Randee Spellman v. Astora Womens Health, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Randee Spellman
Defendant: American Medical Systems, Inc., Astora Women's Health, LLC and Astora Womens Health, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv07515
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Steve Kim
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 19 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan of The Parties ; estimated length of trial 7-15, filed by Defendant Astora Womens Health, LLC.. (Stanley, David)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu: The Court sets a Scheduling Conference for October 29, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information, confer on a discovery plan, and report to the Court, as required by F.R.C.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Trial counsel are ordered to be present. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court no later than October 19, 2020. See Local Rule 26-1. Plaintiff(s) is directed to give notice of the scheduling conference immediately to each party that makes an initial appearance in the action after this date. (bm)
September 17, 2020 Filing 17 Defendant's Demand For Jury Trial filed by Defendant Astora Womens Health, LLC (Stanley, David)
September 16, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #12 filed by Defendant Astora Womens Health, LLC.(Stanley, David)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO ANSWER FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #14 by Judge George H. Wu. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, pursuant to the Stipulation to Extend Defendant Astora Womens Health, LLCs (Defendant) Time To Answer Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint (FAC), Defendant shall have until and including October 2, 2020 to serve and file a responsive pleading to the FAC. (yl)
September 9, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Astora Womens Health, LLC answer now due 10/2/2020, re Amended Complaint/Petition #12 filed by Defendant Astora Womens Health, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stanley, David)
September 9, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Astora Womens Health, LLC, identifying ASTORA WOMENS HEALTH, LLC (f/k/a AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS, INC.); ASTORA WOMENS HEALTH, LLC is ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.; ASTORA WOMENS HEALTH, LLC and ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC. are indirect wholly owned subsidiaries of ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC. is an indirect wholly-owned subsidiary of Endo International plc, a publicly traded company. No publicly held corporation owns more than 10% of Endo International plc stock.. (Attorney David E Stanley added to party Astora Womens Health, LLC(pty:dft))(Stanley, David)
September 3, 2020 Filing 12 First AMENDED COMPLAINT All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Randee Spellman(Baughman, Laura)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth Local Rules) 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (See Order for further details) (yl)
August 25, 2020 Filing 10 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Randee Spellman, (Baughman, Laura)
August 21, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (jp)
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant American Medical Systems, Inc. (jp)
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Astora Womens Health, LLC. (jp)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jp)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (jp)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Randee Spellman. (Baughman, Laura)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Randee Spellman. (Baughman, Laura)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Randee Spellman. (Baughman, Laura)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27701383 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Randee Spellman. (Attorney Laura J. Baughman added to party Randee Spellman(pty:pla))(Baughman, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Randee Spellman v. Astora Womens Health, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Medical Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astora Women's Health, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astora Womens Health, LLC
Represented By: David E Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randee Spellman
Represented By: Laura J. Baughman
Represented By: Laura J Baughman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?