Nexus Pharmaceuticals Inc v. Quva Pharma Inc et al
Plaintiff: Nexus Pharmaceuticals Inc
Defendant: Quva Pharma Holdings Inc. and Quva Pharma Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv07518
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: John D Early
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Denying Plaintiff's EX PARTE APPLICATION to File Documents Under Seal (Dkt. #29 ). Nexus may file a revised opposition without reference to information it seeks to protect by October 23, 2020. If no revised opposition is filed by that date, the Court will unseal the opposition currently on file. (twdb)
October 15, 2020 Filing 38 Amendment to APPLICATION to file document Exhibit 1 to Mock Decl. ISO Opposition to Defendants Motion to Transfer under seal #29 filed by Plaintiff Nexus Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document (Exhibit 1))(Mock, Matthew)
October 14, 2020 Filing 37 Amendment to APPLICATION to file document Exhibit 1 to Mock Decl. ISO Opposition to Defendants Motion to Transfer under seal #29 filed by Plaintiff Nexus Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mock, Matthew)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge John D. Early re Notice of Lodging Proposed Stipulated Protective Order #35 . (see document for details) (hr)
October 14, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Lodging Proposed Stipulated Protective Order filed by Defendants Quva Pharma Holdings Inc., Quva Pharma Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Stipulated Protective Order)(Perloff, Saul)
October 13, 2020 Filing 32 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Nexus Pharmaceuticals Inc, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, #30 Application to File Sealed Documents served on Oct. 13, 2020. (Mock, Matthew)
October 12, 2020 Filing 31 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of Texas #25 filed by Plaintiff Nexus Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Mock iso Nexus's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue, #2 Exhibit 2 to Mock Declaration)(Mock, Matthew)
October 12, 2020 Filing 30 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Exhibit 1 to Mock Decl. ISO Opposition to Defendants Motion to Transfer under seal #29 filed by Plaintiff Nexus Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Ex. 1 to Mock Dec. iso Nexus's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue)(Mock, Matthew)
October 12, 2020 Filing 29 APPLICATION to file document Exhibit 1 to Mock Decl. ISO Opposition to Defendants Motion to Transfer under seal filed by Plaintiff Nexus Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mock, Matthew)
October 12, 2020 Filing 28 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #24 filed by Plaintiff Nexus Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Mock, Matthew)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting #27 Non-Resident Attorney Robert L. Rouder APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Quva Pharma Holdings Inc., Quva Pharma Inc, designating Jeffrey B. Margulies as local counsel. (et)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting #26 Non-Resident Attorney Katharyn A. Grant APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Quva Pharma Holdings Inc., Quva Pharma Inc, designating Jeffrey B. Margulies as local counsel. (et)
October 7, 2020 Filing 27 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Robert L. Rouder to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Quva Pharma Holdings Inc., Quva Pharma Inc (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28423547) filed by Defendants Quva Pharma Holdings Inc., Quva Pharma Inc. Application set for hearing on 11/9/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Margulies, Jeffrey)
October 7, 2020 Filing 26 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Katharyn A. Grant to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Quva Pharma Holdings Inc., Quva Pharma Inc (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28423386) filed by Defendants Quva Pharma Holdings Inc., Quva Pharma Inc. Application set for hearing on 11/9/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Margulies, Jeffrey)
October 5, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of Texas filed by Defendants Quva Pharma Holdings Inc., Quva Pharma Inc. Motion set for hearing on 11/2/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Jeffrey B.Margulies, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Declaration of Peter Jenkins, #6 Proposed Order) (Margulies, Jeffrey)
October 5, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Quva Pharma Holdings Inc., Quva Pharma Inc. Motion set for hearing on 11/2/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Declaration of Saul Perloff in support of Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Proposed Order) (Perloff, Saul)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney John K. Hsu to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Nexus Pharmaceuticals, Inc, designating Matthew Mock as local counsel #19 . (iv)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Imron Aly to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Nexus Pharmaceuticals, Inc, designating Matthew Mock as local counsel #18 . (iv)
September 24, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Nexus Pharmaceuticals Inc. Motion set for hearing on 11/23/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew Mock in support of Nexus's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit 1 to Mock Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Mock Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Mock Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Mock Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 to Mock Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6 to Mock Declaration, #8 Declaration of Usman Ahmed ISO Nexus's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #9 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Nexus's Moion for Preliminary Injunction) (Mock, Matthew)
September 24, 2020 Filing 20 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiff Nexus Pharmaceuticals Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Mock, Matthew)
September 24, 2020 Filing 19 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John K. Hsu to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Nexus Pharmaceuticals Inc (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28235066) filed by plaintiff Nexus Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew B. Mock, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Proposed Order) (Mock, Matthew)
September 24, 2020 Filing 18 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Imron T. Aly to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Nexus Pharmaceuticals Inc (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28234956) filed by plaintiff Nexus Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew B. Mock, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Proposed Order) (Mock, Matthew)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:20-cv-01506 CJC(JDEx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Steve Kim and Judge John F. Walter to Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge John D. Early for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-07518 CJC(JDEx). Signed by Judge Cormac J. Carney (rn)
September 15, 2020 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Saul H. Perloff as Lead Trial Counsel filed by Defendants Quva Pharma Holdings Inc., Quva Pharma Inc. (Perloff, Saul)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY NOT MORE THAN 30 DAYS #11 by Judge John F. Walter. Defendants Qu Va Pharma, Inc. and Qu Va Pharma Holdings, Inc. shall have up to and including October 2, 2020 to respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. (iv)
September 8, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Yuchen Guo on behalf of Defendants Quva Pharma Holdings Inc., Quva Pharma Inc (Attorney Yuchen Guo added to party Quva Pharma Holdings Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Yuchen Guo added to party Quva Pharma Inc(pty:dft))(Guo, Yuchen)
September 8, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Saul H Perloff on behalf of Defendants Quva Pharma Holdings Inc., Quva Pharma Inc (Attorney Saul H Perloff added to party Quva Pharma Holdings Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Saul H Perloff added to party Quva Pharma Inc(pty:dft))(Perloff, Saul)
September 8, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Quva Pharma Holdings Inc., Quva Pharma Inc, identifying QuVa Pharma Holdings, Inc.. (Margulies, Jeffrey)
September 8, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Quva Pharma Holdings Inc. answer now due 10/2/2020; Quva Pharma Inc answer now due 10/2/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants Quva Pharma Holdings Inc.; Quva Pharma Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Jeffrey B Margulies added to party Quva Pharma Holdings Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey B Margulies added to party Quva Pharma Inc(pty:dft))(Margulies, Jeffrey)
August 28, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE Declaration of Lead Counsel filed by plaintiff Nexus Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Mock, Matthew)
August 24, 2020 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Quva Pharma Holdings Inc., Quva Pharma Inc. (iv)
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Nexus Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment #1)(Mock, Matthew)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (esa)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Nexus Pharmaceuticals Inc, (Mock, Matthew)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Matthew Brien Mock counsel for Plaintiff Nexus Pharmaceuticals Inc. Adding Matthew B. Mock as counsel of record for Nexus Pharmaceuticals Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plainitff Nexus Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Mock, Matthew)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Nexus Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Mock, Matthew)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27701733 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Nexus Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Attorney Matthew Brien Mock added to party Nexus Pharmaceuticals Inc(pty:pla))(Mock, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nexus Pharmaceuticals Inc v. Quva Pharma Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quva Pharma Holdings Inc.
Represented By: Yuchen Guo
Represented By: Saul H Perloff
Represented By: Robert L. Rouder
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Margulies
Represented By: Katharyn A. Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quva Pharma Inc
Represented By: Yuchen Guo
Represented By: Saul H Perloff
Represented By: Robert L. Rouder
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Margulies
Represented By: Katharyn A. Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nexus Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Matthew Brien Mock
Represented By: John K. Hsu
Represented By: Imron T. Aly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?