Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al v. Arianna Ani Zadourian
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Defendant: Manuk Akopyan and Arianna Ani Zadourian
Case Number: 2:2020cv07512
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant and counter-claimant Arianna Ani Zadourian, identifying WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., ARIANNA ANI ZADOURIAN, MANUKAKOPYAN, M&A Lifestyle, Inc., Mara Lifestyle, Inc., Pure C, Inc.. (Baker, Scott)
October 15, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. Counsel must comply with L.R 7-1. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv)
October 14, 2020 CROSSCLAIM against Cross-Defendant Manuk Akopyan, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed by Cross-Claimant Arianna Ani Zadourian. (iv)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) COURT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for November 23, 2020 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before November 9, 2020. (iv)
October 14, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 for Interpleader filed by Defendant and Cross Complainant Arianna Ani Zadourian.(Baker, Scott)
September 14, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Arianna Ani Zadourian answer now due 10/14/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Arianna Ani Zadourian.(Attorney Scott L Baker added to party Arianna Ani Zadourian(pty:dft))(Baker, Scott)
September 10, 2020 Filing 10 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., upon Defendant Arianna Ani Zadourian served on 8/24/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (McNamara, Christopher)
September 10, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., upon Defendant Manuk Akopyan acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 8/27/2020, answer due 9/17/2020. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Aren Debarseghian, Attorney. (McNamara, Christopher)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Manuk Akopyan and Arianna Ani Zadourian. (jtil)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (jtil)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (McNamara, Christopher)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., identifying Wells Fargo & Company. (McNamara, Christopher)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (McNamara, Christopher)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27702636 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attorney Christopher J McNamara added to party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(pty:pla))(McNamara, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al v. Arianna Ani Zadourian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manuk Akopyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arianna Ani Zadourian
Represented By: Yuval Mordechai Rogson
Represented By: Jason T Riddick
Represented By: Scott L Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Christopher J McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?