United States of America v. Robert Anthony Sandlin
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Robert Anthony Sandlin
Case Number: 2:2020cv07497
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:3205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff United States of America, re Order #4 , Writ of Garnishment #5 served on 9/2/2020. (Mockler, Brendan)
September 1, 2020 Filing 6 CLERK'S 28 U.S.C. 3202(b) NOTICE OF CONTINUING POSTJUDGMENT GARNISHMENT TO DEBTOR. (twdb)
September 1, 2020 Filing 5 WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT issued. (twdb)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO ISSUE WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT [28 U.S.C. 3205(c)(1)] AND ORDER TO ISSUE CLERK'S NOTICE OF CONTINUING POSTJUDGMENT GARNISHMENT [28 U.S.C.3202(b)] by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Application #1 . (twdb)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to clerical error. Case is transferred to the Southern Division. Case has been reassigned to Judge David O. Carter for all further proceedings. New Case Number 8:20-cv-01539 DOC. (esa)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Mockler, Brendan)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT TO GARNISHEE ARAMARK UNIFORM & CAREER APPAREL, LLC No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Writ of Continuing Garnishment, #2 Clerk's Notice, #3 Proposed Order) (Attorney Brendan T Mockler added to party United States of America(pty:pla))(Mockler, Brendan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Robert Anthony Sandlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Anthony Sandlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Brendan T Mockler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?