Robin Singh Eduational Services, Inc v. Nathan Cepelinski et al
Plaintiff: ROBIN SINGH EDUATIONAL SERVICES, INC. and Robin Singh Eduational Services, Inc a California corporation doing business as Testmasters
Defendant: NATHAN CEPELINSKI, Nate Morris and Does 1 through 20
Case Number: 2:2020cv07516
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Pedro V Castillo
Referring Judge: Dale S Fischer
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Portions of First Amended Complaint Amended Complaint/Petition #8 filed by defendant Nathan Cepelinski. Motion set for hearing on 11/23/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Cepelinski Declaration, #2 Declaration Lowe Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Proposed Order) (Lowe, Jason)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #10 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. See order for specifics. (lom)
September 10, 2020 Filing 10 First STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Amended Complaint filed by defendant Nathan Cepelinski. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lowe, Jason)
September 3, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Robin Singh Eduational Services, Inc, identifying Robin Singh Educational Services, Inc. d/b/a TestMasters (Plaintiff); Robin Singh (Plaintiff's Principal). (Stewart, Ryan)
September 3, 2020 Filing 8 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery), JURY DEMAND, filed by Plaintiff Robin Singh Eduational Services, Inc(Stewart, Ryan)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant NATHAN CEPELINSKI Nathan Cepelinski, (Lowe, Jason)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every party's first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (jp)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jp)
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (jp)
August 19, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF ELECTRONICALLY FILED AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY MAIL Executed by Plaintiff Robin Singh Eduational Services, Inc., upon Defendant Nathan Cepelinski served on 7/22/2020, answer due 8/12/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Andrew "Doe" in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by Certified mail "Personal and Confidential). Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 8/3/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO. 2 OF EXHIBIT B TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
August 19, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF ELECTRONICALLY FILED COMPLAINT against Defendants Nathan Cepelinski, Does 1 through 20, filed by plaintiff Robin Singh Eduational Services, Inc. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 6/29/2020 ATTACHMENT NO. 1 OF EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant NATHAN CEPELINSKI. (Lowe, Jason)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, case number 20STCV24541 Receipt No: ACACDC-27701398 - Fee: $400, filed by Attorney NATHAN CEPELINSKI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Case Assignment, #5 Exhibit E - Notice of Case Management Conference, #6 Exhibit F - Notice of Removal Filed in State Court) (Attorney Jason Frederick Lowe added to party NATHAN CEPELINSKI(pty:dft))(Lowe, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robin Singh Eduational Services, Inc v. Nathan Cepelinski et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBIN SINGH EDUATIONAL SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Singh Eduational Services, Inc a California corporation doing business as Testmasters
Represented By: Ryan Michael Vincent Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATHAN CEPELINSKI
Represented By: Jason Frederick Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nate Morris
Represented By: Jason Frederick Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?