Sky Zone Franchise Group, LLC v. Colleen Fitzgerald et al
Plaintiff: Sky Zone Franchise Group, LLC
Defendant: Laura Leaty, Colleen Fitzgerald, Saginaw Fun and Fitness, LLC, Northern Michigan Ninja, LLC, DOES 1-10, inclusive, Michigan Entertainment Management, LLC, Family Fun and Fitness, LLC, Kalamazoo Family Fun and Fitness, LLC, Henrietta Family Entertainment, LLC, Taylor Fun and Fitness, LLC, Rochester Fun and Fitness, LLC and Kalamazoo Entertainment, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv07499
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John W Holcomb
Referring Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva)
October 16, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Extension of Time to Respond to Initial Complaint of No More Than 30 Days and Request for Extension of Time to Respond to Initial Complaint filed by Plaintiff Sky Zone Franchise Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Request for Extension of Time to Respond to Initial Complaint)(Sims, Nancy)
October 7, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Extension of Time to Respond to Initial Complaint of No More Than 30 Days filed by Plaintiff Sky Zone Franchise Group, LLC. (Sims, Nancy)
October 7, 2020 Filing 22 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sky Zone Franchise Group, LLC, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Andrew P. Bleiman, Attorney in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Revised Proof of Service) (Sims, Nancy)
October 7, 2020 Filing 21 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sky Zone Franchise Group, LLC, upon Defendant Saginaw Fun and Fitness, LLC served on 9/16/2020, answer due 10/7/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Andrew P. Bleiman, Attorney in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Sims, Nancy)
October 7, 2020 Filing 20 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sky Zone Franchise Group, LLC, upon Defendant Rochester Fun and Fitness, LLC served on 9/16/2020, answer due 10/7/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Andrew P. Bleiman, Attorney in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Sims, Nancy)
October 7, 2020 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sky Zone Franchise Group, LLC, upon Defendant Taylor Fun and Fitness, LLC served on 9/16/2020, answer due 10/7/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Andrew P. Bleiman, Attorney in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Sims, Nancy)
October 7, 2020 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sky Zone Franchise Group, LLC, upon Defendant Northern Michigan Ninja, LLC served on 8/25/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kristine Rhine, Paralegal, Northwest Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Sims, Nancy)
October 7, 2020 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sky Zone Franchise Group, LLC, upon Defendant Michigan Entertainment Management, LLC served on 8/25/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kristine Rhine, Paralegal, Northwest Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Sims, Nancy)
October 7, 2020 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sky Zone Franchise Group, LLC, upon Defendant Laura Leaty served on 8/26/2020, answer due 9/16/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Laura Leaty, Defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Sims, Nancy)
October 7, 2020 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sky Zone Franchise Group, LLC, upon Defendant Kalamazoo Family Fun and Fitness, LLC served on 9/16/2020, answer due 10/7/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Andrew P. Bleiman, Attorney in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Sims, Nancy)
October 7, 2020 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sky Zone Franchise Group, LLC, upon Defendant Kalamazoo Entertainment, LLC served on 8/25/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kristine Rhine, Paralegal, Northwest Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Sims, Nancy)
October 7, 2020 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sky Zone Franchise Group, LLC, upon Defendant Henrietta Family Entertainment, LLC served on 8/25/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kristine Rhine, Paralegal, Northwest Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Sims, Nancy)
October 7, 2020 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sky Zone Franchise Group, LLC, upon Defendant Colleen Fitzgerald served on 9/16/2020, answer due 10/7/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Andrew P. Bleiman, Attorney in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Sims, Nancy)
October 7, 2020 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sky Zone Franchise Group, LLC, upon Defendant Family Fun and Fitness, LLC served on 9/16/2020, answer due 10/7/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Andrew P. Bleiman, Attorney in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Sims, Nancy)
October 3, 2020 Filing 10 This action has been reassigned to the Honorable John W. Holcomb, United States District Judge. Judge Holcomb is located in Courtroom 2, on the 2nd Floor of the George E. Brown, Jr. Federal Building and United States Courthouse at 3470 Twelfth Street, Riverside, California 92501. Additional information regarding Judge Holcomb's procedures and schedules is available on the court's website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#20-120) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge John W. Holcomb, this case is transferred from Judge Dolly M. Gee to the calendar of Judge John W. Holcomb for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-07499-JWH(JPRx). (ap)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Family Fun and Fitness, LLC, Colleen Fitzgerald, Henrietta Family Entertainment, LLC, Kalamazoo Entertainment, LLC, Kalamazoo Family Fun and Fitness, LLC, Laura Leaty, Michigan Entertainment Management, LLC, Northern Michigan Ninja, LLC, Rochester Fun and Fitness, LLC, Saginaw Fun and Fitness, LLC, Taylor Fun and Fitness, LLC. (lh)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (lh)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Sky Zone Franchise Group, LLC, identifying Colleen Fitzgerald (Deft); Laura Leaty (Deft); Rochester Fun and Fitness, LLC (Deft); Taylor Fun and Fitness, LLC (Deft); Family Fun and Fitness, LLC (Deft); Kalamazoo Family Fun and Fitness, LLC (Deft); Saginaw Fun and Fitness, LLC (Deft); Henrietta Family Entertainment, LLC (Deft); Northern Michigan Ninja, LLC (Deft); Michigan Entertainment Management, LLC; and Kalamazoo Entertainment, LLC (Deft). (Sims, Nancy)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Sky Zone Franchise Group, LLC. (Sims, Nancy)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Sky Zone Franchise Group, LLC. (Sims, Nancy)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27699683 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Sky Zone Franchise Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15) (Attorney Nancy Nguyen Sims added to party Sky Zone Franchise Group, LLC(pty:pla))(Sims, Nancy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sky Zone Franchise Group, LLC v. Colleen Fitzgerald et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Leaty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colleen Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saginaw Fun and Fitness, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northern Michigan Ninja, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan Entertainment Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family Fun and Fitness, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kalamazoo Family Fun and Fitness, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henrietta Family Entertainment, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Fun and Fitness, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rochester Fun and Fitness, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kalamazoo Entertainment, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sky Zone Franchise Group, LLC
Represented By: Nancy Nguyen Sims
Represented By: Michelle Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?