Nexus Pharmaceuticals Inc. v. SCA Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Plaintiff: Nexus Pharmaceuticals Inc. and Nexus Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant: SCA Pharmaceuticals Inc. and SCA Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv07520
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: John D Early
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #24 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Change Lead Attorney. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
October 15, 2020 Filing 26 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case /Defendant SCA Pharmaceuticals, LLC's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #25 filed by Defendant SCA Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(McCabe, Bridget)
October 15, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case /Defendant SCA Pharmaceuticals, LLC's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Defendant SCA Pharmaceuticals, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 11/16/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Dyanne J. Cho in Support of Defendant SCA Pharmaceutical, LLC's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order) (McCabe, Bridget)
October 9, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Designation of Lead Counsel filed by Defendant SCA Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (McCabe, Bridget)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney John K. Hsu to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Nexus Pharmaceuticals, Inc, designating Matthew Mock as local counsel #18 . (iv)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Imron Aly to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Nexus Pharmaceuticals, Inc, designating Matthew Mock as local counsel #17 . (iv)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Thomas Hogan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant SCA Pharmaceuticals, LLC, designating Bridget McCabe as local counsel #13 . (iv)
September 24, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Nexus Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 11/23/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew Mock in support of Nexus's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit 1 to Mock Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Mock Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Mock Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Mock Declaration, #6 Declaration of Usman Ahmed ISO Nexus's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #7 Proposed Order Granting Nexus's Motion for Preliminary Injunction) (Mock, Matthew)
September 24, 2020 Filing 19 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiff Nexus Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Mock, Matthew)
September 24, 2020 Filing 18 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John K. Hsu to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Nexus Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28236087) filed by plaintiff Nexus Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew B. Mock, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Proposed Order) (Mock, Matthew)
September 24, 2020 Filing 17 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Imron T. Aly to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Nexus Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28236001) filed by plaintiff Nexus Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew B. Mock, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Proposed Order) (Mock, Matthew)
September 23, 2020 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Dyanne J. Cho counsel for Defendant SCA Pharmaceuticals, LLC. Adding Dyanne J. Cho as counsel of record for SCA Pharmaceuticals, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant SCA Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Attorney Dyanne J. Cho added to party SCA Pharmaceuticals, LLC(pty:dft))(Cho, Dyanne)
September 22, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF LODGING filed /Defendant SCA Pharmaceuticals, LLC's Notice of Lodging of Certificate of Good Standing in Support of Pro Hac Vice Application of Attorney Thomas E. Hogan re APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Thomas E. Hogan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant SCA Pharmaceuticals, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28087143) #13 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(McCabe, Bridget)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:20-cv-01506 CJC(JDEx). Case transferred from Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar to Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge John D. Early for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-07520 CJC(JDEx). Signed by Judge Cormac J. Carney (rn)
September 15, 2020 Filing 13 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Thomas E. Hogan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant SCA Pharmaceuticals, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28087143) filed by Defendant SCA Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thomas E. Hogan, #2 Proposed Order) (McCabe, Bridget)
September 9, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant SCA Pharmaceuticals, LLC. Related Case(s): 8:20-cv-01506-CJC-JDE; 2:20-cv-07328-DMG-JPR; 2:20-cv-07329-GW-PVC; 2:20-cv-07331-DMG-MRW; 2:20-cv-07518-JFW-SK (McCabe, Bridget)
September 4, 2020 Filing 11 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant SCA Pharmaceuticals, LLC, identifying SCA Pharmaceuticals, LLC; SCA Pharmaceuticals Holding, LLC; Enhanced Equity Funds; SCA Holdings, LLC. (McCabe, Bridget)
September 4, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to SCA Pharmaceuticals, LLC answer now due 10/15/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant SCA Pharmaceuticals, LLC.(Attorney Bridget Springer McCabe added to party SCA Pharmaceuticals, LLC(pty:dft))(McCabe, Bridget)
August 24, 2020 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant SCA Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (bm)
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Nexus Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Mock, Matthew)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (cch)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (lh)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Nexus Pharmaceuticals Inc., (Mock, Matthew)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Matthew Brien Mock counsel for Plaintiff Nexus Pharmaceuticals Inc.. Adding Matthew B. Mock as counsel of record for Nexus Pharmaceuticals Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Nexus Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Mock, Matthew)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Nexus Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Mock, Matthew)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27702143 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Nexus Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Attorney Matthew Brien Mock added to party Nexus Pharmaceuticals Inc.(pty:pla))(Mock, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nexus Pharmaceuticals Inc. v. SCA Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCA Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCA Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Represented By: Thomas E. Hogan
Represented By: Bridget Springer McCabe
Represented By: Dyanne J. Cho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nexus Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Brien Mock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nexus Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Brien Mock
Represented By: Imron T. Aly
Represented By: John K. Hsu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?