 hours; Defendant may proceed with the depositions, but is admonished that these depositions shall not alter or interfere with any other deadlines in the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 5/20/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/20/2020.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION by Boston Scientific Corporation for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E -- Part 1, #6 Exhibit E -- Part 2, #7 Exhibit E - Part 3)(Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/20/2020.]
April 29, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert: #36 MOTION by Patricia Jimenez De Rocha for Protective Order, #37 MOTION by Oscar De Rocha, Patricia Jimenez De Rocha to Quash Defendant's Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition to Michael T. Margolis M.D. and MOTION by Oscar De Rocha, Patricia Jimenez De Rocha for Protective Order, #38 AMENDED MOTION by Oscar De Rocha, Patricia Jimenez De Rocha to Quash Defendant's Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition to Michael T. Margolis M.D.and AMENDED MOTION by Oscar De Rocha, Patricia Jimenez De Rocha for Protective Order, and #41 MOTION by Boston Scientific Corporation to Compel Plaintiff's Attendance at Deposition for an Additional 1.5 hours. (ts) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/20/2020.]
April 29, 2019 MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert: #40 MOTION by Boston Scientific Corporation to Allow for the Deposition of Dr. Rubin Osorio after the Close of Discovery. (ts) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/20/2020.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION by Boston Scientific Corporation to Compel Plaintiff's Attendance at Deposition for an Additional 1.5 hours. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/20/2020.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION by Boston Scientific Corporation to Allow for the Deposition of Dr. Rubin Osorio after the Close of Discovery. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/20/2020.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 39 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Boston Scientific Corporation of Dr. Michael T. Margolis on June 8, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. (PDT) (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/20/2020.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 38 AMENDED MOTION by Oscar De Rocha, Patricia Jimenez De Rocha to Quash Defendant's Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition to Michael T. Margolis M.D., AMENDED MOTION by Oscar De Rocha, Patricia Jimenez De Rocha for Protective Order. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit Subpoena)(Bossier, Sheila) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/20/2020.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION by Oscar De Rocha, Patricia Jimenez De Rocha to Quash Defendant's Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition to Michael T. Margolis M.D., MOTION by Oscar De Rocha, Patricia Jimenez De Rocha for Protective Order. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit Subpoena)(Bossier, Sheila) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/20/2020.]
April 25, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Objections to Defendant's Notice of Deposition of Dr. Michael T. Margolis and Motion for Protective Order by Patricia Jimenez De Rocha re: #27 Notice to Take or Amend Deposition. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit "A")(Bossier, Sheila) (Modified on 4/26/2019 to convert event to a motion for protective order) (mkw). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/20/2020.]
April 25, 2019 Filing 35 RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUBPOENA for Michael T. Margolis, M.D. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/20/2020.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Boston Scientific Corporation of Friends and Family on TBD at TBD (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/20/2020.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Boston Scientific Corporation of Friends and Family on TBD at TBD (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/20/2020.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Boston Scientific Corporation of Oscar De Rocha on TBD at TBD (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/20/2020.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Dr. Guillermo Gomez on April 26, 2019 at 2pm (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/20/2020.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Dr. Ruben Osorio on April 29, 2019 at 2pm (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/20/2020.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Dr. Ruben Osorio on April 29, 2019 at 2pm (Keale, James) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/20/2020.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Dr. Guillermo Gomez on April 26, 2019 at 2pm (Keale, James) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/20/2020.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Boston Scientific Corporation of Dr. Michael T. Margolis on April 29, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. (PDT) (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/20/2020.]
April 9, 2019 Filing 26 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Clarence Sinkhorn on April 26, 2019 at 10:00 am. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/20/2020.]
April 5, 2019 Filing 25 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Patricia DeRocha on April 8, 2019 at 10:00 am. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/20/2020.]
March 6, 2019 Filing 24 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Dr. Clarence Sinkhorn on April 8, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/20/2020.]
March 6, 2019 Filing 23 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Patricia DeRocha on April 8, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/20/2020.]
February 22, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Oscar De Rocha, Patricia Jimenez De Rocha for Rule 26 Expert Disclosures. (Bossier, Sheila) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/20/2020.]
February 18, 2019 Filing 21 OBJECTIONS by Oscar De Rocha, Patricia Jimenez De Rocha to Defendant's #19 Amended Notice of Deposition Duces Tecum of Patricia Jimenez De Rocha. (Bossier, Sheila) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/20/2020.]
February 13, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Dr. John Lyons on March 11, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/20/2020.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 19 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Patricia DeRocha on February 28, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/20/2020.]
January 25, 2019 Filing 18 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Clarence Sinkhorn on March 1, 2019 at 9:00 a.m (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/20/2020.]
January 22, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Boston Scientific Corporation for Responses to Interrogatories, Request for Production and Request for Admissions. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/20/2020.]
January 21, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Oscar De Rocha, Patricia Jimenez De Rocha for Response to Defendant's First Interrogatories and Response to Defendant's First Set of Requests for Production of Documents(Bossier, Sheila) (Modified on 1/22/2019 to convert event to certificate of service)(rmc). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/20/2020.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Boston Scientific Corporation for Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/20/2020.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY by Oscar De Rocha, Patricia Jimenez De Rocha for Request for Admissions, Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Boston Scientific Corporation. (Bossier, Sheila) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/20/2020.]
December 19, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Oscar De Rocha, Patricia Jimenez De Rocha of Kathy Crafton on a date and at a time to be determined but no later than April 29, 2019. (Bossier, Sheila) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/20/2020.]
December 11, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Patricia Jiminez De Rocha on February 21, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/20/2020.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of John Lyons on January 29, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/20/2020.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Clarence Sinkhorn on January 28, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/20/2020.]
November 15, 2018 Filing 9 PLAINTIFF FACT SHEET filed by Oscar De Rocha, Patricia Jimenez De Rocha. (Bossier, Sheila) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/20/2020.]
November 5, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Michael A. Tanenbaum on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/20/2020.]
November 5, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by James H. Keale on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Keale, James) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/20/2020.]
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRETRIAL ORDER # 196 (Docket Control Order - Boston Scientific Corp. Wave 5 Cases) The cases on Exhibits A are: 1.) removed from the pending inactive docket; and 2.) placed on the active docket. As to the cases on Exhibits A and B: 1.) The cases are no longer eligible for return to the inactive docket nor may notices of settlement be filed to relieve the parties from scheduling deadlines; 2.) To the extent other defendants, in addition to Boston Scientific Corporation, are named in the cases on Exhibits A and B, the deadlines below also apply to them; 3.) The Clerk will file this Docket Control Order in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in the main MDL, every case listed on Exhibits A and B becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order; and 4.) The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 5 cases with one important exception. If any of the cases on any exhibit were previously on a docket control order and dispositive and Daubert deadlines had passed before such cases became inactive, the parties may not file or refile dispositive or Daubert motions without first seeking leave of court for good cause shown. A. SCHEDULING DEADLINES. The following deadlines shall apply in all BSC Wave 5 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due 11/15/2018; Defendant Fact Sheets due 11/22/2018; Deadline for written discovery requests due 12/21/2018; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs due 02/22/2019; Expert disclosure served by defendants due 03/22/2019; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal due 03/29/2019; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due 04/29/2019; Filing of dispositive motions due 05/13/2019; Response to dispositive motions due 05/27/2019; Reply to response to dispositive motions due 06/03/2019; Filing of Daubert motions due 05/13/2019; Responses to Daubert motions due 05/27/2019; Reply to response to Daubert motions due 06/03/2019. B. MOTION PRACTICE. 3.) Confidential Documents. Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 03/25/2019, and any response is due by 04/09/2019. Any reply is due by 04/15/2019. The court expects full compliance with Local Civil Rule 26.4(c). C. CASES READY FOR TRANSFER, REMAND OR TRIAL 1.) Venue Recommendations. By no later than 04/06/2019, the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 04/13/2019. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/31/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; BSC Wave 5 cases identified on Exhibits A and B) (ts) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/20/2020.]
June 25, 2018 Filing 5 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Patricia Jimenez De Rocha. (Bossier, Sheila) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/20/2020.]
May 7, 2018 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Jon A. Strongman on 5/03/18. Boston Scientific Corporation waiver mailed on 4/30/2018, answer due 6/29/2018. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/20/2020.]
May 7, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Jon A. Strongman on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/20/2020.]
April 27, 2018 Filing 2 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 179 (Order Re: Qualified Settlement Fund - Boston Scientific Corp. & The Law Offices of A. Craig Eiland, PC.) entered on 04/17/2018 in MDL 2326 to attorneys in member case. (mmw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/20/2020.]
April 26, 2018 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-6419726. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cma) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/20/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patricia Jimenez De Rocha et al v. Boston Scientific Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation
Represented By: Eric M. Anielak
Represented By: Jon A. Strongman
Represented By: James H. Keale
Represented By: Michael A. Tanenbaum
Represented By: Theodore O'Reilly
Represented By: Tarifa Belle Laddon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar De Rocha
Represented By: Sheila M. Bossier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Jimenez De Rocha
Represented By: Sheila M. Bossier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?